Greenbridge Construction, Inc. v. Aegis Security Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Greenbridge Construction, Inc.
Defendant: Desbulid EG Management Services JV, LLC, Aegis Security Insurance Company and Hudson Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv01585
Filed: December 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:3131
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Upon review of the pleadings and the record, the court makes the following rulings: The Revised Rule 26(f) report filed by the parties is approved unless modified by the court herein or hereafter. See order for more details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 2/11/2020. (rban, )
February 11, 2020 Filing 14 REVISED Discovery Plan by Greenbridge Construction, Inc..(Webster, Lucas)
February 5, 2020 Filing 13 Consent Discovery Plan by Greenbridge Construction, Inc..(Webster, Lucas)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 2/12/2020 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 400 before Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. Final Pretrial Conference set for 6/18/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga. Discovery due by 6/12/2020. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga on 1/21/2020. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Consent, #2 Pretrial Notice)(dzir)
January 13, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Lee-Ann Christine Brown on behalf of Desbulid EG Management Services JV, LLC (Brown, Lee-Ann)
January 13, 2020 Filing 10 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Hudson Insurance Company. (Mervis, Jeffrey)
January 13, 2020 Filing 9 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Aegis Security Insurance Company. (Mervis, Jeffrey)
January 13, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by Aegis Security Insurance Company, Hudson Insurance Company.(Mervis, Jeffrey)
January 10, 2020 Filing 7 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Desbulid EG Management Services JV, LLC. (Patin, Douglas)
January 10, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Desbulid EG Management Services JV, LLC.(Patin, Douglas)
December 30, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Greenbridge Construction, Inc. Hudson Insurance Company served on 12/23/2019, answer due 1/13/2020 (Webster, Lucas)
December 30, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Greenbridge Construction, Inc. Aegis Security Insurance Company served on 12/23/2019, answer due 1/13/2020 (Webster, Lucas)
December 18, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Greenbridge Construction, Inc.. (Webster, Lucas)
December 18, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Aegis Security Insurance Company, Desbulid EG Management Services JV, LLC, Hudson Insurance Company. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(acha, )
December 18, 2019 Notice of Correction re #1 Complaint. The filing user has been notified to file the Corporate Disclosure Statement as separate event. (acha, )
December 18, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Anthony J Trenga and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (acha, )
December 18, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-6990565.), filed by Greenbridge Construction, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons - Aegis, #5 Summons - Desbuild, #6 Summons - Hudson, #7 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Webster, Lucas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Greenbridge Construction, Inc. v. Aegis Security Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Desbulid EG Management Services JV, LLC
Represented By: Lee-Ann Christine Brown
Represented By: Douglas L. Patin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aegis Security Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeffrey Marc Mervis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hudson Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeffrey Marc Mervis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greenbridge Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Lucas F. Webster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?