Price v. City of Alexandria
Plaintiff: Courtney Price
Defendant: City Of Alexandria
Case Number: 1:2019cv01200
Filed: September 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Rossie D Alston
Referring Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued for service by SPS as to City of Alexandria. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(klau, )
October 11, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons by Courtney Price. (Brown, Christopher)
October 11, 2019 Notice of Correction re #2 Proposed Summons, The filing user has been notified that document #2 is an incorrectly saved PDF fillable form and has been removed. The filing user was directed to refile the document. (klau, )
October 10, 2019 Filing 2 Document filed in error and removed re: Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, by Courtney Price. (Brown, Christopher) (Main Document 2 replaced on 10/11/2019) (klau, ). Modified text on 10/11/2019 (klau, ).
September 18, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (klau, )
September 17, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint with Jury Demand against City of Alexandria, ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6841908.), filed by Courtney Price. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Cvr Sheet)(Brown, Christopher) Modified text on 9/18/2019 (klau, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Price v. City of Alexandria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Courtney Price
Represented By: Christopher E. Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Of Alexandria
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?