HTC Corporation et al v. Innovation Sciences, LLC
Plaintiff: HTC America, Inc. and HTC Corporation
Defendant: Innovation Sciences, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01620
Filed: December 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Ivan D Davis
Referring Judge: Liam O'Grady
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #21 MOTION for Summary Judgment HTC's Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 101. Motion Hearing set for 3/13/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 1000 before District Judge Liam O'Grady. (clar, )
February 20, 2020 Filing 23 Notice of Hearing Date March 13, 2020 re #21 MOTION for Summary Judgment HTC's Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 101 (Jacobs, Blair)
February 20, 2020 Filing 22 Memorandum in Support re #21 MOTION for Summary Judgment HTC's Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 101 filed by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Decl. of B. Jacobs, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4)(Jacobs, Blair)
February 20, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment HTC's Motion for Summary Judgment of Invalidity Under 35 U.S.C. 101 by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jacobs, Blair)
February 20, 2020 Filing 20 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Bruce Yen and Certification of Local Counsel Blair Jacobs Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7083790. by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. (Jacobs, Blair)
February 19, 2020 Filing 19 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Philip Ou and Certification of Local Counsel Blair Jacobs Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7081752. by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. (Jacobs, Blair)
February 19, 2020 Filing 18 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Yar R. Chaikovsky and Certification of Local Counsel Blair Jacobs Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7081736. by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. (Jacobs, Blair)
February 19, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Walter Drake Davis, Jr on behalf of Innovation Sciences, LLC (Davis, Walter)
February 18, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #14 MOTION to Dismiss and Alternative Motion to Transfer or Stay. Motion Hearing set for 3/6/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 1000 before District Judge Liam O'Grady. (clar, )
February 14, 2020 Filing 16 Notice of Hearing Date set for March 6, 2020 re #14 MOTION to Dismiss and Alternative Motion to Transfer or Stay (Jackson, Donald)
February 14, 2020 Filing 15 Memorandum in Support re #14 MOTION to Dismiss and Alternative Motion to Transfer or Stay filed by Innovation Sciences, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Wong Declaration, #2 Berquist Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14, #17 Exhibit 15)(Jackson, Donald)
February 14, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss and Alternative Motion to Transfer or Stay by Innovation Sciences, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jackson, Donald)
February 14, 2020 Filing 13 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Innovation Sciences, LLC. (Jackson, Donald)
February 14, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by James Daniel Berquist on behalf of Innovation Sciences, LLC (Berquist, James)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Innovation Sciences, LLC answer due 2/14/2020. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 1/31/2020. (rban, )
January 30, 2020 Filing 10 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Innovation Sciences, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jackson, Donald)
January 10, 2020 Filing 9 Certificate of Compliance by HTC Corporation, HTC America, Inc.. Innovation Sciences, LLC served on 1/10/2020, answer due 1/31/2020. (Jacobs, Blair) Modified text on 1/13/2020 to correct answer due date(klau, ).
January 10, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint with exhibits, Plaintiffs Financial Disclosure Statement, Summons, Notice, Report on Filing or Determination of Action re Patent or Trademark, Civil Cover Sheet, Notice of Related Cases served on Innovation Sciences, LLC c/o Commonwealth of Virginia - Jennifer Crown on 1/2/2020, filed by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. (Jacobs, Blair)
December 27, 2019 Filing 7 Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark(s) 10,104,425. (jlan)
December 27, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Innovation Sciences, LLC. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two Electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(jlan)
December 27, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Liam O'Grady and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (jlan)
December 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation (Notice of Related Cases) (Jacobs, Blair)
December 26, 2019 Filing 4 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. (Jacobs, Blair)
December 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation (Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Re a Patent or Trademark) (Jacobs, Blair)
December 26, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons by HTC America, Inc., HTC Corporation. (Jacobs, Blair)
December 26, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint for Declaratory Judgment ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7000111.), filed by HTC Corporation, HTC America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jacobs, Blair)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HTC Corporation et al v. Innovation Sciences, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Innovation Sciences, LLC
Represented By: Walter Drake Davis, Jr.
Represented By: James Daniel Berquist
Represented By: Donald Lee Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HTC America, Inc.
Represented By: Blair Martin Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HTC Corporation
Represented By: Blair Martin Jacobs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?