Lundgren et al v. Capital One Financial Corporation et al DO NOT FILE IN THIS CASE, E-FILE in # 1:19md02915.
Plaintiff: Belinda Aylward, Timothy St Cyr, John Lundgren and Gary Stalls
Defendant: Capital One N.A., Capital One Bank (U.S.A.), N.A.,, Capital One Financial Corporation and Amazon Web Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02938
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 26 Case transferred in from District of Washington Western; Case Number 2:19-cv-01361. Original file and docket sheet received.
October 17, 2019 Filing 25 MDL 2915 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO -1); In re Capital One Consumer Data Security Breach Litigation; Eastern District of Virginia; assigned to Judge Anthony J. Trenga. (PM) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]
October 7, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE of Conditional Transfer Order ; filed by Defendants Capital One Bank (USA) NA, Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One NA. (Attachments: #1 Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-1))(Hade, Kellen) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]
September 13, 2019 Filing 23 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon Defendant Amazon Web Services, Inc mailed on 9/6/2019 (Maurer, Michael) Modified docket text on 9/16/2019 (MW). [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]
September 9, 2019 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Capital One, N.A. mailed on 9/6/2019 (Maurer, Michael) Modified on 9/10/2019 to edit docket text (TH). [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]
September 9, 2019 Filing 21 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. mailed on 9/6/2019 (Maurer, Michael) Modified on 9/10/2019 to edit docket text (TH). [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]
September 9, 2019 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE of Summons upon defendant Capital One Financial Corporation mailed on 9/6/2019 (Maurer, Michael) Modified on 9/10/2019 to edit docket text (TH). [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]
September 6, 2019 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Amazon.com Inc for Amazon Web Services Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Amazon Web Services Inc (Ware, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]
September 6, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jeffrey A. Ware on behalf of Defendant Amazon Web Services Inc. (Ware, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER: Present before the Court is a stipulated motion to stay. #16 . The motion asks the Court to stay these proceedings pending resolution of the motions to transfer and consolidate related cases before the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (JPML). The JPML will hear oral argument on the Section 1407 motions on September 26, 2019. The Court finds good cause to grant the motion. Therefore, it is ordered that this action is STAYED. Counsel will submit a joint status report on or before October 31, 2019 addressing the posture of the case in light of the JPML proceedings. So ordered. Authorized by Judge Barbara Jacobs Rothstein on September 6, 2019. (TH) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]
September 6, 2019 NOTE re: Document #16 . Appearance of attorney Jeffrey Ware is not proper, and notices of electronic filing will not be sent until corrected. Signatures must be in accordance with FRCP 11 and LCR 83.2(a) and must comply with #ECF Filing Procedures. (TH) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]
September 5, 2019 Attorney Steven A Miller,Kellen Andrew Hade for Capital One Bank (USA) NA,Steven A Miller,Kellen Andrew Hade for Capital One Financial Corporation,Steven A Miller,Kellen Andrew Hade for Capital One NA added; per #14 Notice of Appearance. (TH)[Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]
September 5, 2019 Filing 16 Stipulated MOTION to Stay , filed by Defendants Capital One Bank (USA) NA, Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One NA. Noting Date 9/5/2019, (Oates, Daniel) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]
September 5, 2019 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Other Affiliate Capital One Bank (USA), N.A., Other Affiliate Capital One, N.A. for Capital One Financial Corporation. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Capital One Bank (USA) NA, Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One NA (Oates, Daniel) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]
September 5, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Daniel J. Oates on behalf of Defendants Capital One Bank (USA) NA, Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One NA. (Oates, Daniel) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER transferring this case to the Honorable Barbara J. Rothstein as related to cause number C19-1189BJR. All future pleadings shall bear the cause number C19-1361BJR. Authorized by Judge James L. Robart. (SWT) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]
August 30, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Related Case(s) by Plaintiffs Belinda Aylward, John Lundgren, Timothy St Cyr, Gary Stalls. (Maurer, Michael) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]
August 30, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE TO FILER: re #2 Civil Cover Sheet. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. Notice of Related Case must be filed by 9/4/2019. (MET) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]
August 30, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Association of Attorney by Charles Hausberg on behalf of Plaintiffs Belinda Aylward, John Lundgren, Timothy St Cyr, Gary Stalls. (Hausberg, Charles) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]
August 29, 2019 Filing 9 Summons(es) Electronically Issued as to defendant(s) Amazon Web Services Inc, Capital One Bank (USA) NA, Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One NA (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (SNP) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]
August 29, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Complaint. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. (SNP) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]
August 29, 2019 Judge James L. Robart added. (SNP) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]
August 28, 2019 Filing 7 PRAECIPE TO ISSUE SUMMONS by Plaintiffs Belinda Aylward, John Lundgren, Timothy St. Cyr, Gary Stalls (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(Maurer, Michael) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]
August 28, 2019 Filing 6 PLEASE DISREGARD; SUMMONS FILED USING INCORRECT EVENT AND WILL BE REFILED SERVICE OF SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted - attempted upon defendant Capital One, N.A.. (Maurer, Michael) Modified on 8/28/2019 (ELS). [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]
August 28, 2019 Filing 5 PLEASE DISREGARD; SUMMONS FILED USING INCORRECT EVENT AND WILL BE REFILED SERVICE OF SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted - attempted upon defendant Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.. (Maurer, Michael) Modified on 8/28/2019 (ELS). [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]
August 28, 2019 Filing 4 PLEASE DISREGARD; SUMMONS FILED USING INCORRECT EVENT AND WILL BE REFILED SERVICE OF SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted - attempted upon defendant Amazon Web Services, INC. (Maurer, Michael) Modified on 8/28/2019 (ELS). [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]
August 28, 2019 Filing 3 PLEASE DIREGARD; SUMMONS FILED USING INCORRECT EVENT AND WILL BE REFILED SERVICE OF SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted - attempted upon defendant Capital One Financial Corporation. (Maurer, Michael) Modified on 8/28/2019 (ELS). [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]
August 28, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET ; filed by Plaintiffs Belinda Aylward, John Lundgren, Timothy St. Cyr, Gary Stalls. (Maurer, Michael) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]
August 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Class Action against All Defendants with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5904065), filed by Belinda Aylward, John Lundgren, Timothy St. Cyr, Gary Stalls.(Maurer, Michael) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lundgren et al v. Capital One Financial Corporation et al DO NOT FILE IN THIS CASE, E-FILE in # 1:19md02915.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One N.A.
Represented By: Steven A. Miller
Represented By: Kellen Andrew Hade
Represented By: Daniel J. Oates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank (U.S.A.), N.A.,
Represented By: Steven A. Miller
Represented By: Kellen Andrew Hade
Represented By: Daniel J. Oates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Financial Corporation
Represented By: Steven A. Miller
Represented By: Kellen Andrew Hade
Represented By: Daniel J. Oates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Web Services, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Belinda Aylward
Represented By: Charles Hausberg
Represented By: Michael A. Maurer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy St Cyr
Represented By: Charles Hausberg
Represented By: Michael A. Maurer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Lundgren
Represented By: Charles Hausberg
Represented By: Michael A. Maurer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Stalls
Represented By: Charles Hausberg
Represented By: Michael A. Maurer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?