Hamilton v. Gaches et al
Plaintiff: Kenrick Hamilton and Brian M.
Defendant: Secretary Kirstjen M. Nielsen, Civil Rights Division, Michael Gaches, United States Attorney for Eastern District of Virginia and Attorney General of the United States
Case Number: 1:2019cv01235
Filed: September 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Ivan D Davis
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Kirstjen M. Nielsen- U.S. Department of Homeland Security. (acha, )
November 18, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Michael Gaches-Office of Chief Counsel-TSA. (acha, )
November 13, 2019 Filing 7 Waiver of Oral Argument re #6 MOTION for Default Judgment by Kenrick Hamilton (dvanm, )
November 8, 2019 Notice of Correction re #6 MOTION for Default Judgment. The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing Date or a Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument. (acha, )
November 7, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Default Judgment by Kenrick Hamilton. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(acha, )
October 25, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed William Barr, Attorney General of the United States served on 10/22/2019, answer due 12/23/2019. (acha, )
September 26, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Attorney General of the United States, Civil Rights Division, Michael Gaches, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, United States Attorney for Eastern District of Virginia, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General by USMS. (acha, )
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER granting #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 9/26/2019. (See order for further details). (acha, )Copy sent to plaintiff-Pro-Se.
September 25, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kenrick Hamilton. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(acha, )
September 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Attorney General of the United States, Civil Rights Division, Michael Gaches, Kirstjen M. Nielsen, United States Attorney for Eastern District of Virginia (Filing fee $ 400.), filed by Kenrick Hamilton. (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Envelope)(acha, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hamilton v. Gaches et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenrick Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian M.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary Kirstjen M. Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Civil Rights Division
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Gaches
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Attorney for Eastern District of Virginia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General of the United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?