Mastodon Design LLC v. Vizocom ICT LLC
Plaintiff: Mastodon Design LLC
Defendant: Vizocom ICT LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01339
Filed: October 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Referring Judge: Liam O'Grady
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 So Ordered re #8 NOTICE by Mastodon Design LLC re: #7 NOTICE re Order of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 11/27/2019. (See order for further details). (acha, )
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 So Ordered re #7 NOTICE by Mastodon Design LLC re Stipulated Injunction. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 11/27/2019. (See order for further details). (acha, )
November 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Mastodon Design LLC re #7 NOTICE re Order of Dismissal (Sullivan, Richard)
November 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Mastodon Design LLC re Stipulated Injunction (Sullivan, Richard)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER- It is hereby ORDERED that the #5 Motion is GRANTED. Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint shall be due no later than Wednesday, November 27, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 11/14/2019. (See order for further details). (acha, )
November 13, 2019 Filing 5 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Vizocom ICT LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pittman, John)
October 23, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Vizocom ICT LLC. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(acha, )
October 23, 2019 Filing 3 Civil Cover Sheet re #1 Complaint Amended by Mastodon Design LLC. (Sullivan, Richard)
October 23, 2019 Notice of Correction re #1 Complaint. An incomplete, illegible, or incorrect document was filed. The filing user has been notified to re-file the civil cover sheet document as appropriate. (acha, )
October 22, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Liam O'Grady and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (acha, )
October 22, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Mastodon Design LLC. (Sullivan, Richard)
October 22, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6900103.), filed by Mastodon Design LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sullivan, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mastodon Design LLC v. Vizocom ICT LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vizocom ICT LLC
Represented By: John Travis Pittman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mastodon Design LLC
Represented By: Richard Cyril Sullivan, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?