Tysons Corner Holdings, LLC v. Global Cellular, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Tysons Corner Holdings, LLC
Defendant: Global Cellular, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01374
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Leonie M Brinkema
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #13 MOTION to Remand MOTION to Remand to State Court . Motion Hearing set for 1/24/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (dvanm, )
December 23, 2019 Filing 17 Notice of Hearing Date re #13 MOTION to Remand MOTION to Remand to State Court (Bowman, Christopher)
December 10, 2019 Filing 16 Memorandum in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Remand MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Global Cellular, Inc.. (Reed, Benjamin)
November 27, 2019 Notice of Correction: The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing Date or a Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument re #13 MOTION to Remand MOTION to Remand to State Court (lcre, )
November 26, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to Counterclaim by Tysons Corner Holdings, LLC.(Bowman, Christopher)
November 26, 2019 Filing 14 Memorandum in Support re #13 MOTION to Remand MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Tysons Corner Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Bowman, Christopher)
November 26, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION to Remand , MOTION to Remand to State Court by Tysons Corner Holdings, LLC. (Bowman, Christopher)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Upon consideration of the representations made by the parties in their Joint Discovery Plan (Docket no. 11) and taking note of the Scheduling Order entered in this case (Docket no. 8), the court makes the following rulings: The Joint Discovery Plan filed by the parties is approved and shall control discovery to the extent of its application unless further modified by the court. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 11/20/2019. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. (wgar, )
November 20, 2019 Filing 11 Joint Discovery Plan by Tysons Corner Holdings, LLC.(Bowman, Christopher)
November 20, 2019 Filing 10 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Tysons Corner Holdings, LLC. (Bowman, Christopher)
November 6, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) Affirmative Defenses and, COUNTERCLAIM against Tysons Corner Holdings, LLC by Global Cellular, Inc.. (Reed, Benjamin)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 11/27/2019 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 501 before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. Discovery due by 3/13/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/19/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 11/6/19. (Attachments: #1 Mag.Consent, #2 Pretrial Notice)(yguy)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Pro hac vice of Jared Cassity Miller. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 11/5/2019. (lcre, )
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Pro hac vice Matthew Michael Weiss. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 11/5/2019. (lcre, )
November 5, 2019 Filing 5 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jared C. Miller and Certification of Local Counsel Benjamin B. Reed Corrected by Global Cellular, Inc.. (Reed, Benjamin)
November 5, 2019 Notice of Correction: The filing user has been notified to refile the document re #3 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jared Cassity Miller and Certification of Local Counsel Benjamin B. Reed Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6921085. MOTION for Leave to Appeal (lcre, )
November 4, 2019 Filing 4 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Matthew Michael Weiss and Certification of Local Counsel Benjamin B. Reed Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6921092. by Global Cellular, Inc.. (Reed, Benjamin)
November 4, 2019 Filing 3 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jared Cassity Miller and Certification of Local Counsel Benjamin B. Reed Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6921085. , MOTION for Leave to Appeal by Global Cellular, Inc.. (Reed, Benjamin)
October 30, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (lcre, )
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Global Cellular, Inc.. (Reed, Benjamin)
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6913404.), filed by Global Cellular, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Declaration of K. Skouras with Exhibits), #2 Exhibit B (State Court Action), #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Reed, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tysons Corner Holdings, LLC v. Global Cellular, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Global Cellular, Inc.
Represented By: Benjamin Boyce Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tysons Corner Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Christopher Barrett Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?