SawStop Holding LLC v. Iancu
Plaintiff: SawStop Holding LLC
Defendant: Andrei Iancu
Case Number: 1:2019cv01198
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Leonie M Brinkema
Referring Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:154
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SawStop Holding LLC. U.S Attorney served on 9/25/2019, answer due 11/25/2019,U.S. Attorney General served on 9/23/2019, Andrei Iancu served on 9/23/2019. (Newton, Jared) Modified on 10/31/2019 to correct service information (dest, ).
October 29, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate of Service by SawStop Holding LLC.(Newton, Jared)
September 17, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Andrei Iancu, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two Electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(jlan)
September 17, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (jlan)
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons to William P. Barr by SawStop Holding LLC. (Newton, Jared)
September 17, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons to G. Zachary Terwilliger by SawStop Holding LLC. (Newton, Jared)
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons to Andrei Iancu by SawStop Holding LLC. (Newton, Jared)
September 17, 2019 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by SawStop Holding LLC. (Newton, Jared)
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6841022.), filed by SawStop Holding LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Newton, Jared)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SawStop Holding LLC v. Iancu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrei Iancu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SawStop Holding LLC
Represented By: Jared Weston Newton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?