Bossen et al v. Lumber Liquidators, Inc
Plaintiff: Michel Bossen and Maria Viera
Defendant: Lumber Liquidators, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02822
Filed: May 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Thomas Rawles Jones
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2019 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Anthony J Trenga and Magistrate Judge Thomas Rawles Jones, Jr. (rban, )
May 2, 2019 Filing 12 Case transferred in from District of Florida Southern; Case Number 1:19-cv-21443. Original file and docket sheet received.
May 2, 2019 Civil Case Terminated per DE #11 Conditional Transfer Order. Closing Case. (mc) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/2/2019.]
May 2, 2019 Filing 11 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-48) transferring case to the Eastern District of Virginia re: MDL 2627 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Anthony J. Trenga. (Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel). (mc) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/2/2019.]
May 2, 2019 Filing 10 Courtesy Copy of CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-48) transferring case to the Eastern District of Virginia re: MDL 2627 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Anthony J. Trenga. (Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel). (Awaiting certified copy from the transferee court). (mc) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/2/2019.]
May 2, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Compliance by MICHEL Bossen, MARIA VIERA re #8 Scheduling Order, (Rodal, Yechezkel) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/2/2019.]
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 AMENDED ORDER SETTING INITIAL PLANNING AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Joint Scheduling Report due by 5/24/2019 Scheduling Conference set for 6/7/2019 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 4/24/2019. See attached document for full details. (jas) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/2/2019.]
April 23, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Compliance by MICHEL Bossen, MARIA VIERA re #6 Scheduling Order, (Rodal, Yechezkel) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/2/2019.]
April 22, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Lumber Liquidators, Inc. Attorney Spencer Hal Silverglate added to party Lumber Liquidators, Inc(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Silverglate, Spencer) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/2/2019.]
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PLANNING AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Joint Scheduling Report due by 5/24/2019 Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference set for 6/7/2019 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 4/18/2019. See attached document for full details. (ebz) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/2/2019.]
April 15, 2019 Filing 4 Corrected Summons Issued as to Lumber Liquidators, Inc. (mee) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/2/2019.]
April 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Lumber Liquidators, Inc. (mee) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/2/2019.]
April 15, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee) Text Modified on 4/16/2019 (mee). [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/2/2019.]
April 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lumber Liquidators, Inc. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11559734, filed by MICHEL Bossen, MARIA VIERA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Patti, Thomas) [Transferred from Florida Southern on 5/2/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bossen et al v. Lumber Liquidators, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lumber Liquidators, Inc.
Represented By: Spencer Hal Silverglate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michel Bossen
Represented By: Thomas John Patti, III
Represented By: Yechezkel Rodal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Viera
Represented By: Thomas John Patti, III
Represented By: Yechezkel Rodal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?