Wireless Communications Mobile LLC v. FrontPoint Security Solutions LLC
Plaintiff: Wireless Communications Mobile LLC
Defendant: FrontPoint Security Solutions LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01267
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Leonie M Brinkema
Referring Judge: Ivan D Davis
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 11/25/19. (pmil, )
November 22, 2019 Filing 13 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Henning Schmidt and Certification of Local Counsel Cecil E. Key Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6952866. by Wireless Communications Mobile LLC. (Key, Cecil)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER:Initial Pretrial Conference set for 12/11/2019 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 301 before Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. Discovery due by 4/10/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/16/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 11/20/19. (Attachments: #1 Mag.Consent, #2 Pretrial Notice)(yguy)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 11/18/19. (pmil, )
November 15, 2019 Filing 10 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Anita Marie Christy Spieth and Certification of Local Counsel Dabney Jefferson Carr IV Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6940604. by FrontPoint Security Solutions LLC. (Carr, Dabney)
November 15, 2019 Filing 9 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by FrontPoint Security Solutions LLC. (Carr, Dabney)
November 15, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Wireless Communications Mobile LLC by FrontPoint Security Solutions LLC.(Carr, Dabney)
November 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Dabney Jefferson Carr, IV on behalf of FrontPoint Security Solutions LLC (Carr, Dabney)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer is GRANTED IN PART. ORDERED that defendant Frontpoint Security Solutions LLC's response to the complaint be filed no later than Friday, November 15, 2019. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 11/1/19. (klau, )
November 1, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, on Behalf of Frontpoint Security Solutions LLC by Wireless Communications Mobile LLC. (Key, Cecil)
October 21, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Frontpoint Security Solutions, LLC c/o Registered Agent, Capitol Corporate Services, Inc. on 10/15/19, filed by Wireless Communications Mobile LLC. (Key, Cecil)
October 3, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to FrontPoint Security Solutions LLC. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachment for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(pmil, )
October 2, 2019 Filing 2 Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent no. 9,125,079. (pmil, )
October 2, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (pmil, )
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6867737.), filed by Wireless Communications Mobile LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Appendix Report on Filing AO 120, #7 Appendix Summons)(Key, Cecil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wireless Communications Mobile LLC v. FrontPoint Security Solutions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wireless Communications Mobile LLC
Represented By: Cecil Elvis Key, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FrontPoint Security Solutions LLC
Represented By: Dabney Jefferson Carr, IV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?