Kim v Friends Health Care Team, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jong Hoon Kim
Defendant: Friends Health Care Team, Inc., Dae J Lee, Rebecca T Cho and Dae J. Yi
Case Number: 1:2019cv01187
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 11/20/2019 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 500 before Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/19/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga. Discovery due by 3/13/2020. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga on 10/30/2019. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent, #2 Pretrial Notice)(dzir)
October 29, 2019 Filing 13 Amended ANSWER to Complaint by Rebecca T Cho, Friends Health Care Team, Inc., Dae J Lee.(Cynn, Eugene)
October 28, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint by Rebecca T Cho, Friends Health Care Team, Inc., Dae J Lee.(Cynn, Eugene)
October 24, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Eugene Jin-Ho Cynn on behalf of Rebecca T Cho, Friends Health Care Team, Inc., Dae J Lee (Cynn, Eugene) (Main Document 11 replaced on 10/28/2019) (clar, ). Modified Modified docket entry org. was a fillable form on 10/28/2019 (clar, ).
October 24, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Eugene Jin-Ho Cynn on behalf of Friends Health Care Team, Inc. (Cynn, Eugene) (Main Document 10 replaced on 10/28/2019) (clar, ). Modified docket entry org. was a fillable form on 10/28/2019 (clar, ).
October 18, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT SUMMONS Issued as to Rebecca T Cho, Friends Health Care Team, Inc., Dae J. Yi. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(acha, )
October 18, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Summons re #6 Amended Complaint by Jong Hoon Kim. (Attachments: #1 summons)(Ryu, Hyunkweon)
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Summons re #6 Amended Complaint by Jong Hoon Kim. (Ryu, Hyunkweon)
October 18, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jong Hoon Kim, filed by Jong Hoon Kim.(Ryu, Hyunkweon)
October 11, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service returned executed for Complaint, Summons, Civil Cover Sheet as to Dae J. Lee served on 10/07/2019, Answer due 10/28/19 filed by Jong Hoon Kim. (Ryu, Hyunkweon) Modified text on 10/15/2019 to add answer due date (klau, ).
October 11, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Summons, Civil Cover Sheet served on Rebecca T. Cho on 10/07/2019, filed by Jong Hoon Kim. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service)(Ryu, Hyunkweon)
October 1, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Rebecca T Cho, Friends Health Care Team, Inc., Dae J Lee. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachment for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(pmil, )
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint summons by Jong Hoon Kim. (Attachments: #1 summons, #2 summons)(Ryu, Hyunkweon)
September 13, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Anthony J Trenga and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (aott, )
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6836626.), filed by Jong Hoon Kim. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)(Ryu, Hyunkweon)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kim v Friends Health Care Team, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Friends Health Care Team, Inc.
Represented By: Eugene Jin-Ho Cynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dae J Lee
Represented By: Eugene Jin-Ho Cynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca T Cho
Represented By: Eugene Jin-Ho Cynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dae J. Yi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jong Hoon Kim
Represented By: Hyunkweon Ryu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?