K Ross LLC v. Metropolitan Aviation LLC et al
Plaintiff: K Ross LLC
Defendant: Metropolitan Aviation LLC, Alan R. Cook and NextFlight Aviation LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01280
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Rossie D Alston
Referring Judge: John F Anderson
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 2, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Alan R. Cook, Metropolitan Aviation LLC, NextFlight Aviation LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Memorandum of Law in Support, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Affidavit, #4 Exhibit)(Barnidge, Edward)
November 15, 2019 Filing 35 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Second) against All Defendants, filed by K Ross LLC.(Shakow, Thomas)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #33 Motion to Amend Complaint ORDERED that Defendants' time to respond to the Amended Complaint is continued until December 2, 2019, Plaintiff is granted leave to file a Second Amended Complaint by November 15, 2019, and Defendants shall respond to the then- operative complaint on December 2,2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 11/7/19. (klau, )
November 7, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by K Ross LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shakow, Thomas)
October 30, 2019 Filing 32 Withdrawal of Motion by K Ross LLC re #24 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (Shakow, Thomas)
October 30, 2019 Filing 31 Withdrawal of Motion by K Ross LLC re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Shakow, Thomas)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #29 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. ORDERED that the parties' joint motion to extend the deadline for Defendants' Answer to November 8, 2019 is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 10/25/2019. (wgar, )
October 25, 2019 Filing 29 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Alan R. Cook, Metropolitan Aviation LLC, NextFlight Aviation LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Barnidge, Edward)
October 24, 2019 Filing 28 Reply to Motion re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by K Ross LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of Joshua Rosenblatt, #2 Declaration of Serine Consolino, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J)(Shakow, Thomas)
October 21, 2019 Filing 27 Memorandum in Opposition re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction filed by Alan R. Cook, Metropolitan Aviation LLC, NextFlight Aviation LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Declaration of E. Barnidge, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit)(Barnidge, Edward)
October 21, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #24 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment . Motion Hearing set for 11/8/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 601 before District Judge Rossie D. Alston Jr.. (clar, )
October 18, 2019 Filing 26 Notice of Hearing Date set for November 8, 2019 re #24 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment , #25 Memorandum in Support (Shakow, Thomas)
October 18, 2019 Filing 25 Memorandum in Support re #24 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by K Ross LLC. (Shakow, Thomas)
October 18, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by K Ross LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Brotman, #2 Affidavit Rosenblatt, #3 Proposed Order)(Shakow, Thomas)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #14 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Serine Consolino and Certification of Local Counsel Thomas E. Shakow. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 10/16/2019. (jlan)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Denying #6 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 10/16/2019. (choy, )
October 16, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Coleman Barnidge on behalf of Alan R. Cook, Metropolitan Aviation LLC, NextFlight Aviation LLC (Barnidge, Edward)
October 16, 2019 Filing 20 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by K Ross LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Shakow, Thomas)
October 15, 2019 Filing 18 Opposition to Plaintiff's Request for TRO filed by Alan R. Cook, Metropolitan Aviation LLC, NextFlight Aviation LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1)(Barnidge, Edward)
October 14, 2019 Filing 17 Memorandum Supplemental to #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by K Ross LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Shakow, Thomas)
October 11, 2019 Filing 19 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr: Motion Hearing held on 10/11/2019. Appearance of counsel. Matter on for: Plaintiff's #6 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction. Defendant raised an issue regarding jurisdiction. Case recalled at the end of the Court's docket. Plaintiff indicated they have filed an Amended Complaint. Plaintiff adduced evidence through: Joshua Rosenblatt. Matter argued and ruling to be issued by close of business next Wednesday, 10/16/2019. The Court directed Mr. Cook to turn over all documents to counsel and for the parties to execute a non-spoiliation agreement. (Court Reporter: Daryl F. Garrett w/Rudiger, Green & Kerns)(tarm)
October 11, 2019 Filing 16 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Alan R. Cook, Metropolitan Aviation LLC, NextFlight Aviation LLC, filed by K Ross LLC.(Shakow, Thomas)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 10/9/19. (klau, )
October 9, 2019 Filing 14 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Serine Consolino and Certification of Local Counsel Thomas E. Shakow Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6879412. by K Ross LLC. (Shakow, Thomas)
October 9, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction served on Alan Cook and Alan Cook accepting service for Metropolitan Aviation LLC and Nextflight Aviation LLC on October 8, 2019, filed by K Ross LLC. (Shakow, Thomas)
October 9, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT of Service returned executed for Complaint (Alan Cook, accepting service) as to Nextflight Aviation LLC served on October 8, 2019, Answer due 10/29/19, filed by K Ross LLC. (Shakow, Thomas) Modified text on 10/10/2019 to add answer due date(klau, ).
October 9, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint returned executed , (Alan Cook, accepting service) as to Metropolitan Aviation LLC served on October 8, 2019, Answer due 10/29, filed by K Ross LLC. (Shakow, Thomas) Modified text on 10/10/2019 to add answer due date(klau, ).
October 9, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint returned executed as to Alan Cook served on October 8, 2019, Answer due 10/29/19, filed by K Ross LLC. (Shakow, Thomas) Modified text on 10/10/2019 to add answer due date (klau, ).
October 9, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order . Motion Hearing set for 10/11/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 601 before District Judge Rossie D. Alston Jr. (Per RDA chambers) (clar, )
October 8, 2019 Notice of Correction re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing Date or a Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument. (klau, )
October 7, 2019 Filing 9 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael K. Ross and Certification of Local Counsel Thomas E. Shakow Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6875221. by K Ross LLC. (Shakow, Thomas)
October 7, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Alan R. Cook, Metropolitan Aviation LLC, NextFlight Aviation LLC. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(acha, )
October 4, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (acha, )
October 4, 2019 Filing 7 Memorandum in Support re #6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by K Ross LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Shakow, Thomas)
October 4, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by K Ross LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit K. Brotman, #2 Affidavit J. Rosenblatt, #3 Proposed Order)(Shakow, Thomas)
October 4, 2019 Filing 5 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by K Ross LLC. (Shakow, Thomas)
October 4, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons Alan R Cook by K Ross LLC. (Shakow, Thomas)
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons NextFlight Aviation LLC by K Ross LLC. (Shakow, Thomas)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons Metropolitan Aviation LLC by K Ross LLC. (Shakow, Thomas)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6873539.), filed by K Ross LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Shakow, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: K Ross LLC v. Metropolitan Aviation LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Aviation LLC
Represented By: Edward Coleman Barnidge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan R. Cook
Represented By: Edward Coleman Barnidge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NextFlight Aviation LLC
Represented By: Edward Coleman Barnidge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K Ross LLC
Represented By: Thomas Edward Shakow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?