David D. Denton v. JPMorgan Chase & CO. et al
Plaintiff: David D. Denton
Defendant: Langley Federal Credit Union, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., JPMorgan Chase & CO., Equifax Information Services, LLC, Chase Bank USA, N.A. and TransUnion LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01432
Filed: November 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Leonie M Brinkema
Referring Judge: Ivan D Davis
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Intradistrict Transfer to Newport News Division, 4:19cv114 (afar)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting #9 Motion to Transfer Venue. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 11/15/2019. (choy, )
November 13, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Transfer Case by David D. Denton. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rotkis, Susan)
November 12, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Chase Bank USA, N.A., Equifax Information Services, LLC, Experian Information Solutions, Inc., JPMorgan Chase & CO., Langley Federal Credit Union, TransUnion LLC. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two Electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(choy, )
November 11, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (choy, )
November 11, 2019 Filing 7 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint for TransUnion LLC by David D. Denton. (Rotkis, Susan)
November 11, 2019 Filing 6 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. by David D. Denton. (Rotkis, Susan)
November 11, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint for Equifax Information Services, LLC by David D. Denton. (Rotkis, Susan)
November 11, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint for Langley Federal Credit Union by David D. Denton. (Rotkis, Susan)
November 11, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint for Chase Bank USA, N.A. by David D. Denton. (Rotkis, Susan)
November 11, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint for JPMorgan Chase & CO. by David D. Denton. (Rotkis, Susan)
November 11, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6932035.), filed by David D. Denton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rotkis, Susan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: David D. Denton v. JPMorgan Chase & CO. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Langley Federal Credit Union
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase & CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Bank USA, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TransUnion LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David D. Denton
Represented By: Susan Mary Rotkis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?