Center for Plastic Surgery v. Anthem Health
Plaintiff: Center for Plastic Surgery
Defendant: Anthem Health d/b/a Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc. and Anthem Health
Case Number: 1:2019cv01210
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Liam O'Grady
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 11/04/2019. (choy, )
November 1, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION of Dismissal (Voluntary) without prejudice by Anthem Health. (Flynn, Virginia)
September 26, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #4 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion Hearing set for 11/8/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 1000 before District Judge Liam O'Grady. (clar, )
September 25, 2019 Filing 6 Notice of Hearing Date set for November 8 re #4 MOTION to Dismiss (Flynn, Virginia)
September 25, 2019 Filing 5 Memorandum in Support re #4 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Anthem Health. (Flynn, Virginia)
September 25, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by Anthem Health. (Flynn, Virginia)
September 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Virginia Bell Flynn on behalf of Anthem Health (Flynn, Virginia)
September 19, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Liam O'Grady and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (klau, )
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Anthem Health d/b/a Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc.. (Cooper, Massie)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Fairfax County Circuit Court, ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6844147.), filed by Anthem Health d/b/a Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (State Court Documents), #2 Exhibit 2 (Declaration of Brian Likens), #3 Exhibit 3 (2013 Master Contract), #4 Exhibit 4 (2017 Statement of Benefits), #5 Exhibit 5 (2018 Statement of Benefits), #6 Exhibit 6 (2017 Annual Amendments), #7 Exhibit 7 (2018 Annual Amendments), #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cooper, Massie) Modified text on 9/19/2019 (No Answer Filed)(klau, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Center for Plastic Surgery v. Anthem Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthem Health d/b/a Anthem Health Plans of Virginia, Inc.
Represented By: Massie Payne Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthem Health
Represented By: Massie Payne Cooper
Represented By: Virginia Bell Flynn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Plastic Surgery
Represented By: Cynthia Ann McDermott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?