Microsoft Corporation v. John Does 1-2
Plaintiff: Microsoft Corporation
Defendant: John Does 1-2
Case Number: 1:2019cv01582
Filed: December 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Liam O'Grady
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 18:1030
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDERED Granting Plaintiff's Motion For Limited Authority to Conduct Discovery Necessary to Identify and Serve Doe Defendants; that Plaintiff may serve discovery on Internet Service providers, domain name registrars, domain hosting companies and payment providers for those entities for the limited purpose of identifying the Doe defendants; Plaintiff shall have until May 15, 2020 to complete his discovery; The hearing scheduled for Friday, January 24, 2020 is cancelled. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 01/21/2020. (choy, )
January 14, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Anderson. #29 MOTION For Limited Authority to Conduct Discovery Necessary to Identify and Serve Doe Defendants (clar, )
January 14, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #29 MOTION For Limited Authority to Conduct Discovery Necessary to Identify and Serve Doe Defendants . Motion Hearing set for 1/24/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 501 before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (clar, )
January 13, 2020 Filing 32 Notice of Hearing Date January 24, 2020 at 10:00 am re #29 MOTION For Limited Authority to Conduct Discovery Necessary to Identify and Serve Doe Defendants (O'Brien, David)
January 13, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE by Microsoft Corporation re #30 Brief in Support Proposed Order (O'Brien, David)
January 13, 2020 Filing 30 Brief in Support to #29 MOTION For Limited Authority to Conduct Discovery Necessary to Identify and Serve Doe Defendants filed by Microsoft Corporation. (O'Brien, David)
January 13, 2020 Filing 29 MOTION For Limited Authority to Conduct Discovery Necessary to Identify and Serve Doe Defendants by Microsoft Corporation. (O'Brien, David)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 1/3/2020. (awac, )
January 3, 2020 Filing 27 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Liam O'Grady:Motion Hearing held on 1/3/2020 re #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Microsoft Corporation. Counsel for Plaintiff enters their appearances and presents arguments. Court grants motion. Order to follow. (Court Reporter N. Linnell.)(awac, )
January 2, 2020 Filing 26 Proposed Preliminary Injunction Order by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Appendix Appendix A)(O'Brien, David) Modified on 1/2/2020 to edit the docket text (rban, ).
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Granting #24 Motion to Unseal Case ; for good cause shown, this matter is unsealed. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 12/27/2019. (choy, )
December 23, 2019 Filing 24 Notice of Execution of Temporary Restraining Order and Motion to Unseal Case by Microsoft Corporation. (choy, )
December 23, 2019 Filing 23 Temporary Restraining Order BOND in the amount of $ 50,000.00 posted by Microsoft Corporation (Attachments: #1 Voucher) (choy, )
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Pro hac vice for Richard Domingues Boscovich. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 12/18/2019. (choy, )
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting #5 Motion for Pro hac vice for Kayvan Ghaffari. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 12/18/2019. (choy, )
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting #4 Motion for Pro hac vice as to Gabriel M. Ramsey. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 12/18/2019. (choy, )
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Ex Parte Temporary Restraining Order and Order to Show Cause Re Preliminary Injunction. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 12/18/2019. (awac, )
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Seal. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 12/18/2019. (awac, )
December 18, 2019 Filing 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Liam O'Grady:Motion Hearing held on 12/18/2019 re #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Microsoft Corporation. Counsel for Plaintiff entered their appearances. No appearance for defendants. Mr. Ramsey presents argument. Motion granted. Order to follow. Motion Hearing on #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction set for 1/3/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 1000 before District Judge Liam O'Grady (Court Reporter N. Linnell.)(awac, )
December 18, 2019 Filing 16 Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark(s) See Attached List. (rban, )
December 18, 2019 Filing 15 Declaration of Kayvan M. Ghaffari in support of #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33)(rban, )
December 18, 2019 Filing 14 Declaration of David Anselmi in support of #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(rban, )
December 18, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Hearing by Microsoft Corporation re #12 Brief in Support, #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (rban, )
December 18, 2019 Filing 12 Brief in Support to #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Microsoft Corporation. (rban, )
December 18, 2019 Filing 11 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(rban, )
December 18, 2019 Filing 10 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(rban, )
December 18, 2019 Filing 9 Declaration of Gabriel M. Ramsey in Support of #7 MOTION to Seal by Microsoft Corporation. (rban, )
December 18, 2019 Filing 8 Brief in Support to #7 MOTION to Seal filed by Microsoft Corporation. (rban, )
December 18, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Seal by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(rban, )
December 18, 2019 Filing 6 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Microsoft Corporation. (rban, )
December 18, 2019 Filing 5 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Kayvan Ghaffari and Certification of Local Counsel David O'Brien by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Receipt)(rban, )
December 18, 2019 Filing 4 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Gabriel M. Ramsey and Certification of Local Counsel David O'Brien by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Receipt)(rban, )
December 18, 2019 Filing 3 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Richard Domingues Boscovich and Certification of Local Counsel David O'Brien by Microsoft Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Receipt)(rban, )
December 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by David William O'Brien on behalf of Microsoft Corporation. (rban, )
December 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Does 1-2, filed by Microsoft Corporation. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 14683082475.) (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Receipt)(rban, )
December 18, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #11 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. Motion Hearing set for 12/18/2019 at 02:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 1000 before District Judge Liam O'Grady. (rban, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Microsoft Corporation v. John Does 1-2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Microsoft Corporation
Represented By: David William O'Brien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?