Christina Labajo et al v. Capital One Bank USA, N.A. et al DO NOT FILE IN THIS CASE, E-FILE in # 1:19md02915.
Plaintiff: Mary Yoon and Christina Labajo
Defendant: Capital One N.A., Capital One Bank (U.S.A.), N.A., and Capital One Financial Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv02928
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Filing 16 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 5:19-cv-01431. Original file and docket sheet received.
October 11, 2019 Filing 15 Transfer Order from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2915, transferring case to USDC, Eastern District of Virginia and assigned to Honorable Anthony J. Trenga. Case transferred electronically. (twdb) [Transferred from California Central on 10/15/2019.]
October 7, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF JPML DECISION filed by Defendant Capital One Bank USA, N.A., Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - JPML Decision)(Lawless, John) [Transferred from California Central on 10/15/2019.]
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: Granting #9 MOTION to Stay Proceedings. NOTE CHANGES MADE BY COURT. Counsel shall file a status report within 5 days of the MDL Panel's decision. Case Terminated MD JS-6. (twdb) [Transferred from California Central on 10/15/2019.]
September 9, 2019 Filing 12 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Capital One, N.A. answer now due 10/9/2019; Capital One Bank USA, N.A. answer now due 10/9/2019; Capital One Financial Corporation answer now due 10/9/2019, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Capital One, N.A.; Capital One Bank USA, N.A.; Capital One Financial Corporation.(Lawless, John) [Transferred from California Central on 10/15/2019.]
September 4, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending RESOLUTION OF MOTION FOR TRANSFER AND CONSOLIDATION UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1407 BEFORE THE JPML #9 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ad) [Transferred from California Central on 10/15/2019.]
September 3, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Capital One Bank USA, N.A., Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One, N.A., (Lawless, John) [Transferred from California Central on 10/15/2019.]
September 3, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Stay Case pending RESOLUTION OF MOTION FOR TRANSFER AND CONSOLIDATION UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1407 BEFORE THE JPML filed by Defendant Capital One Bank USA, N.A., Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney John R Lawless, Jr added to party Capital One Bank USA, N.A.(pty:dft), Attorney John R Lawless, Jr added to party Capital One Financial Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney John R Lawless, Jr added to party Capital One, N.A.(pty:dft)) (Lawless, John) [Transferred from California Central on 10/15/2019.]
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima) [Transferred from California Central on 10/15/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Capital One Bank USA, N.A., Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One, N.A. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 10/15/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 10/15/2019.]
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Jesus G. Bernal and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 10/15/2019.]
August 1, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiffs Christina Labajo, Mary Yoon. (Smith, Joel) [Transferred from California Central on 10/15/2019.]
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Christina Labajo, Mary Yoon, (Smith, Joel) [Transferred from California Central on 10/15/2019.]
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Christina Labajo, Mary Yoon. (Smith, Joel) [Transferred from California Central on 10/15/2019.]
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-24191149 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Christina Labajo, Mary Yoon. (Attorney Joel D Smith added to party Christina Labajo(pty:pla), Attorney Joel D Smith added to party Mary Yoon(pty:pla))(Smith, Joel) [Transferred from California Central on 10/15/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christina Labajo et al v. Capital One Bank USA, N.A. et al DO NOT FILE IN THIS CASE, E-FILE in # 1:19md02915.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One N.A.
Represented By: John R. Lawless, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank (U.S.A.), N.A.,
Represented By: John R. Lawless, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Financial Corporation
Represented By: John R. Lawless, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Yoon
Represented By: Joel D. Smith
Represented By: Frederick John Klorczyk, III
Represented By: Lawrence Timothy Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Labajo
Represented By: Joel D. Smith
Represented By: Frederick John Klorczyk, III
Represented By: Lawrence Timothy Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?