Garrett v. Delta Air Lines, Inc
Plaintiff: Christina Garrett
Defendant: Delta Air Lines, Inc
Case Number: 1:2019cv01512
Filed: December 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Rossie D Alston
Referring Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Christina Garrett. (Dure, Amanda)
January 14, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by James Peter Greco on behalf of Delta Air Lines, Inc (Greco, James)
January 13, 2020 Notice of Correction re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing Date or a Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument (choy, )
January 13, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Delta Air Lines, Inc. (Grace, Kathryn)
January 13, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Delta Air Lines, Inc. (Grace, Kathryn)
January 13, 2020 Filing 6 Delta Air Lines, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Delta Air Lines, Inc.(Grace, Kathryn)
January 2, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint and Summons served on Delta Airlines, Inc. on 12/23/2019, filed by Christina Garrett. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit USPS Receipt, #2 Exhibit USPS Tracking Information, #3 Exhibit USPS Return Receipt (Green Card))(Dure, Amanda)
December 3, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Delta Air Lines, Inc. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two Electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(choy, )
December 2, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (choy, )
December 2, 2019 Filing 3 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Christina Garrett. (Dure, Amanda)
December 2, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Christina Garrett. (Dure, Amanda)
December 2, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6964434.), filed by Christina Garrett. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dure, Amanda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Garrett v. Delta Air Lines, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Garrett
Represented By: Amanda Christina Dure
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Delta Air Lines, Inc
Represented By: James Peter Greco
Represented By: Kathryn Anne Grace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?