LeGrand v. Hazelton USP
Plaintiff: Martell A LeGrand
Defendant: Hazelton USP
Case Number: 1:2019cv01479
Filed: November 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Leonie M Brinkema
Referring Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Case transferred from Virginia Eastern has been opened in Northern District of West Virginia as case 5:19-cv-00317. (aott, )
November 26, 2019 Case transferred to District of Northern District of West Virginia. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. (acha, ) .
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER- It is hereby ORDERED that this action be and is TRANSFERRED to the United States District court for the Northern District of West Virginia; and it is further ORDERED that LeGrand direct all future filings to the Clerk's Office for the United States District Court for the Northern District of West Virginia. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 11/25/2019. (See order for further details). (acha, ) Copies sent as directed in the order.
November 22, 2019 Filing 3 Acknowledgment of Receipt letter sent to Martell LeGrand. (acha, )
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Martell A LeGrand. (acha, )
November 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hazelton USP (Filing fee $ 400., not paid), filed by Martell A LeGrand. (Attachments: #1 Prisoner Data Report, #2 Envelope)(acha, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LeGrand v. Hazelton USP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martell A LeGrand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hazelton USP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?