Curtis et al v. Capital One Financial Corporation et al DO NOT FILE IN THIS CASE, E-FILE in # 1:19md02915.
Plaintiff: Howard Chen, Jarod Thrush, Ursula N Riley and Dustin Curtis
Defendant: Amazon Web Services, Inc. and Capital One Financial Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv02939
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 13 Case transferred in from District of Washington Western; Case Number 2:19-cv-01366. Original file and docket sheet received.
October 17, 2019 Filing 12 MDL 2915 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO -1); In re Capital One Consumer Data Security Breach Litigation; Eastern District of Virginia; assigned to Judge Anthony J. Trenga. (PM) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]
October 7, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Conditional Transfer Order ; filed by Defendant Capital One Financial Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-1))(Hade, Kellen) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]
September 11, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER granting parties' #5 Stipulated Motion to Stay. Any party may move to lift the stay if the JPML decides not to transfer this case. In addition, the parties shall inform the Court of the JPMLs decision no later than seven days after it is issued. Authorized by U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour. (TH) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]
September 10, 2019 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Clerk William M McCool. Case reassigned to U.S. District Judge John C Coughenour and referred Hon. Brian A Tsuchida pursuant to Local Rule MJR 6 and General Order 02-19. (AE) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]
September 6, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 9/13/2019. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (AE) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]
September 6, 2019 Filing 7 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Amazon.com Inc for Amazon Web Services Inc. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Amazon Web Services Inc (Ware, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]
September 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Jeffrey A. Ware on behalf of Defendant Amazon Web Services Inc. (Ware, Jeffrey) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]
September 5, 2019 NOTE re: Document #5 . Appearance of attorney Jeffrey Ware is not proper, and notices of electronic filing will not be sent until corrected. Signatures must be in accordance with FRCP 11 and LCR 83.2(a) and must comply with #ECF Filing Procedures. This can be corrected by filing a notice of appearance. (SWT) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]
September 5, 2019 Attorneys Steven A Miller, Kellen Andrew Hade for Capital One Financial Corporation added; per #3 Notice of Appearance. (SWT) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 Stipulated MOTION to Stay , filed by Defendant Capital One Financial Corporation. Noting Date 9/5/2019, (Oates, Daniel) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Capital One Financial Corporation (Oates, Daniel) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]
September 5, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Daniel J. Oates on behalf of Defendant Capital One Financial Corporation. (Oates, Daniel) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]
August 30, 2019 Filing 2 Summonses Electronically Issued as to defendants Capital One Financial Corporation and Amazon Web Services Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(GT) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]
August 30, 2019 Hon. Brian A Tsuchida added. (GT) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]
August 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Class Action Complaint against defendant(s) Amazon Web Services, Inc., Capital One Financial Corporation with JURY DEMAND (Receipt # 0981-5904600) Attorney Thomas E Loeser added to party Howard Chen(pty:pla), Attorney Thomas E Loeser added to party Dustin Curtis(pty:pla), Attorney Thomas E Loeser added to party Ursula N. Riley(pty:pla), Attorney Thomas E Loeser added to party Jarod Thrush(pty:pla), filed by Jarod Thrush, Dustin Curtis, Howard Chen, Ursula N. Riley. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Capital One Financial Corporation, #3 Summons Amazon Web Services, Inc.)(Loeser, Thomas) [Transferred from Washington Western on 10/18/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Curtis et al v. Capital One Financial Corporation et al DO NOT FILE IN THIS CASE, E-FILE in # 1:19md02915.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Web Services, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Ware
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Financial Corporation
Represented By: Kellen Andrew Hade
Represented By: Steven A. Miller
Represented By: Daniel J. Oates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Chen
Represented By: Shelby R. Smith
Represented By: Thomas E. Loeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jarod Thrush
Represented By: Shelby R. Smith
Represented By: Thomas E. Loeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ursula N Riley
Represented By: Shelby R. Smith
Represented By: Thomas E. Loeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin Curtis
Represented By: Shelby R. Smith
Represented By: Thomas E. Loeser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?