Maglula, Ltd. v. Amazon.Com, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Maglula, Ltd.
Defendant: Amazon.Com, Inc. and Amazon.com Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv01570
Filed: December 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Ivan D Davis
Referring Judge: Liam O'Grady
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2020 Filing 33 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by John Desmarais and Certification of Local Counsel Justin Wilcox Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7062140. by Amazon.Com, Inc., Amazon.com Services, Inc.. (Wilcox, Justin)
February 6, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #20 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6), #23 MOTION to Compel Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration and, as a Result, Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Stay This Action, #26 MOTION to Transfer Case Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to the Western District of Washington Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1404(a). Motion Hearing set for 3/13/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 301 before District Judge Liam O'Grady. (clar, )
February 5, 2020 Filing 32 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Thomas Derbish and Certification of Local Counsel Justin Wilcox Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7059663. by Amazon.Com, Inc., Amazon.com Services, Inc.. (Wilcox, Justin)
February 5, 2020 Filing 31 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Priyanka Dev and Certification of Local Counsel Justin Wilcox Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7059653. by Amazon.Com, Inc., Amazon.com Services, Inc.. (Wilcox, Justin)
February 5, 2020 Filing 30 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Laurie Stempler and Certification of Local Counsel Justin Wilcox Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7059634. by Amazon.Com, Inc., Amazon.com Services, Inc.. (Wilcox, Justin)
February 5, 2020 Filing 29 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amazon.com Services, Inc., Amazon.Com, Inc.. (Wilcox, Justin)
February 5, 2020 Filing 28 Notice of Hearing Date set for 3/13/2020 re #26 MOTION to Transfer Case Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to the Western District of Washington Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1404(a) (Wilcox, Justin)
February 5, 2020 Filing 27 Memorandum in Support re #26 MOTION to Transfer Case Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to the Western District of Washington Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1404(a) filed by Amazon.Com, Inc., Amazon.com Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Yang Declaration, #2 Jensen Declaration, #3 Exhibit A to Jensen Declaration, #4 Exhibit B to Jensen Declaration, #5 Derbish Declaration, #6 Exhibit A to Derbish Declaration)(Wilcox, Justin)
February 5, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION to Transfer Case Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue to the Western District of Washington Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1404(a) by Amazon.Com, Inc., Amazon.com Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wilcox, Justin)
February 5, 2020 Filing 25 Notice of Hearing Date set for 3/13/2020 re #23 MOTION to Compel Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration and, as a Result, Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Stay This Action (Wilcox, Justin)
February 5, 2020 Filing 24 Memorandum in Support re #23 MOTION to Compel Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration and, as a Result, Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Stay This Action filed by Amazon.Com, Inc., Amazon.com Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Jensen Declaration, #2 Exhibit A to Jensen Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Jensen Declaration, #4 Dev Declaration, #5 Exhibit A to Dev Declaration, #6 Exhibit B to Dev Declaration, #7 Exhibit C to Dev Declaration, #8 Exhibit D to Dev Declaration)(Wilcox, Justin)
February 5, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION to Compel Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration and, as a Result, Dismiss or, in the Alternative, Stay This Action by Amazon.Com, Inc., Amazon.com Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wilcox, Justin)
February 5, 2020 Filing 22 Notice of Hearing Date set for 3/13/2020 re #20 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) (Wilcox, Justin)
February 5, 2020 Filing 21 Memorandum in Support re #20 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) filed by Amazon.Com, Inc., Amazon.com Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Yang Declaration, #2 Dev Declaration, #3 Exhibit A to Dev Declaration)(Wilcox, Justin)
February 5, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) by Amazon.Com, Inc., Amazon.com Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wilcox, Justin)
February 5, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Justin Patrick Daniel Wilcox on behalf of Amazon.Com, Inc., Amazon.com Services, Inc. (Wilcox, Justin)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CONSENT ORDER re #17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Pleadings or Motion in Response to Complaint filed by Maglula, Ltd. Defendants shall have up to and including February 5, 2020 to respond to the Complaint in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 1/3/20. (klau, )
January 3, 2020 Filing 17 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Pleadings or Motion in Response to Complaint by Maglula, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
December 18, 2019 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maglula, Ltd. as to Amazon.com Services, Inc. served on 12/16/2019, answer due 1/6/2020 (Berkowitz, Jeffrey) Modified text on 12/19/2019 (klau, ).
December 18, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maglula, Ltd. as to Amazon.Com, Inc. served on 12/16/2019, answer due 1/6/2020 (Berkowitz, Jeffrey) Modified text on 12/19/2019 (klau, ).
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Pro hac vice of Morgan Elizabeth Smith. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 12/16/2019. (lcre, )
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Pro hac vice of Danny Mahir Awdeh. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 12/16/2019. (lcre, )
December 13, 2019 Filing 12 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Morgan Elizabeth Smith and Certification of Local Counsel Jeffrey Allen Berkowitz Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6985255. by Maglula, Ltd.. (Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
December 13, 2019 Filing 11 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Danny Mahir Awdeh and Certification of Local Counsel Jeffrey Allen Berkowitz Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-6985242. by Maglula, Ltd.. (Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
December 13, 2019 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Amazon.Com, Inc., Amazon.com Services, Inc.. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Summons issued, #2 Notice to Attorney)(aott, )
December 13, 2019 Filing 9 Report on the filing or determination of a Copyright action. (aott, c/m with complaint 12/13/2019)
December 13, 2019 Filing 8 Report on the filing or determination of a Patent/Trademark action. (Attachments: #1 Trademark Form, #2 Complaint Part 1, #3 Complaint Part 2, #4 Complaint Part 3, #5 Complaint Part 4, #6 Complaint Part 5)(aott, c/s 12/13/2019) (Main Document 8 replaced on 12/13/2019) (aott, ). (Attachment 1 replaced on 12/13/2019) (aott, ).
December 13, 2019 Case transferred in from Richmond Division. Case Number 3:19-cv-922. (aott)
December 12, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Maglula, Ltd. Report On The Filing Or Determination Of An Action Regarding A Patent Or Trademark (AO 120) (Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
December 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Maglula, Ltd. Report On The Filing Or Determination Of An Action Or Appeal Regarding A Copyright (AO 121) (Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
December 12, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Maglula, Ltd. Report On The Filing Or Determination Of An Action Regarding A Patent Or Trademark (AO 120) (Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
December 12, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Maglula, Ltd.. (Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
December 12, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons Amazon.com Services, Inc. by Maglula, Ltd.. (Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
December 12, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons Amazon.com, Inc. by Maglula, Ltd.. (Berkowitz, Jeffrey)
December 12, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6981841.), filed by Maglula, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1A, #3 Exhibit 1B, #4 Exhibit 1C, #5 Exhibit 2, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Exhibit 4, #8 Exhibit 5, #9 Exhibit 6, #10 Exhibit 7, #11 Exhibit 8, #12 Exhibit 9, #13 Exhibit 10, #14 Exhibit 11, #15 Exhibit 12, #16 Exhibit 13, #17 Exhibit 14)(Berkowitz, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maglula, Ltd. v. Amazon.Com, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maglula, Ltd.
Represented By: Jeffrey Allen Berkowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.Com, Inc.
Represented By: Justin Patrick Daniel Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Services, Inc.
Represented By: Justin Patrick Daniel Wilcox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?