Puretalk Holdings, Inc. v. puretalk.com et al
Plaintiff: Puretalk Holdings, Inc.
Defendant: puretalk.com and John Doe
Case Number: 1:2019cv01532
Filed: December 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Rossie D Alston
Referring Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Order to Publish Notice of Action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 01/16/2020. (choy, )
January 15, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE by Puretalk Holdings, Inc. re #4 Memorandum in Support of Submission of Proposed Order (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Giroux, Danielle)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting #9 Motion for Pro hac vice for Eric Joseph Nathan. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 12/12/2019. (choy, )
December 9, 2019 Filing 9 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Eric Joseph Nathan and Certification of Local Counsel Danielle D. Giroux Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6975181. Corrected attachment for Document #7 by Puretalk Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application)(Giroux, Danielle)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #6 Motion for Pro hac vice as to Devin B. Phillips. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 12/06/2019. (choy, )
December 6, 2019 Notice of Correction: An incomplete document was filed. The filing user has been notified to refile the document #7 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Eric Joseph Nathan and Certification of Local Counsel Danielle D. Giroux Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6969561. (choy, )
December 5, 2019 Electronic Fee Payment - Pro Hac Vice as to #6 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Devin B. Phillips and Certification of Local Counsel Danielle D. Giroux by Puretalk Holdings, Inc.. Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6970149.. (Giroux, Danielle)
December 5, 2019 Filing 7 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Eric Joseph Nathan and Certification of Local Counsel Danielle D. Giroux Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6969561. by Puretalk Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application)(Giroux, Danielle)
December 5, 2019 Filing 6 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Devin B. Phillips and Certification of Local Counsel Danielle D. Giroux by Puretalk Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Application)(Giroux, Danielle)
December 4, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (choy, )
December 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Puretalk Holdings, Inc. re #3 MOTION for Service by Publication of Waiver of Oral Argument (Giroux, Danielle)
December 4, 2019 Filing 4 Memorandum in Support re #3 MOTION for Service by Publication filed by Puretalk Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Giroux, Danielle)
December 4, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Service by Publication by Puretalk Holdings, Inc.. (Giroux, Danielle)
December 4, 2019 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Puretalk Holdings, Inc.. (Giroux, Danielle)
December 4, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6969165.), filed by Puretalk Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Giroux, Danielle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Puretalk Holdings, Inc. v. puretalk.com et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: puretalk.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Puretalk Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Danielle Deanna Giroux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?