Noetic Specialty Insurance Company v. The North Carolina Mutual Wholesale Drug Company
Plaintiff: Noetic Specialty Insurance Company
Defendant: The North Carolina Mutual Wholesale Drug Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv01555
Filed: December 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Ivan D Davis
Referring Judge: T S Ellis
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 8, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Noetic Specialty Insurance Company. The North Carolina Mutual Wholesale Drug Company waiver sent on 12/17/2019, answer due 2/18/2020. (Lippincott, Kelly)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Pro hac vice for Agelo Larena Reppas. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 12/17/2019. (acha, )
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Pro hac vice for Adam Hoyt Flesicher. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 12/17/2019. (acha, )
December 13, 2019 Filing 4 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Agelo Larena Reppas and Certification of Local Counsel Kelly M. Lippincott Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6984195. by Noetic Specialty Insurance Company. (Lippincott, Kelly)
December 13, 2019 Filing 3 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Adam Hoyt Fleischer and Certification of Local Counsel Kelly M. Lippincott Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6984126. by Noetic Specialty Insurance Company. (Lippincott, Kelly)
December 11, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge T. S. Ellis, III and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (acha, )
December 11, 2019 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Noetic Specialty Insurance Company. (Lippincott, Kelly)
December 11, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6980678.), filed by Noetic Specialty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit E (continued), #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J)(Lippincott, Kelly)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Noetic Specialty Insurance Company v. The North Carolina Mutual Wholesale Drug Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The North Carolina Mutual Wholesale Drug Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noetic Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Kelly Marie Lippincott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?