Matos v. American General Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Nilsa Velazquez Matos
Defendant: American General Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv01576
Filed: December 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Ivan D Davis
Referring Judge: T S Ellis
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order. Because the parties' Proposed Joint Discovery Plan #6 adequately addresses the matters that would be discussed during the initial pretrial conference and counsel consent to waiving their appearances at the initial pretrial conference, the initial pretrial conference scheduled for January 29, 2020, pursuant to Rule 16(b) and this Court's December 23, 2019 Order, is cancelled. Upon consideration of the representations made by the parties in their Proposed Joint Discovery Plan, the Court makes the following rulings: The parties' Joint Discovery Plan is approved and shall control discovery to the extent of its application unless further modified by the Court. See order for further details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 1/23/2020. (lgue, )
January 22, 2020 Filing 6 Joint Proposed Discovery Plan by American General Life Insurance Company.(Pocock, Donald)
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER:Initial Pretrial Conference set for 1/29/2020 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 301 before Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. Discovery due by 6/1/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 7/9/2020 at 04:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III (if the parties do not file dispositive motions). Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/10/2020 at 04:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge T. S. Ellis III (if the parties do file dispositive motions). Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 12/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent Form, #2 Pretrial Notice)(tran)
December 20, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by American General Life Insurance Company.(Pocock, Donald)
December 16, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge T. S. Ellis, III and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (klau, )
December 16, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American General Life Insurance Company. (Pocock, Donald)
December 16, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Donald Richard Pocock on behalf of American General Life Insurance Company (Pocock, Donald)
December 16, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of Removal from Fairfax County Circuit Court ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6986648.), filed by American General Life Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Record, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pocock, Donald) Modified text on 12/16/2019 (No Answer Filed) (klau, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Matos v. American General Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American General Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Donald Richard Pocock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nilsa Velazquez Matos
Represented By: Richard Dennis Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?