Edwards v. Manis
Petitioner: Larry Alexander Edwards
Respondent: C. Manis
Case Number: 1:2019cv01510
Filed: December 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Ivan D Davis
Referring Judge: T S Ellis
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Notification of transfer of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus from the Western District of VA Case No. 7:19cv797 to the Eastern District of Virginia. (ldab, )
December 3, 2019 Filing 3 Case transferred in from District of Virginia Western; Case Number 7:19-cv-00797. Original file and docket sheet received. (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/3/2019: #2 Prisoner Data Report) (ldab, ).
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order transferring case to U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia. Signed by Judge James P. Jones on 12/2/2019. (tvt) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 12/3/2019.]
November 29, 2019 Filing Fee Received $ 5.00, receipt number 700062213. (aab) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 12/3/2019.]
November 27, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 USC 2254, filed by Larry Alexander Edwards. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Cover Letter)(slt) [Transferred from Virginia Western on 12/3/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards v. Manis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Larry Alexander Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: C. Manis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?