Taylor v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: Amanda Taylor
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 1:2019cv01443
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29:1362
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/29/2020 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 501 before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/21/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga. Discovery due by 5/15/2020. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga on 1/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent, #2 Pretrial Notice)(dzir)
December 16, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Life Insurance Company of North America.(Constine, David)
November 27, 2019 Life Insurance Company of North America answer due 12/24/2019. (lcre, )
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 So Ordered that LINA shall have until December 24, 2019, to serve its responsive pleadings to the Complaint re #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings filed by Life Insurance Company of North America. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 11/27/2019. (lcre, )
November 27, 2019 Filing 5 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Constine, David)
November 27, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings by Life Insurance Company of North America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Constine, David)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Life Insurance Company of North America. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(dvanm, )
November 13, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Anthony J Trenga and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (dvanm, )
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Amanda Taylor. (Glass, Benjamin)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint For Long-Term Disability Benefits ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6935995.), filed by Amanda Taylor. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Glass, Benjamin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By: David Edward Constine, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Taylor
Represented By: Benjamin Weaver Glass, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?