Janik v. Capital One Financial Corporation et al DO NOT FILE IN THIS CASE, E-FILE in # 1:19md02915.
Plaintiff: Marsha Janik
Defendant: Capital One, National Association, Capital One Bank (U.S.A.), N.A., and Capital One Financial Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv02941
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2019 Filing 15 Case transferred in from District of Connecticut; Case Number 3:19-cv-01242. Original file and docket sheet received.
October 17, 2019 Filing 14 MDL Transfer Order. Case transferred to the Eastern District of Virginia. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols, MDL Panel on 10/15/2019. (Peterson, M) [Transferred from Connecticut on 10/18/2019.]
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER. The #12 motion to stay is hereby GRANTED. The parties shall file a joint status report within 30 days of this order indicating the status of the proceedings before the JPMDL.Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 10/1/2019. (Hausmann, Amy) [Transferred from Connecticut on 10/18/2019.]
August 30, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Stay or, in the Alternative, for an Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by Capital One Bank (USA), N.A., Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One, National Association.Responses due by 9/20/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order Staying Proceedings)(Cherico, Joseph) [Transferred from Connecticut on 10/18/2019.]
August 30, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Capital One Bank (USA), N.A., Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One, National Association. (Cherico, Joseph) [Transferred from Connecticut on 10/18/2019.]
August 30, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph J. Cherico on behalf of Capital One Bank (USA), N.A., Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One, National Association (Cherico, Joseph) [Transferred from Connecticut on 10/18/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Capital One Bank (USA), N.A. waiver sent on 8/15/2019, answer due 10/14/2019 filed by Marsha Janik. (Rubinow, Laurie) [Transferred from Connecticut on 10/18/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Capital One, National Association waiver sent on 8/15/2019, answer due 10/14/2019 filed by Marsha Janik. (Rubinow, Laurie) [Transferred from Connecticut on 10/18/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Capital One Financial Corporation waiver sent on 8/15/2019, answer due 10/14/2019 filed by Marsha Janik. (Rubinow, Laurie) [Transferred from Connecticut on 10/18/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Capital One Bank (USA), N.A., Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One, National Association* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Laurie Rubinow* *Sheperd Finkelman Miller & Shah, LLP-CT* *65 Main St.* *Chester, CT 06412*. (Peterson, M) [Transferred from Connecticut on 10/18/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Protective Order, #1 Complaint, filed by Marsha Janik, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 08/09/2019.(Peterson, M) [Transferred from Connecticut on 10/18/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 08/09/2019. (Peterson, M) [Transferred from Connecticut on 10/18/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 08/09/2019. (Peterson, M) [Transferred from Connecticut on 10/18/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/8/2019. Discovery due by 2/8/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 3/14/2020. Signed by Clerk on 08/09/2019. (Peterson, M) [Transferred from Connecticut on 10/18/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Judge Michael P. Shea added. (Oliver, T.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 10/18/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Capital One Bank (USA), N.A., Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One, National Association. (Rubinow, Laurie) Modified on 8/9/2019 to correct party (Hushin, Z.). [Transferred from Connecticut on 10/18/2019.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Capital One Bank (USA), N.A., Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One, National Association ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5393698.), filed by Marsha Janik. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rubinow, Laurie) Modified on 8/9/2019 to correct parties (Hushin, Z.). [Transferred from Connecticut on 10/18/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Janik v. Capital One Financial Corporation et al DO NOT FILE IN THIS CASE, E-FILE in # 1:19md02915.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One, National Association
Represented By: Joseph J. Cherico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank (U.S.A.), N.A.,
Represented By: Joseph J. Cherico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Financial Corporation
Represented By: Joseph J. Cherico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marsha Janik
Represented By: Laurie Rubinow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?