KEENAN v. JONES et al
Plaintiff: George W Keenan
Defendant: Beth Cabell, Dr. Charles Campbell, Harold W Clarke, Julie L Jones, Armor Correctional Health Services, Amonette, A David Robinson and Crystal Allen
Case Number: 1:2019cv01399
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Referring Judge: T S Ellis
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Filing 26 Case transferred in from District of Florida Northern; Case Number 4:19-cv-00081. Original file and docket sheet received. (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/5/2019: #2 Prisoner Data Report) (ldab, ).
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER FOR TRANSFER. The #23 report and recommendation is accepted. This case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia, Norfolk Division. The clerk must take all steps necessary to effect the transfer. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 11/01/2019. (toy) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 11/5/2019.]
October 28, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE notified that action is needed Re: #24 Objection to Report and Recommendations (rcb) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 11/5/2019.]
October 25, 2019 Filing 24 OBJECTION to Magistrate Judge's #23 Report and Recommendations by GEORGE W KEENAN. (rcb) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 11/5/2019.]
October 8, 2019 Filing 23 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) and 28 U.S.C. 1406(a), it is respectfully RECOMMENDED that this case be transferred to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia, Jacksonville Norfolk Division, for all further proceedings. R&R flag set. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 10/8/19. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 11/5/2019. (blb)[Transferred from Florida Northern on 11/5/2019.]
September 27, 2019 Filing 22 Partial Filing fee: $ 27.57, receipt number FLN400037644. (blb) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 11/5/2019.]
September 3, 2019 Filing 21 Partial Filing fee: $ 24.12, receipt number FLN400037463. (blb) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 11/5/2019.]
September 3, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re: #20 Order. (blb)*Case is remanded to the magistrate judge for further proceedings.* [Transferred from Florida Northern on 11/5/2019.]
August 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER VACATING THE JUDGMENT. The plaintiffs motion, ECF No. #16 , for relief from the judgment is granted. The judgment, ECF No. #13 , is vacated. The case is remanded to the magistrate judge for further proceedings. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 8/27/19. (blb) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 11/5/2019.]
August 23, 2019 Filing 19 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by GEORGE W KEENAN. (blb) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 11/5/2019.]
August 23, 2019 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #16 MOTION filed by GEORGE W KEENAN. (blb) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 11/5/2019.]
August 23, 2019 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT in Support by Mike Dunavant re #16 MOTION filed by GEORGE W KEENAN. (blb) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 11/5/2019.]
August 23, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION FOR RELIEF FROM JUDGMENT TO SET ASIDE DISMISSAL AND REINSTATE CASE re #12 Order Adopting Report and Recommendation by GEORGE W KEENAN. (blb) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 11/5/2019.]
August 23, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF FILING by GEORGE W KEENAN. (blb) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 11/5/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 14 Partial Filing fee: $ 45.15, receipt number FLN400037278. (blb) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 11/5/2019.]
July 24, 2019 Filing 13 *VACATED per #20 ORDER*CLERK'S JUDGMENT pursuant to #12 Order Adopting Report and Recommendation. (blb) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 11/5/2019.]
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The report and recommendation #10 is accepted and adopted as the court's opinion. The clerk must enter judgment stating, "This case is dismissed without prejudice." The clerk must close the file. Signed by JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE on 7/24/19. (blb) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 11/5/2019.]
July 17, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE ROBERT L HINKLE notified that action is needed Re: #10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. No Objection filed, time expired. (blb) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 11/5/2019.]
July 2, 2019 Filing 11 Partial Filing fee: $ 29.64, receipt number FLN400037061. (blb) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 11/5/2019.]
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. It is respectfully RECOMMENDED that this case be DISMISSED for failure to prosecute and failure to comply with a Court Order. - R&R flag set. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 6/18/19. Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 7/16/2019. (blb) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 11/5/2019.]
June 7, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re: #7 Order. No Amended Complaint filed. (blb) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 11/5/2019.]
June 3, 2019 Filing 9 Partial Filing fee: $ 36.40, receipt number FLN400036867. (blb) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 11/5/2019.]
May 6, 2019 Filing 8 Partial Filing fee: $ 31.80, receipt number FLN400036682. (blb) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 11/5/2019.]
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. The Clerk of Court shall forward to Plaintiff a 1983 complaint form so that Plaintiff can file the amended complaint as explained above. Plaintiff shall have until 6/3/2019, to file an amended civil rights complaint, which shall be typed or clearly written and submitted on court forms. The Clerk of Court shall return this file upon Plaintiff's submission of an amended complaint, or no later than 6/3/2019. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 5/2/19. (blb)*Form provided as Directed* [Transferred from Florida Northern on 11/5/2019.]
April 30, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re: 6 Filing Fee Received. (blb) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 11/5/2019.]
April 9, 2019 Filing 6 Partial Filing fee: $ 50.00, receipt number FLN400036484 (blb) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 11/5/2019.]
March 19, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings Fee due by 4/19/2019. (blb) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 11/5/2019.]
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Plaintiff's in forma pauperis motion, ECF No. #4 , is GRANTED to the extent Plaintiff is not required to prepay the $350.00 filing fee. Plaintiff is assessed an initial partial filing fee of $50.00 based on the monthly deposits in Plaintiff's Monthly Trust Account for the preceding six months as required by 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(1)(A). Plaintiff has until 4/19/2019, to submit the initial partial filing fee. Failure to submit the assessed initial partial filing fee will result in a recommendation of dismissal of this action. The Clerk of Court shall return this file upon payment of theassessed initial partial filing fee, or no later than 4/19/2019. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 3/18/19. (blb) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 11/5/2019.]
March 7, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re: #4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. (blb) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 11/5/2019.]
March 7, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by GEORGE W KEENAN. (blb) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 11/5/2019.]
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Clerk of Court shall forward to Plaintiff an application packet for requesting in forma pauperis status. Plaintiff has until 3/12/2019, to either pay the filing fee or file an in forma pauperis motion. The Clerk of Court shall return this file upon receipt of Plaintiff's compliance with this Order or no later than March 12, 2019. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS on 2/11/19. *Form mailed as directed. (amm) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 11/5/2019.]
February 11, 2019 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE CHARLES A STAMPELOS notified that action is needed Re: #1 Complaint. No service copies provided or IFP motion filed. (amm) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 11/5/2019.]
February 8, 2019 Filing 2 Notice to Pro Se (amm) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 11/5/2019.]
February 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by GEORGE W KEENAN. (No service copies provided) (amm) [Transferred from Florida Northern on 11/5/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: KEENAN v. JONES et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George W Keenan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beth Cabell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Charles Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold W Clarke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie L Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armor Correctional Health Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amonette
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A David Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystal Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?