New Virginia Majority Education Fund et al v. Fairfax County Board of Elections et al
Plaintiff: New Virginia Majority Education Fund and Amyla Bryant
Defendant: Bettina Lawton, Katherine Hanley, Fairfax County Board of Elections, Stephen Hunt and Gary Scott
Case Number: 1:2019cv01379
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Rossie D Alston
Referring Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Voting
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER that (a) Any voter registration applicant who submitted an application on or before 10/15/19 who provided a GMU address and whose application was rejected solely for not providing a dormitory name or room number, who identifies an on-campus dormitory name and room number to defts before 11/2/19 at 5 p.m., the defendants shall (i) accept such Rejected GMU Voter Registration Applicant's application, (ii) add the applicant to the FX County voter rolls, and (iii) permit the applicant to cast a regular ballot during the 11/5/19 election; (b) For any Rejected GMU Voter Registration Applicant who identifies an on-campus dormitory name and room number at the GMU- Merten Hall precinct location on 11/5/19 (or any other time after 11/2 at 5:00, and before arriving at the polling place on 11/5/19), the Defts shall (i) permit such Rejected GMU Voter Registration Applicant to cast a provisional ballot, which shall be counted provided Defts have no other reason to reject such ballot, and (ii) enroll such applicant on the permanent FX County voter rolls thereafter; (c) Defts shall provide additional training to the Chief Election Officer who is working on 11/5/19 at the GMU - Merten Hall polling place to educate workers on the relief agreed to above, and shall place a member or the General Registrar's staff at the GMU - Merten Hall polling place; (d) This Order solely applies to the 11/5/19 election, and all parties reserve their rights, claims and defenses. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 11/1/19. (tarm)
November 1, 2019 Filing 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr: Motion Hearing held on 11/1/2019. Appearance of Counsel. Plaintiffs' #9 Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction - Argued and taken under advisement. (Court Reporter: T. Harris.)(tarm)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting #13 Motion for Pro hac vice for Daniel Donovan. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 11/01/2019. (choy, )
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting #12 Motion for Pro hac vice for Michael Glick. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 11/01/2019. (choy, )
November 1, 2019 Filing 13 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Daniel Donovan and Certification of Local Counsel Paul J. Weeks Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6916825. by Amyla Bryant, New Virginia Majority Education Fund. (Weeks, Paul)
October 31, 2019 Filing 12 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael Glick and Certification of Local Counsel Paul J. Weeks Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6916709. by Amyla Bryant, New Virginia Majority Education Fund. (Weeks, Paul)
October 31, 2019 Filing 11 Notice of Hearing Date re #9 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Weeks, Paul)
October 31, 2019 Filing 10 Memorandum in Support re #9 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Amyla Bryant, New Virginia Majority Education Fund. (Weeks, Paul)
October 31, 2019 Filing 9 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Amyla Bryant, New Virginia Majority Education Fund. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, Pt. 1, #5 Exhibit 3, Pt. 2, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6)(Weeks, Paul)
October 31, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Fairfax County Board of Elections, Katherine Hanley, Stephen Hunt, Bettina Lawton, Gary Scott. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(acha, )
October 31, 2019 Set Deadlines as to #9 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Motion Hearing set for 11/1/2019 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 601 before District Judge Rossie D. Alston Jr. (clar, )
October 31, 2019 Case Reassigned to District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr. District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema no longer assigned to the case. (aott, )
October 31, 2019 Case Reassigned to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. District Judge T. S. Ellis, III no longer assigned to the case. (aott, )
October 30, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge T. S. Ellis, III and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (acha, )
October 30, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by New Virginia Majority Education Fund. (Weeks, Paul)
October 30, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons to Bettina Lawton by Amyla Bryant, New Virginia Majority Education Fund. (Weeks, Paul)
October 30, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons to Katherine Hanley by Amyla Bryant, New Virginia Majority Education Fund. (Weeks, Paul)
October 30, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons to Stephen Hunt by Amyla Bryant, New Virginia Majority Education Fund. (Weeks, Paul)
October 30, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons to Gary Scott, General Registrar by Amyla Bryant, New Virginia Majority Education Fund. (Weeks, Paul)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons to Fairfax County Board of Elections by Amyla Bryant, New Virginia Majority Education Fund. (Weeks, Paul)
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6914583.), filed by New Virginia Majority Education Fund, Amyla Bryant. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Weeks, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New Virginia Majority Education Fund et al v. Fairfax County Board of Elections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bettina Lawton
Represented By: Alexander Francuzenko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katherine Hanley
Represented By: Alexander Francuzenko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairfax County Board of Elections
Represented By: Alexander Francuzenko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Hunt
Represented By: Alexander Francuzenko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Scott
Represented By: Alexander Francuzenko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New Virginia Majority Education Fund
Represented By: Paul Jarrett Weeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amyla Bryant
Represented By: Paul Jarrett Weeks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?