Builders Mutual Insurance Company v. J.L. Albrittain, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Builders Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Cathedral View, LLC, Michele G Ward, Whitney Albrittain, James Seale, Erin Seale, Sidney G Simmonds, Tom Albrittain, Nancy Albrittain, J.L. Albrittain, Inc., John L Albrittain, Robert W Ward and Estate of John L. Albrittain, Jr.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01315
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Leonie M Brinkema
Referring Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 12:635
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2019 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Tom Albrittain. Tom Albrittain waiver sent on 11/15/2019, answer due 1/14/2020. (Charnoff, Mikhael)
December 13, 2019 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Nancy Albrittain. Nancy Albrittain waiver sent on 11/15/2019, answer due 1/14/2020. (Charnoff, Mikhael)
December 13, 2019 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by J.L. Albrittain, Inc.. J.L. Albrittain, Inc. waiver sent on 11/15/2019, answer due 1/14/2020. (Charnoff, Mikhael)
December 3, 2019 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Builders Mutual Insurance Company. Sidney G Simmonds waiver sent on 11/15/2019, answer due 1/14/2020. (Howell, Danny)
December 3, 2019 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Builders Mutual Insurance Company. Cathedral View, LLC waiver sent on 11/27/2019, answer due 1/26/2020. (Howell, Danny)
December 2, 2019 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Erin Seale. Erin Seale waiver sent on 11/22/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. (Sullivan, Richard)
December 2, 2019 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by James Seale. James Seale waiver sent on 11/22/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. (Sullivan, Richard)
December 2, 2019 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Robert W Ward. Robert W Ward waiver sent on 11/22/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. (Sullivan, Richard)
December 2, 2019 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Michele G Ward. Michele G Ward waiver sent on 11/22/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. (Sullivan, Richard)
December 2, 2019 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Whitney Albrittain. Whitney Albrittain waiver sent on 11/22/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. (Sullivan, Richard)
October 18, 2019 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to Nancy Albrittain, Tom Albrittain, Whitney Albrittain, Cathedral View, LLC, Estate of John L. Albrittain, Jr., J.L. Albrittain, Inc., Erin Seale, James Seale, Sidney G Simmonds, Michele G Ward, Robert W Ward. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(acha, )
October 16, 2019 Filing 13 Proposed Summons for Defendant Erin Seale by Builders Mutual Insurance Company. (Howell, Danny)
October 16, 2019 Filing 12 Proposed Summons for Defendant James Seale by Builders Mutual Insurance Company. (Howell, Danny)
October 16, 2019 Filing 11 Proposed Summons for Defendant Robert W. Ward by Builders Mutual Insurance Company. (Howell, Danny)
October 16, 2019 Filing 10 Proposed Summons for Defendant Michele G. Ward by Builders Mutual Insurance Company. (Howell, Danny)
October 16, 2019 Filing 9 Proposed Summons for Defendant Whitney Albrittain by Builders Mutual Insurance Company. (Howell, Danny)
October 16, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Summons for Defendant Sidney G. Simmonds by Builders Mutual Insurance Company. (Howell, Danny)
October 16, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Summons for Defendant Nancy Albrittain by Builders Mutual Insurance Company. (Howell, Danny)
October 16, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons for Defendant Tom Albrittain by Builders Mutual Insurance Company. (Howell, Danny)
October 16, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons for Defendant Cathedral View, LLC by Builders Mutual Insurance Company. (Howell, Danny)
October 16, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons for Defendant Estate of John L. Albrittain, Jr. by Builders Mutual Insurance Company. (Howell, Danny)
October 16, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons for Defendant J.L. Albrittain, Inc. by Builders Mutual Insurance Company. (Howell, Danny)
October 16, 2019 Case Reassigned to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. District Judge Liam O'Grady no longer assigned to the case. (rban, )
October 15, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Liam O'Grady and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (dvanm, )
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Builders Mutual Insurance Company. (Howell, Danny)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint for Declaratory Judgment ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6887573.), filed by Builders Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Attachment to Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E)(Howell, Danny)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Builders Mutual Insurance Company v. J.L. Albrittain, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cathedral View, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michele G Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whitney Albrittain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Seale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erin Seale
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sidney G Simmonds
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Albrittain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Albrittain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.L. Albrittain, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John L Albrittain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert W Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of John L. Albrittain, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Builders Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Danny Mark Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?