Tully v. Cassaday & Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Allison Tully
Defendant: Cassaday & Company, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01154
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Liam O'Grady
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Defendant shall serve opposition disclosures by April 3, 2020 and plaintiff shall serve any rebuttal disclosures by April 20, 2020. No other dates are modified by this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 03/27/2020. (wgar, )
March 27, 2020 Filing 15 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time for Completing Expert Disclosures by Cassaday & Company, Inc.. (Schuler, Joseph)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PROTECTIVE ORDER - Re Handling and Labeling of Confidential Information. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 03/13/2020. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. (wgar, )
March 13, 2020 Filing 13 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Cassaday & Company, Inc.. (Schuler, Joseph)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Upon consideration of the representations made by the parties in their Joint Discovery Plan (Docket no. 11) and taking note of the Scheduling Order entered in this case (Docket no. 10), the court makes the following rulings: The Joint Discovery Plan filed by the parties is approved and shall control discovery to the extent of its application unless further modified by the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 02/12/2020. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. (wgar, )
February 12, 2020 Filing 11 Proposed Joint Discovery Plan by Allison Tully.(Kruse, Kellee)
January 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER:Initial Pretrial Conference set for 2/19/2020 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 501 before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/19/2020 at 01:30 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 1000 before District Judge Liam O'Grady. Discovery due by 6/12/2020.. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 1/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form, #2 Pretrial Notice)(awac, )
December 12, 2019 Filing 9 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Cassaday & Company, Inc.. (Schuler, Joseph)
December 10, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Linda U. Okoukoni on behalf of Cassaday & Company, Inc. (Okoukoni, Linda)
December 6, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint Answer to First Amended Complaint by Cassaday & Company, Inc..(Schuler, Joseph)
November 21, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on Cassaday & Company, Inc. on 11/15/2019, filed by Allison Tully. (Kruse, Kellee)
November 15, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Dylan Howell on behalf of Allison Tully (Howell, Andrew)
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Cassaday & Company, Inc., filed by Allison Tully.(Kruse, Kellee)
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Cassaday & Company, Inc.. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(lcre, )
September 6, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Liam O'Grady and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (lcre, )
September 6, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons by Allison Tully. (Kruse, Kellee)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6823548.), filed by Allison Tully. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kruse, Kellee)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tully v. Cassaday & Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allison Tully
Represented By: Kellee Boulais Kruse
Represented By: Andrew Dylan Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cassaday & Company, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Erwin Schuler
Represented By: Linda U. Okoukoni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?