Fisher et al v. Capital One Financial Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Casey Thaxton, Belinda L. Fisher, Amanda Stevens, Howard Clark and James Scott Jewell
Defendant: Capital One Bank (U.S.A.), N.A.,, Capital One Financial Corporation and Capital One, N. A.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02960
Filed: October 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Office: Alexandria Office
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Pretrial Order #5 re electronic filings and foreign attorney's. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 12/11/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA(aott, )
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Amended Pretrial Order #4. Continuing Initial Status and Rule 16(b) Conferences; directing that the presently scheduled Status and 16(b) Conferences for 1/29/2020 at 10:00 am are now scheduled for 1/29/2020 at 11:00 am. (See order for details). Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 12/10/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA(aott, )
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Pretrial Order #4. Continuing Initial Status and Rule 16(b) Conferences. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 12/9/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA(aott, )
December 2, 2019 Filing 21 Pretrial Order #3 - Appointing Plaintiffs' Lead Counsel. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA(aott, )
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Pretrial Order #2 - Appointing Defendants' Lead Counsel. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 11/12/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA(aott, c/m 11/12/2019)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Initial Order. Pretrial Order #1 Setting Initial Conference and General Matters. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 11/1/2019. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA(aott, )
October 22, 2019 Filing 18 Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 3:19-cv-04485. Original file and docket sheet received.
October 21, 2019 Filing 17 MDL 2915 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to the USDC-Eastern Virginia. Signed by Sarah S. Vance, Chair. (hdjS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/22/2019.]
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER. The case is stayed pending resolution of the JPML proceedings. Signed by Judge James Donato on 8/26/2019. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (jdlc1S, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/22/2019.]
August 23, 2019 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Casey Thaxton, Belinda L. Fisher, Howard Clark, James Scott Jewell, Amanda Stevens. Service waived by Capital One N. A. waiver sent on 8/21/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (Heikali, Benjamin) (Filed on 8/23/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/22/2019.]
August 23, 2019 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Casey Thaxton, Belinda L. Fisher, Howard Clark, James Scott Jewell, Amanda Stevens. Service waived by Capital One Financial Corporation waiver sent on 8/21/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (Heikali, Benjamin) (Filed on 8/23/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/22/2019.]
August 23, 2019 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Casey Thaxton, Belinda L. Fisher, Howard Clark, James Scott Jewell, Amanda Stevens. Service waived by Capital One Bank (USA) N. A. waiver sent on 8/21/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (Heikali, Benjamin) (Filed on 8/23/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/22/2019.]
August 22, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Stay re #1 Complaint, Capital One Defendants' Unopposed Motion to Stay or, In the Alternative, For An Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint filed by Capital One Bank (USA) N. A., Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One N. A.. Motion Hearing set for 9/26/2019 10:00 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom 11, 19th Floor before Judge James Donato. Responses due by 9/5/2019. Replies due by 9/12/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Proposed Order)(Morris, George) (Filed on 8/22/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/22/2019.]
August 22, 2019 Filing 11 Certificate of Interested Entities by Capital One Bank (USA) N. A., Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One N. A. identifying Corporate Parent Capital One Financial Corp. for Capital One Bank (USA) N. A., Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One N. A.. Defendants Capital One - FRCP 7-1; Civil Local Rule 3-15 (Morris, George) (Filed on 8/22/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/22/2019.]
August 22, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by George Ruben Morris Counsel for Defendants Capital One (Morris, George) (Filed on 8/22/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/22/2019.]
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge James Donato for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 8/21/19. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2019) Modified on 8/22/2019 (gbaS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/22/2019.]
August 20, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (ahm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/22/2019.]
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Howard Clark, Belinda L. Fisher, James Scott Jewell, Amanda Stevens, Casey Thaxton.. (Heikali, Benjamin) (Filed on 8/15/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/22/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Capital One Bank (USA) N. A., Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One N. A.. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/22/2019.]
August 6, 2019 Filing 5 Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/24/2019. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/31/2019 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom F, 15th Floor. (slhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/22/2019.]
August 2, 2019 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Scott Corley. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/16/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/22/2019.]
August 1, 2019 Filing 3 Certificate of Interested Entities by Howard Clark, Belinda L. Fisher, James Scott Jewell, Amanda Stevens, Casey Thaxton (Heikali, Benjamin) (Filed on 8/1/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/22/2019.]
August 1, 2019 Filing 2 Proposed Summons. (Heikali, Benjamin) (Filed on 8/1/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 10/22/2019.]
August 1, 2019 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT against Capital One Bank (USA) N. A., Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One N. A. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0971-13575509). Filed by Casey Thaxton, Belinda L. Fisher, Howard Clark, James Scott Jewell, Amanda Stevens. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Heikali, Benjamin) (Filed on 8/1/2019) Modified on 8/6/2019 (slhS, COURT STAFF). [Transferred from California Northern on 10/22/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fisher et al v. Capital One Financial Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Casey Thaxton
Represented By: Joshua Nassir
Represented By: Benjamin Heikali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Belinda L. Fisher
Represented By: Joshua Nassir
Represented By: Benjamin Heikali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amanda Stevens
Represented By: Joshua Nassir
Represented By: Benjamin Heikali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard Clark
Represented By: Joshua Nassir
Represented By: Benjamin Heikali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Scott Jewell
Represented By: Joshua Nassir
Represented By: Benjamin Heikali
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Bank (U.S.A.), N.A.,
Represented By: George Ruben Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One Financial Corporation
Represented By: George Ruben Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capital One, N. A.
Represented By: George Ruben Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?