Summer et al v. Amazon Web Services Inc et al DO NOT FILE IN THIS CASE, E-FILE in # 1:19md02915.
Plaintiff: Steven Summer and Katelyn Vita
Defendant: Capital One Financial Corporation and Amazon Web Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02937
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 21 Case transferred in from District of Washington Western; Case Number 2:19-cv-01304. Original file and docket sheet received.
October 17, 2019 Filing 20 MDL 2915 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CT -1); In re Capital One Consumer Data Security Breach Litigation; Eastern District of Virginia; assigned to Judge Anthony J. Trenga. (PM) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]
October 7, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Conditional Transfer Order ; filed by Defendant Capital One Financial Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-1))(Hade, Kellen) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #15 Stipulated MOTION to Stay, signed by Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]
September 6, 2019 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Amazon.com Inc for Amazon Web Services Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Amazon Web Services Inc (Ware, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]
September 6, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jeffrey A. Ware on behalf of Defendant Amazon Web Services Inc. (Ware, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]
September 6, 2019 NOTE: Document #15 was filed incorrectly. Appearance of attorney Jeffrey A. Ware is not proper, and notices of electronic filing will not be sent until corrected. Signatures must be in accordance with FRCP 11 and LCR 83.2(a) and must comply with #ECF Filing Procedures. (MW) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]
September 5, 2019 Attorney Steven A Miller, Kellen Andrew Hade for Capital One Financial Corporation added; per #13 Notice of Appearance. (MW) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]
September 5, 2019 Filing 15 Stipulated MOTION to Stay , filed by Defendant Capital One Financial Corporation. Noting Date 9/5/2019, (Oates, Daniel) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]
September 5, 2019 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Capital One Financial Corporation (Oates, Daniel) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]
September 5, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Daniel J. Oates on behalf of Defendant Capital One Financial Corporation. (Oates, Daniel) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]
August 27, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Related Case(s) 2:19-cv-01189-BJR; 2:19-cv-01203-MAT; 2:19-cv-01218-RSM; 2:19-cv-01223-MLP; 2:19-cv-01303-BJR, by Plaintiffs Steven Summer, Katelyn Vita. (Drachler, Dan) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Henry Jacob Avery on behalf of Plaintiffs Steven Summer, Katelyn Vita. (Avery, Henry) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER re #7 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Carl V Malmstrom for Plaintiffs Steven Summer and Katelyn Vita, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)[Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Matthew M Guiney for Plaintiffs Steven Summer and Katelyn Vita, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS)[Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #5 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Fred Taylor Isquith for Plaintiffs Steven Summer and Katelyn Vita, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]
August 21, 2019 Filing 7 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Carl V. Malmstrom FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Steven Summer, Katelyn Vita (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5895075 (Drachler, Dan) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Matthew M. Guiney FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Steven Summer, Katelyn Vita (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5895062 (Drachler, Dan) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Fred T. Isquith FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiffs Steven Summer, Katelyn Vita (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-5895049 (Drachler, Dan) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]
August 21, 2019 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER for Civil Cases Assigned to Judge Richard A. Jones. (VE) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]
August 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (MET) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See Attached Letter for More Information and Instructions. (SNP) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Judge Richard A. Jones added. (SNP) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]
August 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant(s) Amazon Web Services, Inc., Capital One Financial Corporation with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5891422) Attorney Dan Drachler added to party Steven Summer(pty:pla), Attorney Dan Drachler added to party Katelyn Vita(pty:pla), filed by Steven Summer, Katelyn Vita. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Drachler, Dan) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Summer et al v. Amazon Web Services Inc et al DO NOT FILE IN THIS CASE, E-FILE in # 1:19md02915.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Financial Corporation
Represented By: Kellen Andrew Hade
Represented By: Steven A. Miller
Represented By: Daniel J. Oates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Web Services, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Summer
Represented By: Matthew M. Guiney
Represented By: Dan Drachler
Represented By: Fred Taylor Isquith
Represented By: Carl V. Malmstrom
Represented By: Henry Jacob Avery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katelyn Vita
Represented By: Matthew M. Guiney
Represented By: Dan Drachler
Represented By: Fred Taylor Isquith
Represented By: Carl V. Malmstrom
Represented By: Henry Jacob Avery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?