Tsirigos et al v. Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. DO NOT FILE IN THIS CASE, E-FILE in # 1:19md02915.
Plaintiff: Jane Doe, Allen Moure, Nicholas Tsirigos, Vaseleke Inembolidis and James Arnold
Defendant: Capital One Bank (U.S.A.), N.A.,
Case Number: 1:2019cv02933
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 12 Case transferred in from District of New York Eastern; Case Number 1:19-cv-04507. Original file and docket sheet received.
October 17, 2019 Case transferred to District of Eastern District of Virginia. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Marziliano, August) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/18/2019.]
October 17, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFIED COPY OF JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order CTO-1: Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Eastern District of Virginia for the reasons stated in the order of October 2, 2019, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Anthony J. Trenga. (Marziliano, August) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/18/2019.]
October 15, 2019 Filing 10 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order CTO-1: Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. 1407 to the Eastern District of Virginia for the reasons stated in the order of October 2, 2019, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Anthony J. Trenga. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia. (Marziliano, August) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/18/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER granting in part #8 . This action is stayed until the date on which the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation issues a decision on the motion to transfer, or November 1, 2019, whichever comes first. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 8/26/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/18/2019.]
August 22, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. identifying Corporate Parent Capital One Financial Corporation for Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.. (Isajiw, Peter) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/18/2019.]
August 22, 2019 Filing 8 Letter MOTION to Stay all proceedings and deadlines without opposition until the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation resolves the Motions for Consolidation and Transfer Under 28 U.S.C. 1407 filed in In re Capital One Consumer Data Breach Litigation, MDL No. 2915 by Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order) (Isajiw, Peter) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/18/2019.]
August 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Warren Gray, Jr on behalf of Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. (aty to be noticed) (Gray, Robert) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/18/2019.]
August 19, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Nicholas Tsirigos, Allen Moure, James Arnold, Vaseleke Inembolidis, Jane Doe. Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. waiver sent on 8/19/2019, answer due 10/18/2019. (Sheehan, Spencer) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/18/2019.]
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Status Conference is set for 9/19/2019 at 5:15 PM in Chambers 704S. SEE ATTACHED MANDATORY REQUIREMENTS FOR THE CONFERENCE. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 8/8/2019. (Weisberg, Peggy) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/18/2019.]
August 7, 2019 Filing 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/18/2019.]
August 7, 2019 Filing 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/18/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/18/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Case assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/18/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11732309 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Nicholas Tsirigos, Allen Moure, James Arnold, Vaseleke Inembolidis, Jane Doe. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons) (Sheehan, Spencer) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 10/18/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tsirigos et al v. Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. DO NOT FILE IN THIS CASE, E-FILE in # 1:19md02915.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Doe
Represented By: Spencer I. Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen Moure
Represented By: Spencer I. Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Tsirigos
Represented By: Spencer I. Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vaseleke Inembolidis
Represented By: Spencer I. Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Arnold
Represented By: Spencer I. Sheehan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank (U.S.A.), N.A.,
Represented By: Robert Warren Gray, Jr
Represented By: Peter Joseph Isajiw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?