Hendiazad et al v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Amrik Hendiazad and Seemin Hendiazad
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. ("MERS") and Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01270
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Referring Judge: Claude M Hilton
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Reza, Syed)
November 14, 2019 Filing 12 Waiver of Oral Argument re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Amrik Hendiazad (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(lcre, )
November 14, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,.. Motion Hearing set for 1/17/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. (clar, )
November 13, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Hearing Date set for 1/17/2020 re #10 Memorandum in Support, #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. (Reza, Syed)
November 13, 2019 Filing 10 Memorandum in Support re #9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Reza, Syed)
November 13, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim with Roseboro,. by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reza, Syed)
November 8, 2019 Notice of Correction re #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court. The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing Date and or file a Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument. (acha, )
November 7, 2019 Filing 8 Memorandum in Support of #7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Amrik Hendiazad, Seemin Hendiazad. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Envelope)(acha, )
November 7, 2019 Filing 7 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Removed Case to Circuit Court of Loudoun County, Virginia by Amrik Hendiazad, Seemin Hendiazad. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Letter)(acha, )
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. ORDERED that Defendants shall file their response to the Complaint on or before November 13, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 10/9/19. (klau, ) Modified on 10/11/2019 (c/m on 10/11/19)(klau, ).
October 9, 2019 Filing 5 Waiver of re #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint Oral Argument by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC (Reza, Syed)
October 9, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Complaint by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Reza, Syed)
October 8, 2019 Filing 3 Suggestion of Bankruptcy/NOTICE by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC - Notice of Bankruptcy (Reza, Syed) Modified on 10/9/2019 to correct event (klau, ).
October 3, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Claude M. Hilton and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (klau, )
October 2, 2019 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. ("MERS"), Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Reza, Syed)
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Loudoun County Circuit Court ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6868191.), filed by Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc., Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Filings, #3 Exhibit C - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit D - Certification of Merger, #5 Exhibit E - Tax Assessment Value, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Reza, Syed) Modified text on 10/3/2019 (No Answer Filed)(klau, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hendiazad et al v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Syed Mohsin Reza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc. ("MERS")
Represented By: Syed Mohsin Reza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Syed Mohsin Reza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amrik Hendiazad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Seemin Hendiazad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?