GN Audio USA, Inc., D/B/A Jabra et al v. Dominion Due Diligence Group
Plaintiff: GN Audio USA, Inc., D/B/A Jabra
Defendant: Dominion Due Diligence Group D/B/A "D3G" and "Dominion Sourcing, LLC", David Walton and Dominion Sourcing LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01331
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Leonie M Brinkema
Referring Judge: Ivan D Davis
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by GN Audio USA, Inc., D/B/A Jabra. Dominion Due Diligence Group D/B/A "D3G" and "Dominion Sourcing, LLC" waiver sent on 11/15/2019, answer due 1/14/2020. (Kayser, Susan)
December 6, 2019 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Notice, and Amended Complaint served on David Walton on 12/3/2019, filed by GN Audio USA, Inc., D/B/A Jabra. (Kayser, Susan)
December 6, 2019 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Alias Summons, Notice, and Amended Complaint served on Dominion Sourcing, LLC on 12/3/2019, filed by GN Audio USA, Inc., D/B/A Jabra. (Kayser, Susan)
December 6, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Susan Marie Kayser on behalf of GN Audio USA, Inc., D/B/A Jabra (Kayser, Susan)
November 20, 2019 Filing 17 Alias Summons Issued as to Dominion Sourcing LLC. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(dvanm, )
November 20, 2019 Filing 16 Summons Returned Unexecuted by GN Audio USA, Inc., D/B/A Jabra as to Dominion Sourcing LLC. (Eldridge, Amy)
November 19, 2019 Filing 15 Summons Returned Unexecuted by GN Audio USA, Inc., D/B/A Jabra as to Dominion Sourcing LLC. (Eldridge, Amy)
November 19, 2019 Notice of Correction re #14 Proposed Summons. The filing user has been notified that requested summons is a second summons with different address and must have court permission if original was executed. (dvanm, )
November 18, 2019 Filing 14 Proposed Summons re #7 Amended Complaint for Dominion Sourcing LLC by GN Audio USA, Inc., D/B/A Jabra. (Eldridge, Amy)
November 15, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Dominion Due Diligence Group D/B/A "D3G" and "Dominion Sourcing, LLC", Dominion Sourcing LLC. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(dvanm, )
November 14, 2019 Filing 12 Proposed Summons re #7 Amended Complaint for Defendant Dominion Sourcing, LLC by GN Audio USA, Inc., D/B/A Jabra. (Eldridge, Amy)
November 14, 2019 Filing 11 Proposed Summons re #7 Amended Complaint for Defendants Dominion Due Diligence Group D/B/A "D3G" by GN Audio USA, Inc., D/B/A Jabra. (Eldridge, Amy)
November 14, 2019 Filing 10 Amended Complaint Summons Issued as to David Walton. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(dvanm, )
November 14, 2019 Notice of Correction re #8 Proposed Summons. The filing user has been notified that only one party to be served may be listed on a summons and to refile summons for each individual party. (dvanm, )
November 13, 2019 Filing 9 Proposed Summons re #7 Amended Complaint for Defendant David Walton by GN Audio USA, Inc., D/B/A Jabra. (Eldridge, Amy)
November 13, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Summons re #7 Amended Complaint for Defendants Dominion Due Diligence Group D/B/A "D3G" and Dominion Sourcing, LLC by GN Audio USA, Inc., D/B/A Jabra. (Eldridge, Amy)
November 13, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by GN Audio USA, Inc., D/B/A Jabra.(Eldridge, Amy)
October 31, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by GN Audio USA, Inc., D/B/A Jabra All Defendants (Eldridge, Amy)
October 28, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Dominion Due Diligence Group D/B/A "D3G" and "Dominion Sourcing, LLC". NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(dvanm, )
October 25, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by GN Audio USA, Inc., D/B/A Jabra. (Eldridge, Amy)
October 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by GN Audio USA, Inc., D/B/A Jabra Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark (Eldridge, Amy)
October 21, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (dvanm, )
October 18, 2019 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by GN Audio USA, Inc., D/B/A Jabra. (Eldridge, Amy)
October 18, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6894801.), filed by GN Audio USA, Inc., D/B/A Jabra. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Eldridge, Amy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: GN Audio USA, Inc., D/B/A Jabra et al v. Dominion Due Diligence Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominion Due Diligence Group D/B/A "D3G" and "Dominion Sourcing, LLC"
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Walton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dominion Sourcing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GN Audio USA, Inc., D/B/A Jabra
Represented By: Amy Jo Eldridge
Represented By: Susan Marie Kayser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?