In Re: Capital One Customer Data Security Breach Litigation
Plaintiff: Akram Tadrous, Lara Greenstein, Timothy Davidson, David Rosenthal, Adam Greenstein, Marcia Sorin, Stephen Rosenthal, David Bienfait, Eliyahu Lipskar, Vicki Johns, Mark Bodner, Paul Berger, Latoya Jawara, Kevin Zosiak and Plaintiff
Defendant: Capital One Bank (USA), N.A., Capital One Financial Corporation, Capital One, National Association and Defendant
In Re: In Re: Capital One Customer Data Security Breach Litigation
Intervenor: Consumer Financial Protection Bureau, Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System and Office of the Comptroller of the Currency
Interested Party: Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019md02915
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2020 Filing 1098 STIPULATION Regarding Plaintiffs' Claim for Breach of Express Contract by Defendant. (Balser, David)
December 15, 2020 Filing 1097 RESPONSE in Support re #1085 Amended MOTION to Seal (Amended Motion to File Under Seal Documents in Support of Its Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Discovery) filed by Defendant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Capital One's Proposed Order))(Reza, Syed)
December 11, 2020 Filing 1096 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 12/9/20 ( #996 Capital One's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Plaintiffs' Unjust Enrichment and Implied Contract Claims), before Judge Anthony J. Trenga. Court Reporter Rhonda Montgomery, Telephone Number 703-299-4599. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 1/11/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/10/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2021.(montgomery, rhonda)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1095 ORDER granting #1071 Motion to Seal Exhibits; directing that by allowing these materials to be filed under seal concerning this discovery motion, the court is not making a determination that the information contained in these exhibits will remain under seal during any further proceedings or the trial of this action. (See order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 12/11/2020. (aott, )
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1094 Order directing that FRB and OCC provide the information described to the plaintiffs and provide the court with additional information requested concerning exhibit 6, tab 48 and exhibit 8 tabs 55,56 and 73. (see order for details).Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 12/10/2020. (aott)
December 10, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #1091 MOTION in Limine to Apply Virginia Law to the Claims Asserted in Counts 1, 2, 3, 5, and 7 of the Second Amended Representative Consumer Class Action Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 1/6/2021 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (clar, )
December 9, 2020 Filing 1093 Notice of Hearing Date set for January 6, 2021, at 10:00 a.m. re #1091 MOTION in Limine to Apply Virginia Law to the Claims Asserted in Counts 1, 2, 3, 5, and 7 of the Second Amended Representative Consumer Class Action Complaint (St. George, Timothy)
December 9, 2020 Filing 1092 Memorandum in Support re #1091 MOTION in Limine to Apply Virginia Law to the Claims Asserted in Counts 1, 2, 3, 5, and 7 of the Second Amended Representative Consumer Class Action Complaint filed by Defendant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Excerpt from Michael Haken deposition), #2 Exhibit 2 (Excerpt from Terren Peterson deposition), #3 Exhibit 3 (Excerpt from Michael Fisk deposition), #4 Exhibit 4 (Excerpt from Jack Walker deposition), #5 Exhibit 5 (Excerpt from Robert Alexander deposition), #6 Exhibit 6 (Excerpt from Steve Schuster deposition), #7 Exhibit 7 (Excerpt from Stephen Schmidt deposition))(St. George, Timothy)
December 9, 2020 Filing 1091 MOTION in Limine to Apply Virginia Law to the Claims Asserted in Counts 1, 2, 3, 5, and 7 of the Second Amended Representative Consumer Class Action Complaint by Defendant. (St. George, Timothy)
December 9, 2020 Filing 1090 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga: Remote Motion Hearing held on 12/9/2020 re #996 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Plainiffs' Unjust Enrichment and Implied Contract Claims. Counsel for Plaintiff and Defendant appeared via Zoom. Motion argued and taken under advisement. Order to follow. (Court Reporter R. Montgomery)(dzir)
December 9, 2020 Filing 1089 RESPONSE in Support re #1071 MOTION to Seal filed by Defendant. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vieth, Robert)
December 8, 2020 Filing 1088 Waiver of re #1085 Amended MOTION to Seal (Amended Motion to File Under Seal Documents in Support of Its Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Discovery) (Amazon's Waiver of Hearing Re Amended Motion to File Under Seal) by In Re: Capital One Customer Data Security Breach Litigation (Vieth, Robert)
December 8, 2020 Filing 1087 NOTICE by In Re: Capital One Customer Data Security Breach Litigation re #1085 Amended MOTION to Seal (Amended Motion to File Under Seal Documents in Support of Its Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Discovery) (Vieth, Robert)
December 8, 2020 Filing 1086 Memorandum in Support re #1085 Amended MOTION to Seal (Amended Motion to File Under Seal Documents in Support of Its Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Discovery) filed by In Re: Capital One Customer Data Security Breach Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (A) Excerpts Michael Haken, #2 Exhibit (B) Excerpts Michael Haken 30(b)(6), #3 Exhibit (C) Excerpts Michael Fisk 30(b)(6), #4 Exhibit (D) Excerpts Rob Alexander, #5 Exhibit (E) Excerpts Terren Peterson 30(b)(6), #6 Exhibit (F) Excerpts Steve Schuster 30(b)(6), #7 Exhibit (G) Excerpts Brian Bentzen)(Vieth, Robert)
December 8, 2020 Filing 1085 Amended MOTION to Seal (Amended Motion to File Under Seal Documents in Support of Its Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Discovery) by In Re: Capital One Customer Data Security Breach Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tyler Newby, #2 Proposed Order)(Vieth, Robert)
December 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1084 ORDERED that the STATUS CONFERENCE presently scheduled for Tuesday, December 8, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. be, and the same hereby is, CANCELLED, and any issues in the STATUS REPORT the parties wish to discuss can be discussed at the hearing for the Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings scheduled on Wednesday, December 9, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga on 12/8/2020. (dzir)
December 7, 2020 Filing 1083 STATUS REPORT and Proposed Agenda (Joint) for 12/08/20 Status Conference by Defendant. (Balser, David)
December 7, 2020 Filing 1082 RESPONSE in Support re #1071 MOTION to Seal filed by Defendant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Capital One's Proposed Order granting Plaintiffs' Motion to File Under Seal (Dkt 1071)))(Reza, Syed)
December 7, 2020 Filing 1081 RESPONSE in Support re #1063 MOTION to File Under Seal re #1062 Sealed Response/Reply/Opposition, of Amazon Defendants to Motion to Compel #1051 filed by Defendant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Capital One's Response in Support of Amazon's Motion to File Under Seal)(Reza, Syed)
December 4, 2020 Filing 1080 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 12/4/2020, before Judge John F. Anderson, Court Reporter Anneliese Thomson, Telephone number 703-299-8595. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 1/4/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/3/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/4/2021.(thomson, anneliese)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1079 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #1051 Motion to Compel Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 12/4/2020. (aott, )
December 4, 2020 Filing 1078 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson:Motion Hearing held on 12/4/2020 via ZoomGov re #1051 MOTION To Compel Discovery from Amazon Defendants . Appearances of counsel. Motion argued and #1051 MOTION To Compel - GRANTED IN PART/DENIED IN PART. Order to follow. (Tape #FTR.)(wgar, )
December 3, 2020 Filing 1077 NOTICE by Plaintiff re #1051 MOTION To Compel Discovery from Amazon Defendants (Notice of Filing of Unredacted Memorandum in Support and Public Filing of Exhibits B through E Pursuant to Court's Order at ECF No. 1068). (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel, #2 Exhibit B (Deposition Transcript of Steve Schuster), #3 Exhibit C (Deposition Transcript of Stephen Schmidt), #4 Exhibit D (Deposition Transcript of Justin Christian), #5 Exhibit E (Deposition Transcript of Charles Passaro))(Webster, Steven)
December 3, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #996 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Plainiffs' Unjust Enrichment and Implied Contract Claims. Motion Hearing reset for 12/9/2020 at 02:00 PM in Alexandria Remote (via Zoom) before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga. (dzir)
December 2, 2020 Filing 1076 Sealed Response/Reply/Opposition re #1051 MOTION To Compel Discovery from Amazon Defendants . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (FILED UNDER SEAL), #2 Exhibit 2 (FILED UNDER SEAL), #3 Exhibit 3 (FILED UNDER SEAL), #4 Exhibit 4 (FILED UNDER SEAL), #5 Exhibit 5 (FILED UNDER SEAL), #6 Exhibit 6 (FILED UNDER SEAL), #7 Exhibit 7 (FILED UNDER SEAL))(Webster, Steven)
December 2, 2020 Filing 1075 Memorandum in Support re #1051 MOTION To Compel Discovery from Amazon Defendants (REDACTED REPLY BRIEF). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (FILED UNDER SEAL), #2 Exhibit 2 (FILED UNDER SEAL), #3 Exhibit 3 (FILED UNDER SEAL), #4 Exhibit 4 (FILED UNDER SEAL), #5 Exhibit 5 (FILED UNDER SEAL), #6 Exhibit 6 (FILED UNDER SEAL), #7 Exhibit 7 (FILED UNDER SEAL), #8 Exhibit 8 (Email Correspondence Regarding Search Terms))(Webster, Steven)
December 2, 2020 Filing 1074 NOTICE by Plaintiff re #1071 MOTION to Seal (Waiver of Hearing). (Webster, Steven)
December 2, 2020 Filing 1073 NOTICE by Plaintiff re #1071 MOTION to Seal (Notice of Filing of Motion to Seal Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5). (Webster, Steven)
December 2, 2020 Filing 1072 Memorandum in Support re #1071 MOTION to Seal . (Webster, Steven)
December 2, 2020 Filing 1071 MOTION to Seal . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Webster, Steven)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1070 Order re #1051 Motion to Compel Production of Discovery; setting motion hearing for 12/4/2020 at 12:00 PM via ZoomGov video before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 12/1/2020. (aott, )
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1069 ORDER granting #1061 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice as to Rachel K Tack. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 12/1/2020. (aott, )
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1068 ORDER denying #1047 Motion to seal; directing that Plaintiffs shall file an unredacted version of the memorandum and exhibits in the public record. (See order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 12/1/2020. (aott)
November 30, 2020 Filing 1067 Memorandum in Opposition re #1051 MOTION To Compel Discovery from Amazon Defendants . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Affidavit /Declaration of Tyler Newby ISO Opposition to Motion to Compel)(Vieth, Robert)
November 30, 2020 Filing 1066 Waiver of Hearing re Amazon Defendants' Motion to File Under Seal #1063 by Defendant (Vieth, Robert)
November 30, 2020 Filing 1065 NOTICE by Defendant re #1063 MOTION to File Under Seal re #1062 Sealed Response/Reply/Opposition, of Amazon Defendants to Motion to Compel #1051 . (Vieth, Robert)
November 30, 2020 Filing 1064 Memorandum in Support re #1063 MOTION to File Under Seal re #1062 Sealed Response/Reply/Opposition, of Amazon Defendants to Motion to Compel #1051 . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Tyler Newby ISO Motion to File Under Seal)(Vieth, Robert)
November 30, 2020 Filing 1063 MOTION to File Under Seal re #1062 Sealed Response/Reply/Opposition, of Amazon Defendants to Motion to Compel #1051 . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vieth, Robert)
November 30, 2020 Filing 1062 Sealed Response/Reply/Opposition re #1051 MOTION To Compel Discovery from Amazon Defendants . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit E, #5 Exhibit F, #6 Exhibit G, #7 Affidavit /Declaration of Tyler Newby ISO Opposition to Motion to Compel)(Vieth, Robert)
November 30, 2020 Filing 1061 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Rachel K Tack and Certification of Local Counsel Peter C Grenier Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7518656. by Plaintiff. (Grenier, Peter)
November 25, 2020 Filing 1060 Reply to Motion re #996 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Plainiffs' Unjust Enrichment and Implied Contract Claims filed by In Re: Capital One Customer Data Security Breach Litigation. (Balser, David)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1059 ORDER re #951 Motion to Join Capital One re #916 MOTION for Reconsideration or, in the Alternative, to Certify a Question of Law to the Supreme Court of Virginia is denied as to its request for reconsideration and held in abeyance as to its request for certification to the Supreme Court of Virginia. (see order for details). Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 11/25/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01010-CMH-TCB, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA, 1:20-cv-02973-AJT-JFA(aott, )
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1058 Order (Redacted) directing that #914 Plaintiff's Rule 72 Objection to Order Denying Plaintiff's Second Motion to Compel is Overruled and the Magistrate Judges Order #869 , dated September 18, 2020 is Affirmed. (See order for details). Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 11/25/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01010-CMH-TCB, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA, 1:20-cv-02973-AJT-JFA(aott, )
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1057 Sealed ORDER. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 11/25/2020. (aott, c/m 11/25/2020)
November 23, 2020 Filing 1056 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 11/20/20, before Judge John F. Anderson, Court Reporter Anneliese Thomson, Telephone number 703-299-8595. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 12/23/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/25/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/22/2021.(thomson, anneliese)
November 23, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Anderson. #1051 MOTION To Compel Discovery from Amazon Defendants (clar, )
November 23, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #1051 MOTION To Compel Discovery from Amazon Defendants . Motion Hearing set for 12/4/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 501 before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (clar, )
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1055 ORDER denying as moot #1034 Motion for Clarification of the Scheduling Order Regarding the Fact Discovery Deadline. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 11/20/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01010-CMH-TCB, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA, 1:20-cv-02973-AJT-JFA(aott, )
November 20, 2020 Filing 1054 Sealed Memorandum in Support re #1051 MOTION To Compel Discovery from Amazon Defendants . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B (FILED UNDER SEAL), #2 Exhibit C (FILED UNDER SEAL), #3 Exhibit D (FILED UNDER SEAL), #4 Exhibit E (FILED UNDER SEAL))(Webster, Steven)
November 20, 2020 Filing 1053 Notice of Hearing Date set for December 4, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. re #1051 MOTION To Compel Discovery from Amazon Defendants . (Webster, Steven)
November 20, 2020 Filing 1052 Memorandum in Support re #1051 MOTION To Compel Discovery from Amazon Defendants (REDACTED). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Amazon's Objections to Third RFPs Nos. 57-58), #2 Exhibit B (FILED UNDER SEAL), #3 Exhibit C (FILED UNDER SEAL), #4 Exhibit D (FILED UNDER SEAL), #5 Exhibit E (FILED UNDER SEAL), #6 Exhibit F (Amazon's Objections and Responses to Second RFPs Nos. 48-56), #7 Exhibit G (Amazon's Objections and Responses to Second Notice of Deposition of Amazon), #8 Exhibit H (Email from T. Newby to B. Vahle))(Webster, Steven)
November 20, 2020 Filing 1051 MOTION To Compel Discovery from Amazon Defendants . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Webster, Steven)
November 20, 2020 Filing 1050 NOTICE by Plaintiff re #1047 MOTION to Seal (Waiver of Hearing). (Webster, Steven)
November 20, 2020 Filing 1049 NOTICE by Plaintiff re #1047 MOTION to Seal (Notice of Filing of Motion to Seal Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5). (Webster, Steven)
November 20, 2020 Filing 1048 Memorandum in Support re #1047 MOTION to Seal . (Webster, Steven)
November 20, 2020 Filing 1047 MOTION to Seal . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Webster, Steven)
November 20, 2020 Filing 1046 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson:Motion Hearing held on 11/20/2020 via ZoomGov re #1034 MOTION for Clarification of the Scheduling Order Regarding the Fact Discovery Deadline . Appearances of counsel. Motion argued and #1034 MOTION for Clarification of the Scheduling Order Regarding the Fact Discovery Deadline - DENIED AS MOOT. Order to follow. (Court Reporter: A. Thomson; FTR)(wgar,)
November 19, 2020 Filing 1045 Memorandum in Support re #1034 MOTION for Clarification of the Scheduling Order Regarding the Fact Discovery Deadline (Reply Brief). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Transcript of 11-10-20 Status Conference), #2 Exhibit 2 (Transcript of 5-12-20 Status Conference), #3 Exhibit 3 (Nov. 18 J. Toro Email), #4 Exhibit 4 (Nov. 16 T. Newby Email))(Webster, Steven)
November 18, 2020 Reset Deadlines as to #1034 MOTION for Clarification of the Scheduling Order Regarding the Fact Discovery Deadline . Motion Hearing reset for 11/20/2020 at 11:30 AM in Alexandria Remote before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (wgar, )
November 18, 2020 Filing 1044 Memorandum in Opposition re #1034 MOTION for Clarification of the Scheduling Order Regarding the Fact Discovery Deadline . (Balser, David)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1043 ORDER granting (1042) Consent Motion for Extension on Time to File Reply re #996 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Plainiffs' Unjust Enrichment and Implied Contract Claims. (See order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 11/18/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01010-CMH-TCB, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA, 1:20-cv-02973-AJT-JFA(aott, )
November 18, 2020 Filing 1042 Consent MOTION for Extension on Time to File Reply re #996 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Plainiffs' Unjust Enrichment and Implied Contract Claims . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Balser, David)
November 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1041 Order re Hearing on motions for clarification set for November 20, 2020 at 10:00 am. (See Order for Details). Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 11/18/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01010-CMH-TCB, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA, 1:20-cv-02973-AJT-JFA(aott, )
November 18, 2020 Filing 1040 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 11/6/2020, before Judge John F. Anderson, Court Reporter Anneliese Thomson, Telephone number 703-299-8595. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 12/18/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/19/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/16/2021.(thomson, anneliese)
November 16, 2020 Filing 1039 NOTICE by Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System, Office of the Comptroller of the Currency re #1037 MDL Order, (Levenson, Rebecca)
November 16, 2020 Filing 1038 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 11/10/2020, before Judge Anthony J. Trenga and Judge John F. Anderson, Court Reporter Anneliese Thomson, Telephone number 703-299-8595. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 12/16/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/19/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/16/2021.(thomson, anneliese)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1037 Order re Redacted Documents from Exhibit 8; directing that Counsel for the Federal Reserve System and the Office of the Comptroller of the Currency and Capital One shall provide the court with the information described in order promptly. (see order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 11/16/2020. (aott, )
November 16, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #1034 MOTION for Clarification of the Scheduling Order Regarding the Fact Discovery Deadline . Motion Hearing set for 11/20/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 501 before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (clar, )
November 16, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Anderson. #1034 MOTION for Clarification of the Scheduling Order Regarding the Fact Discovery Deadline (clar, )
November 13, 2020 Filing 1036 Notice of Hearing Date set for November 20, 2020 re #1034 MOTION for Clarification of the Scheduling Order Regarding the Fact Discovery Deadline . (Webster, Steven)
November 13, 2020 Filing 1035 Memorandum in Support re #1034 MOTION for Clarification of the Scheduling Order Regarding the Fact Discovery Deadline . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Webster, Steven)
November 13, 2020 Filing 1034 MOTION for Clarification of the Scheduling Order Regarding the Fact Discovery Deadline . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Webster, Steven)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1033 ORDER granting (1011) Motion to File Under Seal; directing that Exhibit A to the Memorandum [Dkt. No. IO 16-1 ], and the information redacted on pages 3 and 4 of the Memorandum [Dkt. No. 1016] shall remain under seal at this time, and further directing that Plaintiffs shall re-file the Memorandum consistent with the more limited redactions shown in Exhibit 2 to Capital One's Response in Support of the Motion to Seal(Dkt. No. I 031-2). Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 11/13/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01010-CMH-TCB, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA, 1:20-cv-02973-AJT-JFA(aott, )
November 13, 2020 Filing 1032 Memorandum in Opposition re #996 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Plainiffs' Unjust Enrichment and Implied Contract Claims . (Webster, Steven)
November 12, 2020 Filing 1031 RESPONSE in Support re #1011 MOTION To File Under Seal filed by Defendant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Proposed Order), #2 Exhibit 2 (Proposed Redactions to Plaintiffs' Reply In Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Discovery From Capital One Defendants))(Reza, Syed)
November 12, 2020 Filing 1030 NOTICE by Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System, Office of the Comptroller of the Currency of Tendering Documents for In Camera Review (Levenson, Rebecca)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1029 ORDER in case 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA; granting (1004) Motion to Seal in case 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 11/12/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01010-CMH-TCB, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA, 1:20-cv-02973-AJT-JFA(rban, )
November 10, 2020 Filing 1028 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson: Remote Status Conference held on 11/10/2020. Counsel appeared for Plaintiff and Defendant via Zoom. Counsel updates the Court on the status of the matter. Status Conference set for 12/8/2020 at 02:00 PM in Alexandria Remote (via Zoom) before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (Court Reporter A. Thomson)(dzir)
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1027 ORDER granting (986) Motion to Seal Memorandum and Exhibits; directing that Exhibits A through E to the Memorandum [Dkt. Nos. 994-1 through 994-5], and the information redacted on pages 3. 4. 5, 6, 7, and 8 of the Memorandum [Dk. No. 995] shall remain under seal at this time. Given the public disclosure of certain information during the hearing on November 6, 2020, the request by Capital One for additional redactions is denied. (see order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 11/9/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01010-CMH-TCB, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA, 1:20-cv-02973-AJT-JFA(aott, )
November 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1026 ORDER granting (978) Motion to Seal Exhibits; directing that Exhibits 6, 7, and 8 to the Memorandum [Dkt. Nos. 983-6, 983-7, & 983-12]shall remain under seal at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 11/9/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01010-CMH-TCB, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA, 1:20-cv-02973-AJT-JFA(aott, )
November 9, 2020 Filing 1025 NOTICE by Plaintiff (Joint Proposed Agenda and Status Report for November 10, 2020 Status Conference). (Webster, Steven)
November 9, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference reset for 11/10/2020 at 01:30 PM in Alexandria Remote (via Zoom) before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (dzir)
November 6, 2020 Filing 1024 RESPONSE in Support re #986 MOTION to Seal Memorandum and Exhibits filed by Defendant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Capital One's Response in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to File Under Seal (Dkt 986)), #2 Exhibit 2 to Capital One's Response in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to File Under Seal (Dkt 986)))(Reza, Syed)
November 6, 2020 Filing 1023 RESPONSE in Support re #978 MOTION To Seal Exhibits filed by Defendant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Capital One's Response in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to File Under Seal (Dkt. 978))(Reza, Syed)
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1022 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #990 Motion to Compel Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 11/6/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01010-CMH-TCB, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA, 1:20-cv-02973-AJT-JFA(aott, )
November 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1021 ORDER granting in part #982 Motion to Compel the Production of Documents Improperly Withheld or Redacted Pursuant to the Bank Examination Privilege. (See Order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 11/6/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01010-CMH-TCB, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA, 1:20-cv-02973-AJT-JFA(aott, )
November 6, 2020 Filing 1020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson:Motion Hearing held on 11/6/2020 via ZoomGov re #990 MOTION to Compel Discovery from the Capital One Defendants (Alert Case Summaries and Contextual Data) , #982 MOTION to Compel the Production of Documents Improperly Withheld or Redacted Pursuant to the Bank Examination Privilege . Appearances of counsel. Motions argued and #982 MOTION to Compel - GRANTED IN PART; #990 MOTION to Compel - GRANTED IN PART/DENIED IN PART. Orders to follow. (Court Reporter: A. Thomson/FTR)(wgar)
November 5, 2020 Filing 1019 NOTICE by Plaintiff (Evidentiary Stipulation Between Plaintiffs and Capital One Defendants Subject to Court's Approval). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Webster, Steven)
November 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1018 ORDER granting #1010 Motion For Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Ryan Maxey. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 11/5/2020. (aott)
November 5, 2020 Filing 1017 Sealed Response/Reply/Opposition re #990 MOTION to Compel Discovery from the Capital One Defendants (Alert Case Summaries and Contextual Data) . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (FILED UNDER SEAL))(Webster, Steven)
November 5, 2020 Filing 1016 Memorandum in Support re #995 Memorandum in Support (Redacted Reply Brief). (Webster, Steven)
November 5, 2020 Filing 1015 Memorandum in Support re #982 MOTION to Compel the Production of Documents Improperly Withheld or Redacted Pursuant to the Bank Examination Privilege (Reply Brief). (Webster, Steven)
November 5, 2020 Filing 1014 NOTICE by Plaintiff re #1011 MOTION To File Under Seal (Waiver of Hearing). (Webster, Steven)
November 5, 2020 Filing 1013 NOTICE by Plaintiff re #1011 MOTION To File Under Seal (Notice of Filing of Motion to Seal Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5). (Webster, Steven)
November 5, 2020 Filing 1012 Memorandum in Support re #1011 MOTION To File Under Seal . (Webster, Steven)
November 5, 2020 Filing 1011 MOTION To File Under Seal . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Webster, Steven)
November 5, 2020 Filing 1010 MOTION For Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ryan Maxey . (Webster, Steven)
November 5, 2020 Filing 1009 NOTICE re November 2020 Status Conference; directing that the court will conduct the monthly status conference on Tuesday, November 10, 2020 at 2:00 pm via videoconference and teleconference (aott, )
November 4, 2020 Filing 1008 NOTICE by Plaintiff (Evidentiary Stipulation Between Plaintiffs and Amazon Defendants Subject to Court's Approval). (Webster, Steven)
November 4, 2020 Filing 1007 Waiver of re #1004 MOTION to Seal by Defendant (Reza, Syed)
November 4, 2020 Filing 1006 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Defendant re #1003 Sealed Response/Reply/Opposition (Capital One's Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Discovery from the Capital One Defendants) (Reza, Syed)
November 4, 2020 Filing 1005 Memorandum in Support re #1004 MOTION to Seal filed by Defendant. (Reza, Syed)
November 4, 2020 Filing 1004 MOTION to Seal by Defendant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Capital One's Proposed Order granting Motion to Seal))(Reza, Syed)
November 4, 2020 Filing 1003 Sealed Response/Reply/Opposition re #990 MOTION to Compel Discovery from the Capital One Defendants (Alert Case Summaries and Contextual Data) . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit DeBiase Declaration)(Balser, David)
November 4, 2020 Filing 1002 Memorandum in Opposition re #990 MOTION to Compel Discovery from the Capital One Defendants (Alert Case Summaries and Contextual Data) . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Biase Declaration, #2 Exhibit A - Letter, #3 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Counter-Proposal)(Balser, David)
November 4, 2020 Filing 1001 Response to MTC Improperly Withheld and Redacted Pursuant to BEP filed by In Re: Capital One Customer Data Security Breach Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Balser, David)
November 4, 2020 Filing 1000 Memorandum in Opposition re #982 MOTION to Compel the Production of Documents Improperly Withheld or Redacted Pursuant to the Bank Examination Privilege filed by Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System, Office of the Comptroller of the Currency. (Levenson, Rebecca)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 999 ORDER scheduling hearing re #982 Motion to Compel the Production of Documents and #990 Motion to Compel Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 11/3/2020. Hearing set for 11/6/2020 at 11:30 AM via ZoomGov before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson.(aott, )
November 3, 2020 Filing 998 Sealed Excerpt of Transcript of Proceeding before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 10/13/2020. (rban, )
November 2, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #982 MOTION to Compel the Production of Documents Improperly Withheld or Redacted Pursuant to the Bank Examination Privilege , #990 MOTION to Compel Discovery from the Capital One Defendants (Alert Case Summaries and Contextual Data) . Motion Hearing set for 11/6/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 501 before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (clar, )
November 2, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Anderson. #990 MOTION to Compel Discovery from the Capital One Defendants (Alert Case Summaries and Contextual Data) , #982 MOTION to Compel the Production of Documents Improperly Withheld or Redacted Pursuant to the Bank Examination Privilege (clar, )
November 2, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #996 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Plainiffs' Unjust Enrichment and Implied Contract Claims . Motion Hearing set for 12/9/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (clar, )
October 30, 2020 Filing 997 Notice of Hearing Date set for December 9, 2020 re #996 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Plainiffs' Unjust Enrichment and Implied Contract Claims . (Balser, David)
October 30, 2020 Filing 996 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings as to Plainiffs' Unjust Enrichment and Implied Contract Claims . (Balser, David)
October 30, 2020 Filing 995 Memorandum in Support re #990 MOTION to Compel Discovery from the Capital One Defendants (Alert Case Summaries and Contextual Data) (CORRECTED FILING). (Webster, Steven)
October 30, 2020 Filing 994 Sealed Memorandum in Support re #990 MOTION to Compel Discovery from the Capital One Defendants (Alert Case Summaries and Contextual Data) . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Filed Under Seal), #2 Exhibit B (Filed Under Seal), #3 Exhibit C (Filed Under Seal), #4 Exhibit D (Filed Under Seal), #5 Exhibit E (Filed Under Seal))(Webster, Steven)
October 30, 2020 Filing 993 Notice of Hearing Date set for November 6, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. re #990 MOTION to Compel Discovery from the Capital One Defendants (Alert Case Summaries and Contextual Data) . (Webster, Steven)
October 30, 2020 Filing 992 NOTICE by Plaintiff re #990 MOTION to Compel Discovery from the Capital One Defendants (Alert Case Summaries and Contextual Data) . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Filed Under Seal), #2 Exhibit B (Filed Under Seal), #3 Exhibit C (Filed Under Seal), #4 Exhibit D (Filed Under Seal), #5 Exhibit E (Filed Under Seal))(Webster, Steven)
October 30, 2020 Filing 991 Memorandum in Support re #990 MOTION to Compel Discovery from the Capital One Defendants (Alert Case Summaries and Contextual Data) . (Webster, Steven)
October 30, 2020 Filing 990 MOTION to Compel Discovery from the Capital One Defendants (Alert Case Summaries and Contextual Data) . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Webster, Steven)
October 30, 2020 Filing 989 NOTICE by Plaintiff re #986 MOTION to Seal Memorandum and Exhibits (Waiver of Hearing). (Webster, Steven)
October 30, 2020 Filing 988 NOTICE by Plaintiff re #986 MOTION to Seal Memorandum and Exhibits (Notice of Filing of Motion to Seal Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5). (Webster, Steven)
October 30, 2020 Filing 987 Memorandum in Support re #986 MOTION to Seal Memorandum and Exhibits . (Webster, Steven)
October 30, 2020 Filing 986 MOTION to Seal Memorandum and Exhibits . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Webster, Steven)
October 30, 2020 Filing 985 Sealed Document re #982 MOTION to Compel the Production of Documents Improperly Withheld or Redacted Pursuant to the Bank Examination Privilege . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 6 (Under Seal Exhibit), #2 Exhibit 7 (Under Seal Exhibit), #3 Exhibit 12 (Under Seal Exhibit))(Webster, Steven)
October 30, 2020 Filing 984 Notice of Hearing Date set for November 6, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. re #982 MOTION to Compel the Production of Documents Improperly Withheld or Redacted Pursuant to the Bank Examination Privilege . (Webster, Steven)
October 30, 2020 Filing 983 Memorandum in Support re #982 MOTION to Compel the Production of Documents Improperly Withheld or Redacted Pursuant to the Bank Examination Privilege . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Letter from Norm Siegel to Rebecca Levenson dated September 14, 2020), #2 Exhibit 2 (Letter from Norm Siegel to Rebecca Levenson dated October 7, 2020), #3 Exhibit 3 (Letter from Norm Siegel to Rebecca Levenson dated October 16, 2020), #4 Exhibit 4 (Email Correspondence), #5 Exhibit 5 (Email Correspondence), #6 Exhibit 6 (Filed Under Seal), #7 Exhibit 7 (Filed Under Seal), #8 Exhibit 8 (List of Challenged Redacted Documents), #9 Exhibit 9 (CAPITALONE_MDL_001063424_image), #10 Exhibit 10 (CAPITALONE_MDL_001157370_image), #11 Exhibit 11 (CAPITALONE_MDL_001157400_image), #12 Exhibit 12 (Filed Under Seal), #13 Exhibit 13 (CAPITALONE_MDL_001179107_image))(Webster, Steven)
October 30, 2020 Filing 982 MOTION to Compel the Production of Documents Improperly Withheld or Redacted Pursuant to the Bank Examination Privilege . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Webster, Steven)
October 30, 2020 Filing 981 NOTICE by Plaintiff re #978 MOTION To Seal Exhibits (Waiver of Hearing). (Webster, Steven)
October 30, 2020 Filing 980 NOTICE by Plaintiff re #978 MOTION To Seal Exhibits (Notice of Filing of Motion to Seal Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5). (Webster, Steven)
October 30, 2020 Filing 979 Memorandum in Support re #978 MOTION To Seal Exhibits . (Webster, Steven)
October 30, 2020 Filing 978 MOTION To Seal Exhibits . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Webster, Steven)
October 28, 2020 Filing 977 Amazon Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint (Second Amended - Dkt. 971) by Defendant.(Vieth, Robert)
October 28, 2020 Filing 976 NOTICE by Defendant re #971 NOTICE Filing of Answer to Second Amended Representative Consumer Class Action Complaint. (Balser, David)
October 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 975 So Ordered re #974 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal by Representative Plaintiff Whitney Palencia. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 10/27/2020. (aott)
October 27, 2020 Filing 974 NOTICE by Plaintiff of Voluntary Dismissal by Representative Plaintiff Whitney Palencia. (Webster, Steven)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 973 ORDER granting (958) Motion to Seal (Non-Confidential Motion to File Certain Information Under Seal); directing that the redacted excerpts on pages 1, 3, 8, and 9 of the Opposition [Dkt. No. #957 shall remain under seal at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 10/26/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01010-CMH-TCB, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA, 1:20-cv-02973-AJT-JFA(aott, )
October 25, 2020 Filing 972 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 10/21/2020, before Judge Anthony J. Trenga, Court Reporter Anneliese Thomson, Telephone number 703-299-8595. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 11/24/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/28/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/25/2021.(thomson, anneliese)
October 23, 2020 Filing 971 Second Amended Representative Consumer Class Action Complaint . (Webster, Steven) Modified on 10/28/2020 (aott, ).
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 970 ORDER granting (924) Motion to Amend Representative Consumer Class Action Complaint to Substitute Named Representative Plaintiff re #836 Amended Complaint. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 10/23/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01010-CMH-TCB, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA, 1:20-cv-02973-AJT-JFA(aott, )
October 21, 2020 Filing 969 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga: Remote Motion Hearing held on 10/21/2020 re #914 MOTION (Rule 72(a) Objections to Order Denying Plaintiffs Second Motion to Compel Production of the PricewaterhouseCoopers Report) , #916 MOTION for Reconsideration or, in the Alternative, to Certify a Question of Law to the Supreme Court of Virginia , and #924 MOTION to Amend Representative Consumer Class Action Complaint to Substitute Named Representative Plaintiff re #836 Amended Complaint . Counsel appeared for Plaintiff and Defendant via Zoom. Motion #914 is taken under advisement. The parties are directed to confer with respect to Motion #916 and the Court will readdress at a later time. Motion #924 is granted. Order to follow. (Court Reporter A. Thomson)(dzir)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 968 ORDER granting #939 Motion to Seal; directing that Exhibit 2 to the Response brief [dkt. No. 936-2] shall remain under seal at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 10/21/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01010-CMH-TCB, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA, 1:20-cv-02973-AJT-JFA(aott, )
October 21, 2020 Filing 967 Memorandum in Support re #958 MOTION to Seal (Non-Confidential Motion to File Certain Information Under Seal) . (Webster, Steven)
October 19, 2020 Filing 966 Memorandum in Support re #924 MOTION to Amend Representative Consumer Class Action Complaint to Substitute Named Representative Plaintiff re #836 Amended Complaint (Reply Brief). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Declaration of Karen Hanson Riebel), #2 Exhibit B (Declaration of Brandi Edmondson))(Webster, Steven)
October 19, 2020 Filing 965 REPLY to Response to Motion re #916 MOTION for Reconsideration or, in the Alternative, to Certify a Question of Law to the Supreme Court of Virginia filed by Defendant. (Balser, David)
October 19, 2020 Filing 964 Memorandum in Support re #914 MOTION (Rule 72(a) Objections to Order Denying Plaintiffs Second Motion to Compel Production of the PricewaterhouseCoopers Report) (Reply Brief). (Webster, Steven)
October 19, 2020 Filing 963 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 10/16/2020, before Judge John F. Anderson, Court Reporter Anneliese Thomson, Telephone number 703-299-8595. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 11/18/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/21/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/19/2021.(thomson, anneliese)
October 16, 2020 Filing 962 Sealed Response/Reply/Opposition re #924 MOTION to Amend Representative Consumer Class Action Complaint to Substitute Named Representative Plaintiff re #836 Amended Complaint . (Angle, Robert)
October 16, 2020 Filing 961 Waiver of re #958 MOTION to Seal (Non-Confidential Motion to File Certain Information Under Seal) (Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument) by Defendant (Reza, Syed)
October 16, 2020 Filing 960 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Defendant re #958 MOTION to Seal (Non-Confidential Motion to File Certain Information Under Seal) (Reza, Syed)
October 16, 2020 Filing 959 Memorandum in Support re #958 MOTION to Seal (Non-Confidential Motion to File Certain Information Under Seal) filed by Defendant. (Reza, Syed)
October 16, 2020 Filing 958 MOTION to Seal (Non-Confidential Motion to File Certain Information Under Seal) by Defendant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Capital One's Proposed Order))(Reza, Syed)
October 16, 2020 Filing 957 Memorandum in Opposition re #924 MOTION to Amend Representative Consumer Class Action Complaint to Substitute Named Representative Plaintiff re #836 Amended Complaint (Corrected and Redacted) filed by Defendant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Declaration of Stewart Haskins))(Angle, Robert)
October 16, 2020 Filing 956 Memorandum in Opposition re #924 MOTION to Amend Representative Consumer Class Action Complaint to Substitute Named Representative Plaintiff re #836 Amended Complaint filed by Defendant. (Angle, Robert)
October 16, 2020 Filing 955 ANSWER to Complaint by Defendant.(Balser, David)
October 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 954 ORDER denying (930) Motion To Compel Testimony Improperly Excluded on the Basis of the Bank Examination Privilege in case 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 10/16/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01010-CMH-TCB, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA, 1:20-cv-02973-AJT-JFA(rban, )
October 16, 2020 Filing 953 Amazon Defendants' ANSWER to Complaint - AMENDED #836 by In Re: Capital One Customer Data Security Breach Litigation.(Vieth, Robert)
October 16, 2020 Filing 952 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson:Motion Hearing held on 10/16/2020 via ZoomGov re #930 MOTION To Compel Testimony Improperly Excluded on the Basis of the Bank Examination Privilege . Appearances of counsel. Motion argued and #930 MOTION To Compel - DENIED. Order to follow. (Court Reporter: A. Thomson/FTR)(wgar)
October 15, 2020 Filing 951 MOTION to Join Capital One re #916 MOTION for Reconsideration or, in the Alternative, to Certify a Question of Law to the Supreme Court of Virginia . (Vieth, Robert)
October 15, 2020 Filing 950 Memorandum in Support re #930 MOTION To Compel Testimony Improperly Excluded on the Basis of the Bank Examination Privilege (Reply Brief). (Webster, Steven)
October 15, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #914 MOTION (Rule 72(a) Objections to Order Denying Plaintiffs Second Motion to Compel Production of the PricewaterhouseCoopers Report), #916 MOTION for Reconsideration or, in the Alternative, to Certify a Question of Law to the Supreme Court of Virginia, and #924 MOTION to Amend Representative Consumer Class Action Complaint to Substitute Named Representative Plaintiff re #836 Amended Complaint. Motion Hearing reset for 10/21/2020 at 03:30 PM in Alexandria Remote (via Zoom) before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga. (dzir)
October 14, 2020 Filing 949 Memorandum in Opposition re #930 MOTION To Compel Testimony Improperly Excluded on the Basis of the Bank Examination Privilege . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Memo, #2 Exhibit 2 - Letter to J. Yanchunis)(Balser, David)
October 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 948 ORDER granting #945 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 10/14/2020. (rban, )
October 14, 2020 Filing 947 TRANSCRIPT of open proceedings held on 10/13/2020, before Judge Anthony J. Trenga and Judge John F. Anderson, Court Reporter Anneliese Thomson, Telephone number 703-299-8595. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 11/13/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/14/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/12/2021.(thomson, anneliese)
October 14, 2020 Filing 946 Memorandum in Opposition re #930 MOTION To Compel Testimony Improperly Excluded on the Basis of the Bank Examination Privilege filed by Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System, Office of the Comptroller of the Currency. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Levenson, Rebecca)
October 14, 2020 Filing 945 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #924 MOTION to Amend Representative Consumer Class Action Complaint to Substitute Named Representative Plaintiff re #836 Amended Complaint [Unopposed Motion Seeking Order Granting Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend to Substitute Named Representative Plaintiff] by Defendant. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Angle, Robert)
October 13, 2020 Filing 944 Memorandum in Support re #877 Memorandum in Support (Revised Redacted Brief Per Court's Order). (Webster, Steven)
October 13, 2020 Filing 943 Memorandum in Opposition re #842 Memorandum in Opposition (Revised Redacted Brief Per Court's Order). (Webster, Steven)
October 13, 2020 Filing 942 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Defendant re #939 MOTION to Seal (Reza, Syed)
October 13, 2020 Filing 941 Waiver of re #939 MOTION to Seal (Notice of Waiver of Hearing) by Defendant (Reza, Syed)
October 13, 2020 Filing 940 Memorandum in Support re #939 MOTION to Seal filed by Defendant. (Reza, Syed)
October 13, 2020 Filing 939 MOTION to Seal by Defendant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Capital One's Proposed Order))(Reza, Syed)
October 13, 2020 Filing 938 Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s) re #936 Memorandum in Opposition,. (Balser, David)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 937 ORDER regarding a hearing on plaintiffs' motion to compel testimony improperly excluded on the basis of the bank examination privilege #930 scheduled for 10/16/2020 at 10:30 a.m. via ZOOM. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01010-CMH-TCB, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA, 1:20-cv-02973-AJT-JFA(rban, )
October 13, 2020 Filing 936 Memorandum in Opposition re #914 MOTION (Rule 72(a) Objections to Order Denying Plaintiffs Second Motion to Compel Production of the PricewaterhouseCoopers Report) . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Balser, David)
October 13, 2020 Filing 935 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson: Remote Status Conference held on 10/13/2020 via Zoom. Counsel for Plaintiff and Defendant appeared via Zoom. Counsel updates the Court on the status of the matter. Status Conference set for 11/10/2020 at 02:00 PM in Alexandria Remote (via Zoom) before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (Court Reporter A. Thomson)(dzir)
October 13, 2020 Filing 934 Memorandum in Opposition re #916 MOTION for Reconsideration or, in the Alternative, to Certify a Question of Law to the Supreme Court of Virginia . (Webster, Steven)
October 13, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #930 MOTION To Compel Testimony Improperly Excluded on the Basis of the Bank Examination Privilege . Motion Hearing set for 10/16/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 501 before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (clar, )
October 13, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Anderson. #930 MOTION To Compel Testimony Improperly Excluded on the Basis of the Bank Examination Privilege (clar, )
October 13, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #930 MOTION To Compel Testimony Improperly Excluded on the Basis of the Bank Examination Privilege . Motion Hearing set for 10/16/2020 at 10:30 AM in Alexandria Remote before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (rban, )
October 9, 2020 Filing 933 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 6/9/2020, before Judge Anthony J. Trenga and Judge John F. Anderson, Court Reporter Anneliese Thomson, Telephone number 703-299-8595. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 11/9/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/9/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/7/2021.(thomson, anneliese)
October 9, 2020 Filing 932 Memorandum in Support re #930 MOTION To Compel Testimony Improperly Excluded on the Basis of the Bank Examination Privilege . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Partial Transcript of July 17, 2020 Hearing), #2 Exhibit B (Partial Rough Transcript of Deposition of Randi Kieffer) (Dedesignated as Confidential), #3 Exhibit C (Robert Alexander Deposition Exhibit 39), #4 Exhibit D (Robert Alexander Deposition Exhibit 40), #5 Exhibit E (Partial Transcript of Deposition of Robert Alexander) (Dedesignated as Confidential), #6 Exhibit F (Letter to David Balser dated September 4, 2020), #7 Exhibit G (Letter to John Yanchunis dated September 16, 2020), #8 Exhibit H (Partial Transcript of June 5, 2020 Hearing), #9 Exhibit I (Email from Rebecca Levenson dated October 8, 2020))(Webster, Steven)
October 9, 2020 Filing 931 Notice of Hearing Date set for Friday, October 16, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. re #930 MOTION To Compel Testimony Improperly Excluded on the Basis of the Bank Examination Privilege . (Webster, Steven)
October 9, 2020 Filing 930 MOTION To Compel Testimony Improperly Excluded on the Basis of the Bank Examination Privilege . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Webster, Steven)
October 9, 2020 Filing 929 NOTICE by Defendant re #927 NOTICE of Corrected Joint Proposed Agenda and Status Report for October 13, 2020 Status Conference. (Balser, David)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 928 Order continuing hearing as to #924 Motion to Amend Representative Consumer Class Action Complaint to Substitute Named Representative Plaintiff re #836 Amended Complaint . Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 10/9/2020. Motion Hearing set for 10/21/2020 at 10:00 AM via ZOOM before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (aott, )
October 9, 2020 Filing 927 NOTICE by Plaintiff (Joint Proposed Agenda and Status Report for October 13, 2020 Status Conference). (Webster, Steven)
October 9, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #924 MOTION to Amend Representative Consumer Class Action Complaint to Substitute Named Representative Plaintiff re #836 Amended Complaint . Motion Hearing set for 10/16/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (clar, )
October 8, 2020 Filing 926 Notice of Hearing Date set for Friday, October 16, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. re #924 MOTION to Amend Representative Consumer Class Action Complaint to Substitute Named Representative Plaintiff re #836 Amended Complaint . (Webster, Steven)
October 8, 2020 Filing 925 Memorandum in Support re #924 MOTION to Amend Representative Consumer Class Action Complaint to Substitute Named Representative Plaintiff re #836 Amended Complaint . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Redlined Proposed Amended Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (Declaration of Karen Hanson Riebel))(Webster, Steven)
October 8, 2020 Filing 924 MOTION to Amend Representative Consumer Class Action Complaint to Substitute Named Representative Plaintiff re #836 Amended Complaint . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Webster, Steven)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 923 So Ordered re #922 NOTICE by Plaintiff of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs Naomy Centeno, Edwina Martin, Ryan Lloyd, Jay Singleton, Sean Clark, Cristopher Ellington, Louise Gaskell, Corey Washington, and Cynthia Ingraham (1:19-cv-02963. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 10/8/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA(aott)
October 8, 2020 Filing 922 NOTICE by Plaintiff of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs Naomy Centeno, Edwina Martin, Ryan Lloyd, Jay Singleton, Sean Clark, Cristopher Ellington, Louise Gaskell, Corey Washington, and Cynthia Ingraham (1:19-cv-02963). (Webster, Steven)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 921 Order directing that the parties submit a proposed agenda for the Status Conference Hearing Scheduled for 10/13/2020 at 2:00pm no later than Friday, October 9, 2020 at 12:00pm. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 10/7/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01010-CMH-TCB, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA, 1:20-cv-02973-AJT-JFA(aott, )
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 920 Order advancing hearing re #916 Motion for Reconsideration or, in the Alternative, to Certify a Question of Law to the Supreme Court of Virginia .Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 10/6/2020. Motion Hearing set for 10/21/2020 at 10:00 AM via teleconferencing before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (aott, ) (aott, ).
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 919 ORDER granting (891) Motion to Seal; directing that Exhibit A to the Opposition Brief [Dkt. No. 888-1] shall remain under seal at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 10/5/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01010-CMH-TCB, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA, 1:20-cv-02973-AJT-JFA(aott, )
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 918 ORDER granting (896) Motion to File Under; directing that Exhibit A to the Memorandum [0kt. No. 900-1 ], and the information redacted on pages 3 and 4 of the Memorandum [0kt. No. 895] shall remain under seal at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 10/5/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01010-CMH-TCB, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA, 1:20-cv-02973-AJT-JFA(aott, )
October 5, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #916 MOTION for Reconsideration or, in the Alternative, to Certify a Question of Law to the Supreme Court of Virginia . Motion Hearing set for 10/23/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (clar, )
October 5, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #914 MOTION (Rule 72(a) Objections to Order Denying Plaintiffs Second Motion to Compel Production of the PricewaterhouseCoopers Report) . Motion Hearing set for 10/21/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (clar, )
October 2, 2020 Filing 917 Notice of Hearing Date re #916 MOTION for Reconsideration or, in the Alternative, to Certify a Question of Law to the Supreme Court of Virginia (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (Agreed))(Balser, David)
October 2, 2020 Filing 916 MOTION for Reconsideration or, in the Alternative, to Certify a Question of Law to the Supreme Court of Virginia . (Balser, David)
October 2, 2020 Filing 915 Notice of Hearing Date set for Wednesday, October 21, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. re #914 MOTION (Rule 72(a) Objections to Order Denying Plaintiffs Second Motion to Compel Production of the PricewaterhouseCoopers Report) . (Webster, Steven)
October 2, 2020 Filing 914 MOTION (Rule 72(a) Objections to Order Denying Plaintiffs Second Motion to Compel Production of the PricewaterhouseCoopers Report) . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Transcript of August 21, 2020 Hearing), #2 Exhibit 2 (Transcript of September 18, 2020 Hearing))(Webster, Steven)
October 1, 2020 Filing 913 RESPONSE in Support re #896 MOTION to File Under Seal filed by Defendant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Proposed Order)(Reza, Syed)
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 912 ORDER Amending Stipulated Non-Waiver Order #779 . Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 10/1/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01010-CMH-TCB, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA, 1:20-cv-02973-AJT-JFA(aott, )
October 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 911 ORDER granting #909 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re #836 Amended Complaint; directing that Amazon's Amended Answer shall be due on or before October 16, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 10/1/2020. (aott, )
September 30, 2020 Filing 910 Joint MOTION to Amend NonWaiver Order Under FRE 502 re #779 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Balser, David)
September 30, 2020 Filing 909 MOTION Extension of Time to File Answer re #836 Amended Complaint . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vieth, Robert)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 908 ORDER granting #907 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer re #836 Amended Complaint. Defendants' answer due 10/16/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 9/30/2020. (aott, )
September 29, 2020 Filing 907 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #836 Amended Complaint by Defendant. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Angle, Robert)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 906 ORDER granting (871) Motion to File Portions of Memorandum Under Seal in case. (See order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 9/28/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01010-CMH-TCB, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA, 1:20-cv-02973-AJT-JFA(aott, )
September 25, 2020 Filing 905 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 9/25/2020, before Judge John F. Anderson, Court Reporter Anneliese Thomson, Telephone number 703-299-8595. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 10/26/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/25/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/24/2020.(thomson, anneliese)
September 25, 2020 Filing 904 RESPONSE in Support re #871 MOTION to File Portions of Memorandum Under Seal filed by Defendant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Capital One's Proposed Order), #2 Exhibit 2 (Capital One's Proposed Redactions))(Angle, Robert)
September 25, 2020 Filing 903 NOTICE of Appearance by Syed Mohsin Reza on behalf of In Re: Capital One Customer Data Security Breach Litigation (Reza, Syed)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 902 ORDER granting in part and denying in part (875) Motion for Additional Time to Depose Witnesses Houston Hopkins and Michael Johnson (See Order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 9/25/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01010-CMH-TCB, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA, 1:20-cv-02973-AJT-JFA(aott, )
September 25, 2020 Filing 901 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson:Motion Hearing held on 9/25/2020 via ZoomGov re #875 MOTION for Additional Time to Depose Witnesses Houston Hopkins and Michael Johnson . Appearances of counsel. Motion argued and #875 MOTION for Additional Time to Depose Witnesses - GRANTED IN PART/DENIED IN PART. Order to follow. (Court Reporter: A. Thomson)(wgar)
September 24, 2020 Filing 900 Sealed Response/Reply/Opposition re #875 MOTION for Additional Time to Depose Witnesses Houston Hopkins and Michael Johnson . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Webster, Steven)
September 24, 2020 Filing 899 NOTICE by Plaintiff re #896 MOTION to File Under Seal (Waiver of Hearing). (Webster, Steven)
September 24, 2020 Filing 898 NOTICE by Plaintiff re #896 MOTION to File Under Seal (Notice Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5 of Filing of Motion to Seal). (Webster, Steven)
September 24, 2020 Filing 897 Memorandum in Support re #896 MOTION to File Under Seal . (Webster, Steven)
September 24, 2020 Filing 896 MOTION to File Under Seal . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Webster, Steven)
September 24, 2020 Filing 895 Memorandum in Support re #875 MOTION for Additional Time to Depose Witnesses Houston Hopkins and Michael Johnson (Redacted Reply Brief). (Webster, Steven)
September 23, 2020 Filing 894 Waiver of re #891 MOTION to Seal by Defendant (Angle, Robert)
September 23, 2020 Filing 893 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Defendant re #891 MOTION to Seal (Angle, Robert)
September 23, 2020 Filing 892 Memorandum in Support re #891 MOTION to Seal filed by Defendant. (Angle, Robert)
September 23, 2020 Filing 891 MOTION to Seal by Defendant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Capital One's Proposed Order)(Angle, Robert)
September 23, 2020 Filing 890 Memorandum in Opposition re #878 Sealed Memorandum in Support, #877 Memorandum in Support for Additional Time to Depose Witnesses Houston Hopkins and Michael Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of M. Johnson)(Burke, Lara)
September 23, 2020 Filing 889 Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s) re #888 Memorandum in Opposition. (Balser, David)
September 23, 2020 Filing 888 Memorandum in Opposition re #875 MOTION for Additional Time to Depose Witnesses Houston Hopkins and Michael Johnson . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Balser, David)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 887 So Ordered re #881 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Peakday Kep and Narysynuon Kep.. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 9/23/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:20-cv-02973-AJT-JFA(aott)
September 22, 2020 Filing 886 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 9/18/20 ( #855 Plaintiffs' Second Motion to Compel Production of PwC's Report), before Judge John F. Anderson. Court Reporter Rhonda Montgomery, Telephone Number 703-299-4599. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 10/22/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/23/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/21/2020.(montgomery, rhonda)
September 22, 2020 Filing 885 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 9/8/20 (Status Conference), before Judge Anthony J. Trenga and Judge John F. Anderson. Court Reporter Rhonda Montgomery, Telephone Number 703-299-4599. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 10/22/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/23/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/21/2020.(montgomery, rhonda)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 884 Order re #883 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs Aaron Becker, Sandra Black, Claude Evans, Bunthoeun Kun, and Ashlee Maze (1:19-cv-02963).. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 9/22/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA(aott)
September 22, 2020 Filing 883 NOTICE by Plaintiff of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs Aaron Becker, Sandra Black, Claude Evans, Bunthoeun Kun, and Ashlee Maze (1:19-cv-02963). (Webster, Steven)
September 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 882 Order re #875 Motion for Additional Time to Depose Witnesses Houston Hopkins and Michael Johnson. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 9/22/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01010-CMH-TCB, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA, 1:20-cv-02973-AJT-JFA(aott, )
September 21, 2020 Filing 881 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice (Joint) (Kep v. Capital One Bank (USA) N.A, 1:20-cv-2973) by Defendant. (Balser, David)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 880 Pretrial Order #25. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson 9/21/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01010-CMH-TCB, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA, 1:20-cv-02973-AJT-JFA(rban, )
September 21, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Anderson. #875 MOTION for Additional Time to Depose Witnesses Houston Hopkins and Michael Johnson (klau, )
September 21, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #875 MOTION for Additional Time to Depose Witnesses Houston Hopkins and Michael Johnson . Motion Hearing set for 9/25/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 501 before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (klau, )
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 879 ORDERED that Defendant Capital One's Motion #386 and Defendant Amazon's Motion to Dismiss #394 be, and the same hereby are, GRANTED in part and DENIED in part (see Order for details). Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga on 9/18/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01010-CMH-TCB, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA, 1:20-cv-02973-AJT-JFA(dzir, )
September 18, 2020 Filing 878 Sealed Memorandum in Support re #875 MOTION for Additional Time to Depose Witnesses Houston Hopkins and Michael Johnson . (Webster, Steven)
September 18, 2020 Filing 877 (UNAVAILABLE PURSUANT TO ECF #906 )Memorandum in Support re #875 MOTION for Additional Time to Depose Witnesses Houston Hopkins and Michael Johnson (REDACTED). (Webster, Steven) Modified on 9/28/2020 (aott, ).
September 18, 2020 Filing 876 Notice of Hearing Date set for Friday, September 25, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. re #875 MOTION for Additional Time to Depose Witnesses Houston Hopkins and Michael Johnson . (Webster, Steven)
September 18, 2020 Filing 875 MOTION for Additional Time to Depose Witnesses Houston Hopkins and Michael Johnson . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Webster, Steven)
September 18, 2020 Filing 874 NOTICE by Plaintiff re #871 MOTION to File Portions of Memorandum Under Seal (Waiver of Hearing). (Webster, Steven)
September 18, 2020 Filing 873 NOTICE by Plaintiff re #871 MOTION to File Portions of Memorandum Under Seal (Notice of Filing of Motion to Seal Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5). (Webster, Steven)
September 18, 2020 Filing 872 Memorandum in Support re #871 MOTION to File Portions of Memorandum Under Seal . (Webster, Steven)
September 18, 2020 Filing 871 MOTION to File Portions of Memorandum Under Seal . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Webster, Steven)
September 18, 2020 Filing 870 Joint MOTION to Amend Scheduling Order . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Proposed Amended Schedule for Expert Discovery))(Webster, Steven)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 869 Order denying #855 Second Motion to Compel Production PricewaterhouseCoopers Report. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 9/18/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01010-CMH-TCB, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA, 1:20-cv-02973-AJT-JFA(aott, )
September 18, 2020 Filing 868 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson:Motion Hearing held on 9/18/2020 via ZoomGov re #855 Second MOTION to Compel Production of PricewaterhouseCoopers Report . Appearances of counsel. Motion argued and #855 Second MOTION to Compel Production of PricewaterhouseCoopers Report - DENIED. Order to follow. (Tape #FTR.)(wgar, )
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 867 ORDER granting #866 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Susan Clare. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 9/17/2020. (aott, )
September 17, 2020 Filing 866 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Susan Clare and Certification of Local Counsel Kevin O'Brien Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7404463. by Defendant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(O'Brien, Kevin)
September 17, 2020 Filing 865 Memorandum in Support re #855 Second MOTION to Compel Production of PricewaterhouseCoopers Report (Reply Brief). (Webster, Steven)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 864 Order granting #843 MOTION to Seal Exhibits 1 to 6 to the Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants Motion for Protective Order Regarding the March 5, 2019 Severity 1 Incident. (See order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 9/17/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01010-CMH-TCB, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA, 1:20-cv-02973-AJT-JFA(aott, )
September 16, 2020 Filing 863 RESPONSE in Support re #843 MOTION to Seal Exhibits 1 to 6 to the Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants Motion for Protective Order Regarding the March 5, 2019 Severity 1 Incident filed by Defendant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Angle, Robert)
September 16, 2020 Filing 862 Memorandum in Opposition re #855 Second MOTION to Compel Production of PricewaterhouseCoopers Report . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 9/3/20 Letter, #2 Exhibit 2 - 9/10/20 Letter, #3 Exhibit 3 - Alexander Dep. Excerpts)(Balser, David)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 861 Order directing that a hearing on #855 Plaintiffs' motion will be held through ZoomGov video conferencing service on Friday, September 18,2020 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 9/14/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01010-CMH-TCB, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA, 1:20-cv-02973-AJT-JFA(aott, )
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 860 Order granting #824 MOTION to Seal (Non-Confidential Motion to File Certain Exhibits and Information Under Seal). Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 8/14/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01010-CMH-TCB, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA, 1:20-cv-02973-AJT-JFA(aott, )
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 859 Order granting #830 Motion to Seal (Confidential Motion to File Certain Exhibits and Information Under Seal (pertaining to Dkt 828). Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 9/14/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01010-CMH-TCB, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA, 1:20-cv-02973-AJT-JFA(aott, )
September 14, 2020 Reset Deadlines as to #855 Second MOTION to Compel Production of PricewaterhouseCoopers Report . Motion Hearing set for 9/18/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Remote (Zoom) before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (klau, )
September 14, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #855 Second MOTION to Compel Production of PricewaterhouseCoopers Report . Motion Hearing set for 9/18/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 501 before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (klau, )
September 14, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Anderson. #855 Second MOTION to Compel Production of PricewaterhouseCoopers Report (klau, )
September 11, 2020 Filing 858 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 9/11/2020, before Judge John F. Anderson, Court Reporter Anneliese Thomson, Telephone number 703-299-8595. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 10/13/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/12/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/10/2020.(thomson, anneliese)
September 11, 2020 Filing 857 Notice of Hearing Date set for Friday, September 18, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. re #855 Second MOTION to Compel Production of PricewaterhouseCoopers Report . (Webster, Steven)
September 11, 2020 Filing 856 Memorandum in Support re #855 Second MOTION to Compel Production of PricewaterhouseCoopers Report . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Excerpts of Deposition of Robert Alexander))(Webster, Steven)
September 11, 2020 Filing 855 Second MOTION to Compel Production of PricewaterhouseCoopers Report . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Webster, Steven)
September 11, 2020 Filing 854 Memorandum in Support re #830 MOTION to Seal (Confidential Motion to File Certain Exhibits and Information Under Seal (pertaining to Dkt 828) . (Webster, Steven)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 853 ORDER granting in part and denying in part (820) Motion for Protective Order Regarding the March 5, 2019 Severity 1 Incident. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 9/11/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01010-CMH-TCB, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA, 1:20-cv-02973-AJT-JFA(aott, )
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 852 So Ordered re #829 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Zohaib Mohammed. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 9/11/2020. (aott)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 851 So Ordered re #815 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Kimberly Frock, George Lett, Alan Williams, Brooke Pangle, Ritsuko Tsunashima-Kukonu, Joshua Machado, Heather Wilcox, Ashley Kyles, and Ann Cooper. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 9/11/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA(aott, )
September 11, 2020 Filing 850 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson:Motion Hearing held on 9/11/2020 via ZoomGov re #820 MOTION for Protective Order Regarding the March 5, 2019 Severity 1 Incident. Appearances of counsel. Motion argued and #820 MOTION for Protective Order argued and GRANTED IN PART/DENIED IN PART. Order to follow. (Court Reporter: A. Thomson)(wgar)
September 10, 2020 Filing 849 REPLY to Response to Motion re #820 MOTION Protective Order Regarding the March 5, 2019 Severity 1 Incident filed by Defendant. (Balser, David)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 848 Order directing that hearing on #820 Capital One's motion for protective order will be held through ZoomGov video conferencing service on Friday, September 11,2020 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 9/10/2020. (aott, )
September 9, 2020 Filing 847 Sealed Response/Reply/Opposition re #820 MOTION Protective Order Regarding the March 5, 2019 Severity 1 Incident. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Webster, Steven)
September 9, 2020 Filing 846 NOTICE by Plaintiff re #843 MOTION to Seal Exhibits 1 to 6 to the Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants Motion for Protective Order Regarding the March 5, 2019 Severity 1 Incident Waiver of Hearing. (Webster, Steven)
September 9, 2020 Filing 845 NOTICE by Plaintiff re #843 MOTION to Seal Exhibits 1 to 6 to the Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants Motion for Protective Order Regarding the March 5, 2019 Severity 1 Incident Notice of Plaintiffs' Motion to File Under Seal. (Webster, Steven)
September 9, 2020 Filing 844 Memorandum in Support re #843 MOTION to Seal Exhibits 1 to 6 to the Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants Motion for Protective Order Regarding the March 5, 2019 Severity 1 Incident . (Webster, Steven)
September 9, 2020 Filing 843 MOTION to Seal Exhibits 1 to 6 to the Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendants Motion for Protective Order Regarding the March 5, 2019 Severity 1 Incident. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Webster, Steven)
September 9, 2020 Filing 842 Memorandum in Opposition re #820 MOTION Protective Order Regarding the March 5, 2019 Severity 1 Incident . (Webster, Steven)
September 8, 2020 Filing 841 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson: Remote Status Conference held on 9/8/2020. Counsel appeared for Plaintiff and Defendant. Counsel updates the Court on the status of the matter. Status Conference set for 10/13/2020 at 02:00 PM in Alexandria Remote before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (Court Reporter R. Montgomery)(dzir)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 840 ORDER granting #837 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Gregg M. Fishbein. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 9/8/2020. (aott)
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 839 ORDER granting (838) Motion to Withdraw as Counsel filed Cari Laufenberg, T.David Copley, and Lynn Lincoln Sarko. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 9/8/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA(aott)
September 7, 2020 Filing 838 MOTION to Withdraw as Counsel for Most Wanted Motorsports LLC . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Webster, Steven)
September 7, 2020 Filing 837 MOTION For Admission Pro Hac Vice of Gregg M. Fishbein . (Webster, Steven)
September 7, 2020 Filing 836 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Amended Representative Consumer Class Action Complaint) against All Defendants, filed by Plaintiff.(Webster, Steven)
September 7, 2020 Filing 835 NOTICE by Plaintiff of Filing of Amended Representative Consumer Class Action Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Red-lined Amended Complaint))(Webster, Steven)
September 4, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #820 MOTION Protective Order Regarding the March 5, 2019 Severity 1 Incident. Motion Hearing set for 9/11/2020 at 10:00 AM via Zoom before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (dvanm, )
September 4, 2020 Filing 834 Sealed Document re #828 NOTICE. (Angle, Robert)
September 4, 2020 Filing 833 Waiver of (Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument) by Defendant (Angle, Robert)
September 4, 2020 Filing 832 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Defendant re #830 MOTION to Seal (Confidential Motion to File Certain Exhibits and Information Under Seal (pertaining to Dkt 828) (Angle, Robert)
September 4, 2020 Filing 831 Memorandum in Support re #830 MOTION to Seal (Confidential Motion to File Certain Exhibits and Information Under Seal (pertaining to Dkt 828) filed by Defendant. (Angle, Robert)
September 4, 2020 Filing 830 MOTION to Seal (Confidential Motion to File Certain Exhibits and Information Under Seal (pertaining to Dkt 828) by Defendant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Proposed Order)(Angle, Robert)
September 4, 2020 Filing 829 NOTICE by Plaintiff of Voluntary Dismissal by Zohaib Mohammed. (Webster, Steven)
September 4, 2020 Filing 828 NOTICE by In Re: Capital One Customer Data Security Breach Litigation Redacted Joint Proposed Agenda and Status Report for Sept. 8, 2020 Status Conference. (Balser, David)
September 4, 2020 Filing 827 Waiver of re #824 MOTION to Seal (Non-Confidential Motion to File Certain Exhibits and Information Under Seal) (Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument) by Defendant (Angle, Robert)
September 4, 2020 Filing 826 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Defendant re #820 MOTION Protective Order Regarding the March 5, 2019 Severity 1 Incident, #821 Brief,, Exhibits 3, 4, 5, 6, 8, and 9 (Angle, Robert)
September 4, 2020 Filing 825 Memorandum in Support re #824 MOTION to Seal (Non-Confidential Motion to File Certain Exhibits and Information Under Seal) filed by Defendant. (Angle, Robert)
September 4, 2020 Filing 824 MOTION to Seal (Non-Confidential Motion to File Certain Exhibits and Information Under Seal) by Defendant. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order granting Capital One Defendants' Motion to File Certain Exhibits and Information Under Seal)(Angle, Robert)
September 4, 2020 Filing 823 Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s) re #821 Brief,,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3 - CAPITALONE_MDL_000115231, #2 Exhibit 4 - CAPITALONE_MDL_001639298_CAPITALONEMDLVol021, #3 Exhibit 5 - CAPITALONE_MDL_000933521, #4 Exhibit 6 - Walker, Jack 30(b)(6) 07-16-2020 deposition excerpts, #5 Exhibit 8 - Grim 30(b)(6) Dep. Excerpts, #6 Exhibit 9 - Alexander Deposition Excerpts)(Balser, David)
September 4, 2020 Filing 822 Notice of Hearing Date September 11, 2020 re #820 MOTION Protective Order Regarding the March 5, 2019 Severity 1 Incident, #821 Brief,,. (Balser, David)
September 4, 2020 Filing 821 BRIEF by In Re: Capital One Customer Data Security Breach Litigation . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 2020.08.13 - Plaintiffs' Fourth Requests for Production of Documents to Capital One, #2 Exhibit 2 - 2020.08.19 - Plaintiff's Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice to Capital One, #3 Exhibit 3 - Filed Under Seal, #4 Exhibit 4 - Filed Under Seal, #5 Exhibit 5 - Filed Under Seal, #6 Exhibit 6 - Filed Under Seal, #7 Exhibit 7 - 2020.01.28 - Plaintiff's Rule 30(b)(6) Deposition Notice to Capital One, #8 Exhibit 8 - Filed Under Seal, #9 Exhibit 9 - Filed Under Seal)(Balser, David)
September 4, 2020 Filing 820 MOTION Protective Order Regarding the March 5, 2019 Severity 1 Incident. (Balser, David)
September 3, 2020 Filing 819 NOTICE by Plaintiff of Appearance of Counsel (Cornelius P. Dukelow on behalf of Most Wanted Motorsports LLC). (Webster, Steven)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 818 ORDER granting #817 Motion For Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Cornelius P. Dukelow. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 9/3/2020. (aott)
September 3, 2020 Filing 817 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Cornelius P. Dukelow . (Webster, Steven)
September 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 816 ORDER re September 2020 Monthly Status Conference. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 9/2/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01010-CMH-TCB, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA, 1:20-cv-02973-AJT-JFA(rban, )
September 1, 2020 Filing 815 NOTICE by Plaintiff of Voluntary Dismissal by Kimberly Frock, George Lett, Alan Williams, Brooke Pangle, Ritsuko Tsunashima-Kukonu, Joshua Machado, Heather Wilcox, Ashley Kyles, and Ann Cooper (Civil Action No. 1:19-cv-02963). (Webster, Steven)
September 1, 2020 Filing 814 NOTICE by Plaintiff re #800 Memorandum in Support (Filing of Unredacted Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Unredacted Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Compel))(Webster, Steven)
September 1, 2020 Filing 813 NOTICE by Plaintiff re #760 Memorandum in Support,, (Filing of Unredacted Memorandum in Support). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit (Unredacted Memorandum In Support of Motion to Compel), #2 Exhibit 2 (Redacted Exhibit 2 to Memorandum In Support of Motion to Compel))(Webster, Steven)
August 31, 2020 Filing 812 NOTICE by Defendant re #786 Memorandum in Opposition, of Filing Replacement Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of PwC Report (Unredacted). (Attachments: #1 Unredacted Opposition)(Balser, David)
August 26, 2020 Filing 811 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 8/21/2020, before Judge John F. Anderson, Court Reporter Anneliese Thomson, Telephone number 703-299-8595. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 9/25/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/26/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/24/2020.(thomson, anneliese)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 810 ORDER denying #796 Motion to File Portions of Reply Brief Under Seal; directing that Plaintiffs shall re-file their Reply Memorandum in unredacted form on the public docket in this matter. (see order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 8/26/2020.Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01010-CMH-TCB, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA(aott, )
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 809 ORDER granting #788 Motion to Seal Certain Exhibits and Information under Seal; directing that that Exhibits 1-3 to the Memorandum shall remain under seal at this time; directing that Capital One shall re-file the Memorandum in unredacted form on the public docket in this matter. (see order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 8/26/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01010-CMH-TCB, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA(aott, )
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 808 ORDER granting in part (754) Motion to File Documents Under Seal; directing that Exhibits I, 4-6, and 8 to the Memorandum remain under seal at this time; directing that Plaintiffs shall re-file Exhibit 2 to the Memorandum consistent with the redactions indicated in Exhibit B to Capital One's initial Response in Support of Motion to Seal; directing that Plaintiffs shall re-file their Memorandum in unredacted form on the public docket in this matter. (See order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 8/26/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01010-CMH-TCB, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA(aott, )
August 25, 2020 Filing 807 Certified Copy of Conditional Transfer Order (CTO -3) Entered by The United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. MDL No. 2915. Directing that for the reasons stated in the order of October 2, 2019, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Anthony J. Trenga. Plaintiffs' causes of action for breach of contract, slander of credit, and violations of federal Fair Debt Collections Act/Texas Finance Code, which do not relate to the recent Capital One data breach, are separated and simultaneously remanded to the Southern District of Texas. (aott)
August 25, 2020 Filing 806 RESPONSE to Motion re #788 MOTION to Seal (Certain Exhibits and Information under Seal in Dkt. 768), #754 MOTION To File Documents Under Seal , #796 MOTION To File Portions of Reply Brief Under Seal filed by Defendant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Angle, Robert)
August 23, 2020 Filing 805 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 8/14/2020, before Judge John F. Anderson, Court Reporter Anneliese Thomson, Telephone number 703-299-8595. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 9/22/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/23/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/23/2020.(thomson, anneliese)
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 804 Order denying #759 Motion To Compel Production of PricewaterhouseCoopers Report. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 8/21/2020. (aott)
August 21, 2020 Filing 803 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson:Motion Hearing held on 8/21/2020 via ZoomGov re #759 MOTION To Compel Production of PricewaterhouseCoopers Report . Appearances of counsel. #759 MOTION To Compel - DENIED. Order to follow. (Court Reporter: A. Thomson)(wgar, )
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 802 ORDER granting #795 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Andrew Michael Lewis. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 8/19/2020. (aott)
August 18, 2020 Filing 801 Sealed Response/Reply/Opposition re #760 Memorandum in Support,,. (Webster, Steven)
August 18, 2020 Filing 800 Memorandum in Support re #760 Memorandum in Support,, (Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Compel Production of the PricewaterhouseCoopers Report (ECF No. 759)). (Webster, Steven)
August 18, 2020 Filing 799 NOTICE by Plaintiff re #796 MOTION To File Portions of Reply Brief Under Seal (Waiver of Hearing). (Webster, Steven)
August 18, 2020 Filing 798 NOTICE by Plaintiff re #796 MOTION To File Portions of Reply Brief Under Seal (Notice of Filing of Motion to Seal Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5). (Webster, Steven)
August 18, 2020 Filing 797 Memorandum in Support re #796 MOTION To File Portions of Reply Brief Under Seal . (Webster, Steven)
August 18, 2020 Filing 796 MOTION To File Portions of Reply Brief Under Seal . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Webster, Steven)
August 18, 2020 Filing 795 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Amazon Defendants - Andrew Michael Lewis. (Vieth, Robert)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 794 Order setting hearing as to #759 Motion To Compel Production of PricewaterhouseCoopers Report .(See Order for details) Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 8/17/2020. Motion Hearing set for 8/21/2020 at 11:00 AM via ZoomGov video conferencing service before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (aott)
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 793 Order granting #765 MOTION To File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson 8/17/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01010-CMH-TCB, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA(rban, )
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 792 ORDER granting #765 Motion to file under seal; directing that Exhibits 2 and 3 to the Memorandum [Dkt. Nos. 772-2 & 772-3], as well as the information redacted in Plaintiffs' Memorandum [0kt. No. 770] on pages 3 and 7 shall remain under seal at this time. (See order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 8/17/2020. (aott)
August 14, 2020 Filing 791 Waiver of re #788 MOTION to Seal (Certain Exhibits and Information under Seal in Dkt. 768) (Waiver of Oral Argument of Dkt. 788) by Defendant (Angle, Robert)
August 14, 2020 Filing 790 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Defendant re #788 MOTION to Seal (Certain Exhibits and Information under Seal in Dkt. 768) (Angle, Robert)
August 14, 2020 Filing 789 Memorandum in Support re #788 MOTION to Seal (Certain Exhibits and Information under Seal in Dkt. 768) filed by Defendant. (Angle, Robert)
August 14, 2020 Filing 788 MOTION to Seal (Certain Exhibits and Information under Seal in Dkt. 768) by Defendant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Proposed Order)(Angle, Robert)
August 14, 2020 Filing 787 Sealed Response/Reply/Opposition re #786 Memorandum in Opposition,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Balser, David)
August 14, 2020 Filing 786 Memorandum in Opposition re #760 Memorandum in Support,, . (Attachments: #1 Declaration - Cooper, #2 Declaration - Finneran, #3 Declaration - Klane, #4 Declaration - Serbee, #5 Declaration - Williams, #6 Exhibit 1, #7 Exhibit 2, #8 Exhibit 3, #9 Exhibit 4, #10 Exhibit 5, #11 Exhibit 6, #12 Exhibit 7, #13 Exhibit 8)(Balser, David)
August 14, 2020 Filing 785 RESPONSE in Support re #765 MOTION To File Documents Under Seal filed by Defendant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Angle, Robert)
August 14, 2020 Filing 784 RESPONSE in Support re #754 MOTION To File Documents Under Seal filed by Defendant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Angle, Robert)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 783 Order granting #769 MOTION To Compel. (See Order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 8/14/2020. (aott)
August 14, 2020 Filing 782 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson:Motion Hearing held on 8/14/2020 via ZoomGov re #769 MOTION To Compel Text Message Discovery From Amazon Defendants . Appearances of counsel. Motion argued and MOTION To Compel - GRANTED. Order to follow. (FTR/Court Reporter: A. Thomson)(wgar, )
August 13, 2020 Filing 781 Memorandum in Support re #770 Memorandum in Support (Reply Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Text Message Discovery from Amazon Defendants). (Webster, Steven)
August 12, 2020 Filing 780 Memorandum in Opposition re #770 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Text Message Discovery from Amazon Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit /Decl. of T. Newby w/Exs. A-B in Support of Opposition to Motion to Compel)(Vieth, Robert)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 779 Stipulated Non-Waiver Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 8/12/2020. (aott, )
August 12, 2020 Filing 778 Joint MOTION for Non-Waiver Order Under FRE 502 . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Balser, David)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 777 So Ordered in re #775 Stipulated Order Re: Disposition of Broderick Plaintiffs' Claims. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 8/11/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA(aott)
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 776 Order re #769 Motion To Compel Text Message Discovery From Amazon Defendants . Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 8/11/2020. Hearing set for 8/14/2020 at 11:00 AM via ZoomGov video conferencing before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (aott, )
August 10, 2020 Filing 775 STIPULATION Regarding Stipulated Order Re: Disposition of Broderick Plaintiffs' Claims by In Re: Capital One Customer Data Security Breach Litigation. (Williamson, Andrew)
August 10, 2020 Filing 774 Notice re August 2020 Monthly Status Conference directing that the status conference scheduled for Tuesday, August 11, 2020 at 3:00pm is Cancelled. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 8/10/2020. (aott, )
August 10, 2020 Filing 773 NOTICE by Plaintiff (Joint Proposed Agenda and Status Report For August 11, 2020 Status Conference). (Webster, Steven)
August 10, 2020 Set Hearings: Monthly Status Conference set for 9/8/2020 at 02:00 PM in Alexandria Remote (via Zoom) before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (dzir)
August 10, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Anderson. #769 MOTION To Compel Text Message Discovery From Amazon Defendants (clar, )
August 10, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #769 MOTION To Compel Text Message Discovery From Amazon Defendants . Motion Hearing set for 8/14/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 501 before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (clar, )
August 7, 2020 Filing 772 Sealed Memorandum in Support re #769 MOTION To Compel Text Message Discovery From Amazon Defendants . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 (Part 1), #3 Exhibit 2 (Part 2), #4 Exhibit 2 (Part 3), #5 Exhibit 3)(Webster, Steven)
August 7, 2020 Filing 771 Notice of Hearing Date set for Friday, August 14, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. re #769 MOTION To Compel Text Message Discovery From Amazon Defendants . (Webster, Steven)
August 7, 2020 Filing 770 Memorandum in Support re #769 MOTION To Compel Text Message Discovery From Amazon Defendants (Redacted). (Webster, Steven)
August 7, 2020 Filing 769 MOTION To Compel Text Message Discovery From Amazon Defendants . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Webster, Steven)
August 7, 2020 Filing 768 NOTICE by Plaintiff re #765 MOTION To File Documents Under Seal (Waiver of Hearing). (Webster, Steven)
August 7, 2020 Filing 767 NOTICE by Plaintiff re #765 MOTION To File Documents Under Seal (Notice of Filing of Motion to Seal Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5). (Webster, Steven)
August 7, 2020 Filing 766 Memorandum in Support re #765 MOTION To File Documents Under Seal . (Webster, Steven)
August 7, 2020 Filing 765 MOTION To File Documents Under Seal . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Webster, Steven)
August 7, 2020 Filing 764 Notice re August Monthly Status Conference. (see notice for details). Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 8/7/2020. Status Conference set for 8/11/2020 at 02:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (aott) (aott)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 763 ORDER directing that the hearing on #759 motion to compel will be held on the morning of Friday, August 21, 2020 at a specific time that will be set later. Defendants' opposition to this motion must be filed by 5:00 p.m. on Friday, August 14, 2020 and plaintiffs' reply must be filed by 5:00 p.m. on Tuesday, August 18, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 8/7/2020. Hearing as to #759 Motion To Compel set for morning of 8/21/2020. (aott, )
August 7, 2020 Filing 762 Sealed Memorandum in Support re #759 MOTION To Compel Production of PricewaterhouseCoopers Report . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 8)(Webster, Steven)
August 7, 2020 Filing 761 Notice of Hearing Date set for Friday, August 14, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. re #759 MOTION To Compel Production of PricewaterhouseCoopers Report . (Webster, Steven)
August 7, 2020 Filing 760 Memorandum in Support re #759 MOTION To Compel Production of PricewaterhouseCoopers Report . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Filed Under Seal), #2 Exhibit 2 (Filed Under Seal), #3 Exhibit 3 (Recipients of PricewaterhouseCoopers Report), #4 Exhibit 4 (Filed Under Seal), #5 Exhibit 5 (Filed Under Seal), #6 Exhibit 6 (Filed Under Seal), #7 Exhibit 7 (Email from D. Balser to N. Siegel), #8 Exhibit 8 (Filed Under Seal), #9 Exhibit 9 (OCC Cease and Desist Order), #10 Exhibit 10 (OCC Consent Order for the Assessment of Civil Money Penalty), #11 Exhibit 11 (Federal Reserve Board Order))(Webster, Steven)
August 7, 2020 Filing 759 MOTION To Compel Production of PricewaterhouseCoopers Report . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Webster, Steven)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 758 AMENDED ORDER. ORDERED that defendants' motion is granted in part and denied in part. The court will limit plaintiffs to up to ten nonparty, nonexpert depositions with current employees of both defendants considered "parties". Defendants combined are limited to up to ten nonparty, nonexpert depositions with only the representative plaintiffs considered "parties". Any further modifications will only be granted by a showing of good cause or by the agreement of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson 8/7/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01010-CMH-TCB, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA(rban, )
August 7, 2020 Filing 757 NOTICE by Plaintiff re #754 MOTION To File Documents Under Seal (Waiver of Hearing). (Webster, Steven)
August 7, 2020 Filing 756 NOTICE by Plaintiff re #754 MOTION To File Documents Under Seal (Notice Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5(C) of Filing of Motion to Seal). (Webster, Steven)
August 7, 2020 Filing 755 Memorandum in Support re #754 MOTION To File Documents Under Seal . (Webster, Steven)
August 7, 2020 Filing 754 MOTION To File Documents Under Seal . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Webster, Steven)
August 7, 2020 Notice re August Monthly Status Conference. (see notice for details). Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 8/7/2020. Status Conference set for 8/11/2020 at 02:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (aott)
August 7, 2020 Re-Set Deadlines/Hearings Status Conference set for 8/11/2020 at 02:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (clar, )
August 6, 2020 Filing 753 NOTICE by Defendant re #723 Memorandum in Support, Replacement Memorandum In Support of Motion to Limit Nonparty, Nonexpert Depositions and to Allow Defendants to Depose the Named Plaintiffs and Exhibits 5-9. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Redacted Ex. 5, #2 Exhibit 2 - Redacted Ex. 6, #3 Exhibit 3 - Ex. 7, #4 Exhibit 4 - Ex. 8, #5 Exhibit 5 - Ex. 9, #6 Exhibit 6 - Corrected Redacted Brief)(Balser, David)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 752 ORDER granting #747 Amended Motion to File Certain Exhibits And Information Under Seal. (See Order for specific details). Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 8/6/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01010-CMH-TCB, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA(aott, )
August 4, 2020 Filing 751 Sealed Response/Reply/Opposition re #723 Memorandum in Support,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5, #2 Exhibit 13, #3 Exhibit 14, #4 Exhibit 17, #5 Exhibit 18, #6 Exhibit 21, #7 Exhibit 22, #8 Exhibit 23, #9 Exhibit 24, #10 Exhibit 25)(Webster, Steven)
August 4, 2020 Filing 750 Memorandum in Opposition re #723 Memorandum in Support, (Corrected/Redacted Memorandum in Opposition). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit (Declaration of Karen Hanson Riebel), #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19, #21 Exhibit 20, #22 Exhibit 21, #23 Exhibit 22, #24 Exhibit 23, #25 Exhibit 24, #26 Exhibit 25)(Webster, Steven)
August 4, 2020 Filing 749 NOTICE by Plaintiff re #747 Amended MOTION (Amended Motion to Seal) re #732 MOTION To File Certain Exhibits And Information Under Seal (Notice of Filing of Amended Motion to Seal Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5). (Webster, Steven)
August 4, 2020 Filing 748 Memorandum in Support re #747 Amended MOTION (Amended Motion to Seal) re #732 MOTION To File Certain Exhibits And Information Under Seal . (Webster, Steven)
August 4, 2020 Filing 747 Amended MOTION (Amended Motion to Seal) re #732 MOTION To File Certain Exhibits And Information Under Seal . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Webster, Steven)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 746 Order granting in part #725 Motion to Seal (Non-Confidential Motion to File Certain Exhibits and Information Under Seal) ; directing that the exhibits 10, 11, 12, 13, 14 and 15 to Defendants' Memorandum shall remain under seal at this time; directing that the Defendants shall file an unredacted version of exhibits 7, 8, and 9 to Defendants' Memorandum in the public record; directing that the Defendants shall file redacted versions or exhibits 5 and 6 to Defendants' Memorandum as redacted and attached to Plaintiffs' Response to Motion to Seal; directing that the Defendants shall file a corrected redacted version or Defendants' Memorandum removing the redactions from page 14 through the first partial paragraph on page 15, and from footnotes 9 and 10. (see Order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 8/3/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01010-CMH-TCB, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA(aott, )
July 31, 2020 Filing 745 Memorandum in Support re #725 MOTION to Seal (Non-Confidential Motion to File Certain Exhibits and Information Under Seal) (Plaintiffs' Response in Support). (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Webster, Steven)
July 31, 2020 Filing 744 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 7/31/2020, before Judge John F. Anderson, Court Reporter Anneliese Thomson, Telephone number 703-299-8595. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 8/31/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/30/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/29/2020.(thomson, anneliese)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 743 ORDER, for the reasons stated during the hearing on 7/31/2020 granting in part and denying in part #722 Motion to Limit Nonparty, NonExpert Depositions. The court will limit plaintiffs up to ten nonparty, nonexpert depositions with current employees of both defendants not considered "parties". Defendants combined are limited to up to ten nonparty, nonexpert depositions with only the representative plaintiffs considered "parties". Any further modifications will only be granted by a showing of good cause or by the agreement of counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 7/31/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01010-CMH-TCB, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA(rban, )
July 31, 2020 Filing 742 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson:Motion Hearing held on 7/31/2020 via ZoomGov re #722 MOTION to Limit Nonparty, NonExpert Depositions filed by In Re: Capital One Customer Data Security Breach Litigation. Appearances of counsel. Motion argued and #722 MOTION to Limit Nonparty, NonExpert Depositions - GRANTED IN PART/DENIED IN PART. Order to follow. (Court Reporter: A. Thomson)(wgar, )
July 30, 2020 Filing 741 NOTICE by Plaintiff re #730 MDL Order,,,,,,, (Notice of Public Filing of Exhibits A, D, and F to ECF No. 686). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (6-19-20 Privilege Log), #2 Exhibit D (7-2-20 Privilege Log), #3 Exhibit F (7-8-20 Privilege Log))(Webster, Steven)
July 30, 2020 Filing 740 Memorandum in Support re #722 MOTION to Limit Nonparty, NonExpert Depositions . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 16 - 04-10-20 Email, #2 Exhibit 17 - 06-02-20 Email)(Balser, David)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 739 Order granting #738 Joint Motion to Amend the July 17, 2020 Order re #717 ORDER granting in part (685) Motion to Compel; directing that the Agencies shall revise their July 2, 2020 privilege log in accordance with the proposal set forth in the Joint Motion to Amend and shall serve a copy of the revised privilege log on Plaintiffs no later than August 7, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 7/30/2020. (aott)
July 29, 2020 Filing 738 Joint MOTION to Amend the July 17, 2020 Order re #717 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,,,,,,, by Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System, Office of the Comptroller of the Currency. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Levenson, Rebecca)
July 29, 2020 Filing 737 Sealed Response/Reply/Opposition re #732 MOTION To File Certain Exhibits And Information Under Seal . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit (Declaration of Karen Hanson Riebel-Unredacted), #2 Exhibit 4 (Filed Under Seal), #3 Exhibit 5 (Filed Under Seal), #4 Exhibit 6 (Filed Under Seal), #5 Exhibit 7 (Filed Under Seal), #6 Exhibit 8 (Filed Under Seal), #7 Exhibit 9 (Filed Under Seal), #8 Exhibit 10 (Filed Under Seal), #9 Exhibit 11 (Filed Under Seal), #10 Exhibit 12 (Filed Under Seal), #11 Exhibit 13 (Filed Under Seal), #12 Exhibit 14 (Filed Under Seal), #13 Exhibit 15 (Filed Under Seal), #14 Exhibit 16 (Filed Under Seal), #15 Exhibit 17 (Filed Under Seal), #16 Exhibit 18 (Filed Under Seal), #17 Exhibit 19 (Filed Under Seal), #18 Exhibit 20 (Filed Under Seal), #19 Exhibit 21 (Filed Under Seal), #20 Exhibit 22 (Filed Under Seal), #21 Exhibit 23 (Filed Under Seal), #22 Exhibit 24 (Filed Under Seal), #23 Exhibit 25 (Filed Under Seal))(Webster, Steven)
July 29, 2020 Filing 736 Memorandum in Opposition re #722 MOTION to Limit Nonparty, NonExpert Depositions . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit (Declaration of Karen Hanson Riebel-Redacted), #2 Exhibit 1 (Transcript of Initial Pretrial Conference), #3 Exhibit 2 (Letter from David Balser to John Yanchunis Dated July 20, 2020), #4 Exhibit 3 (Transcript of July 14, 2020 Status Conference), #5 Exhibit 4 (Filed Under Seal), #6 Exhibit 5 (Filed Under Seal), #7 Exhibit 6 (Filed Under Seal), #8 Exhibit 7 (Filed Under Seal), #9 Exhibit 8 (Filed Under Seal), #10 Exhibit 9 (Filed Under Seal), #11 Exhibit 10 (Filed Under Seal), #12 Exhibit 11 (Filed Under Seal), #13 Exhibit 12 (Filed Under Seal), #14 Exhibit 13 (Filed Under Seal), #15 Exhibit 14 (Filed Under Seal), #16 Exhibit 15 (Filed Under Seal), #17 Exhibit 16 (Filed Under Seal), #18 Exhibit 17 (Filed Under Seal), #19 Exhibit 18 (Filed Under Seal), #20 Exhibit 19 (Filed Under Seal), #21 Exhibit 20 (Filed Under Seal), #22 Exhibit 21 (Filed Under Seal), #23 Exhibit 22 (Filed Under Seal), #24 Exhibit 23 (Filed Under Seal), #25 Exhibit 24 (Filed Under Seal), #26 Exhibit 25 (Filed Under Seal))(Webster, Steven)
July 29, 2020 Filing 735 NOTICE by Plaintiff re #732 MOTION To File Certain Exhibits And Information Under Seal (Waiver of Oral Argument). (Webster, Steven)
July 29, 2020 Filing 734 NOTICE by Plaintiff re #732 MOTION To File Certain Exhibits And Information Under Seal (Notice of Filing of Motion to Seal) (Webster, Steven)
July 29, 2020 Filing 733 Memorandum in Support re #732 MOTION To File Certain Exhibits And Information Under Seal . (Webster, Steven)
July 29, 2020 Filing 732 MOTION To File Certain Exhibits And Information Under Seal . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Webster, Steven)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 731 Order setting hearing re #722 Motion to Limit Nonparty, NonExpert Depositions. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 7/28/2020. Motion Hearing set for 7/31/2020 at 11:00 AM via ZoomGov video conferencing before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01010-CMH-TCB, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA(aott, )
July 28, 2020 Reset Deadlines as to #722 MOTION to Limit Nonparty, NonExpert Depositions . Motion Hearing set for 7/31/2020 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 501 before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (clar, )
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 730 Order denying #683 Motion to File Bank Examination Privilege Logs Under Seal; directing that plaintiff's shall file a copy of exhibits A, D and F in the public record. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 7/27/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01010-CMH-TCB, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA(aott, )
July 27, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #722 MOTION to Limit Nonparty, NonExpert Depositions . Motion Hearing set for 7/31/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (clar, )
July 27, 2020 Reset Deadlines as to #722 MOTION to Limit Nonparty, NonExpert Depositions . Motion Hearing set for 7/31/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 501 before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (clar, )
July 27, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Anderson. #722 MOTION to Limit Nonparty, NonExpert Depositions (clar, )
July 24, 2020 Filing 729 Sealed Memorandum in Support re #725 MOTION to Seal (Non-Confidential Motion to File Certain Exhibits and Information Under Seal). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 5, #2 Exhibit 6, #3 Exhibit 7, #4 Exhibit 8, #5 Exhibit 9, #6 Exhibit 10, #7 Exhibit 11, #8 Exhibit 12, #9 Exhibit 13, #10 Exhibit 14, #11 Exhibit 15)(Balser, David)
July 24, 2020 Filing 728 NOTICE by Defendant re #725 MOTION to Seal (Non-Confidential Motion to File Certain Exhibits and Information Under Seal) (Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument) (Angle, Robert)
July 24, 2020 Filing 727 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Defendant re #725 MOTION to Seal (Non-Confidential Motion to File Certain Exhibits and Information Under Seal) (Angle, Robert)
July 24, 2020 Filing 726 Memorandum in Support re #725 MOTION to Seal (Non-Confidential Motion to File Certain Exhibits and Information Under Seal) filed by Defendant. (Angle, Robert)
July 24, 2020 Filing 725 MOTION to Seal (Non-Confidential Motion to File Certain Exhibits and Information Under Seal) by Defendant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Capital One's Proposed Order)(Angle, Robert)
July 24, 2020 Filing 724 Notice of Hearing Date re #722 MOTION to Limit Nonparty, NonExpert Depositions . (Balser, David)
July 24, 2020 Filing 723 Memorandum in Support re #722 MOTION to Limit Nonparty, NonExpert Depositions (Redacted) filed by In Re: Capital One Customer Data Security Breach Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15)(Balser, David)
July 24, 2020 Filing 722 MOTION to Limit Nonparty, NonExpert Depositions by In Re: Capital One Customer Data Security Breach Litigation. (Balser, David) Modified text on 7/28/2020 (clar, ).
July 23, 2020 Filing 721 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 7/14/20 (Status Conference), before Judge Anthony J. Trenga and Judge John F. Anderson, Court Reporter/Transcriber Rhonda Montgomery, Telephone number 703-299-4599. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 8/24/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/22/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/21/2020.(montgomery, rhonda)
July 22, 2020 Filing 720 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 7/17/2020, before Judge John F. Anderson, Court Reporter Anneliese Thomson, Telephone number 703-299-8595. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 8/21/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/21/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/20/2020.(thomson, anneliese)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 719 So Ordered #718 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Eric Barnes. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 7/17/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA(aott)
July 17, 2020 Filing 718 NOTICE by Plaintiff of Voluntary Dismissal by Eric Barnes (Corrected Case Number: 1:19-cv-02963). (Webster, Steven)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 717 ORDER granting in part (685) Motion MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Withheld by Intervenors the Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System and the Office of the Comptroller of the Currency on the Basis of the Bank Examination Privilege; directing that the Agencies are to provide a supplemental log to plaintiffs within three weeks of this order; directing that the supplemental log must address the issues discussed during the hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 7/17/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01010-CMH-TCB, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA(aott, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 716 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson:Motion Hearing held on 7/17/2020 via Zoomgov re #685 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Withheld by Intervenors the Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System and the Office of the Comptroller of the Currency on the Basis of the Bank Examination Privilege. Appearances of counsel. Motion argued and #685 MOTION to Compel - GRANTED IN PART. Order to follow. (Court Reporter: A. Thomson)(wgar, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 715 NOTICE by Plaintiff of Voluntary Dismissal by Eric Barnes (1:19-cv-02489). (Webster, Steven)
July 16, 2020 Filing 714 Memorandum in Support re #685 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Withheld by Intervenors the Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System and the Office of the Comptroller of the Currency on the Basis of the Bank Examination Privilege (Reply Brief). (Webster, Steven)
July 15, 2020 Filing 713 Memorandum in Opposition re #685 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Withheld by Intervenors the Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System and the Office of the Comptroller of the Currency on the Basis of the Bank Examination Privilege filed by Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System, Office of the Comptroller of the Currency. (Levenson, Rebecca)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 712 So Ordered re #709 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Eliyahu Lipskar. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 7/15/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA(aott)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 711 So Ordered re #708 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Howard Chen and Jarod Thrush. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 7/15/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA(aott)
July 14, 2020 Filing 710 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson: Remote Status Conference held on 7/14/2020. Counsel for Plaintiff and Defendant appeared via Zoom. Counsel updates the Court on the status of the matter. Status Conference set for 8/11/2020 at 02:00 PM in Alexandria Remote before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (Court Reporter R. Montgomery)(dzir)
July 14, 2020 Filing 709 NOTICE by Plaintiff of Voluntary Dismissal by Eliyahu Lipskar (1:19-cv-02920). (Webster, Steven)
July 14, 2020 Filing 708 NOTICE by Plaintiff of Voluntary Dismissal by Howard Chen and Jarod Thrush (1:19-cv-02939). (Webster, Steven)
July 14, 2020 Filing 707 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 6/26/2020, before Judge John F. Anderson, Transcriber Anneliese Thomson, Telephone number 703-299-8595. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 8/13/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/14/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/13/2020.(thomson, anneliese)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 706 ORDER setting hearing re #685 Motion to Compel Production of Documents Withheld by Intervenors the Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System and the Office of the Comptroller of the Currency on the Basis of the Bank Examination Privilege . (See order for details) Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 7/14/2020. Motion Hearing set for 7/17/2020 at 10:00 AM via ZoomGov Video before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (aott, )
July 13, 2020 Filing 705 NOTICE by Defendant Capital One (Notice of Firm Name Change) (Angle, Robert)
July 13, 2020 Filing 704 STATUS REPORT and Joint Proposed Agenda by Defendant. (Balser, David)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 703 So Ordered re #695 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Josette Jackson, April Poling, and Viola Thomas. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 7/13/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA(aott, )
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 702 So Ordered #693 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Steven Summer and Katelyn Vita. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 7/13/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA(aott)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 701 So Ordered re #692 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Salvador Corona, Donald Osborne, and Gina Valvo. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 7/13/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA(aott, )
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 700 So Ordered re #682 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Alexander Hun. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 7/13/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA(aott, )
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 699 So Ordered re #681 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Cindy Bowen and Diane Dillashaw. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 7/13/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA(aott, )
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 698 So Ordered re #680 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Aimee Aballo. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 7/13/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA(aott, )
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 697 So Ordered re #679 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Molly Piesco and Wendy Friedman. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 7/13/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA(aott)
July 13, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #685 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Withheld by Intervenors the Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System and the Office of the Comptroller of the Currency on the Basis of the Bank Examination Privilege . Motion Hearing set for 7/17/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 501 before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (clar, )
July 13, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Anderson. #685 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Withheld by Intervenors the Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System and the Office of the Comptroller of the Currency on the Basis of the Bank Examination Privilege (clar, )
July 10, 2020 Filing 696 NOTICE by Defendant re #655 MDL Order,,,,,,, of Filing of Revised Redacted Exhibit (Attachments: #1 Revised Redacted Exhibit)(Zinsner, Mary)
July 10, 2020 Filing 695 NOTICE by Plaintiff of Voluntary Dismissal by Josette Jackson, April Poling, and Viola Thomas (1:19-cv-02963). (Webster, Steven)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 694 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting #392 and #393 Defendants Motions; directing that the action is dismissed. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 7/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA(aott, )
July 10, 2020 Filing 693 NOTICE by Plaintiff of Voluntary Dismissal by Steven Summer and Katelyn Vita (1:19-cv-02937). (Webster, Steven)
July 10, 2020 Filing 692 NOTICE by Plaintiff of Voluntary Dismissal by Salvador Corona, Donald Osborne, and Gina Valvo (1:19-cv-02950). (Webster, Steven)
July 10, 2020 Filing 691 NOTICE by Plaintiff re #685 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Withheld by Intervenors the Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System and the Office of the Comptroller of the Currency on the Basis of the Bank Examination Privilege (Corrected Proposed Order on Motion to Compel). (Webster, Steven)
July 10, 2020 Filing 690 Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s) re #683 MOTION to File Bank Examination Privilege Logs Under Seal . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (6-19-20 Privilege Log), #2 Exhibit D (7-2-20 Privilege Log), #3 Exhibit F (7-8-20 Privilege Log))(Webster, Steven)
July 10, 2020 Filing 689 NOTICE by Plaintiff re #683 MOTION to File Bank Examination Privilege Logs Under Seal (Notice Pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5(C) of Filing of Motion to Seal). (Webster, Steven)
July 10, 2020 Filing 688 NOTICE by Plaintiff re #683 MOTION to File Bank Examination Privilege Logs Under Seal (Waiver of Hearing). (Webster, Steven)
July 10, 2020 Filing 687 Notice of Hearing Date set for Friday, July 17, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. re #685 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Withheld by Intervenors the Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System and the Office of the Comptroller of the Currency on the Basis of the Bank Examination Privilege . (Webster, Steven)
July 10, 2020 Filing 686 Memorandum in Support re #685 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Withheld by Intervenors the Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System and the Office of the Comptroller of the Currency on the Basis of the Bank Examination Privilege . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (To Be Filed Under Seal), #2 Exhibit B (Letter to FRB and OCC Regarding Privilege Log Deficiencies), #3 Exhibit C (Email Correspondence), #4 Exhibit D (To Be Filed Under Seal), #5 Exhibit E (Email Correspondence), #6 Exhibit F (To Be Filed Under Seal))(Webster, Steven)
July 10, 2020 Filing 685 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Withheld by Intervenors the Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System and the Office of the Comptroller of the Currency on the Basis of the Bank Examination Privilege . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Webster, Steven)
July 10, 2020 Filing 684 Memorandum in Support re #683 MOTION to File Bank Examination Privilege Logs Under Seal . (Webster, Steven)
July 10, 2020 Filing 683 MOTION to File Bank Examination Privilege Logs Under Seal . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Webster, Steven)
July 10, 2020 Filing 682 NOTICE by Plaintiff of Voluntary Dismissal by Alexander Hun (1:19-cv-02921). (Webster, Steven)
July 10, 2020 Filing 681 NOTICE by Plaintiff of Voluntary Dismissal by Cindy Bowen and Diane Dillashaw (1:19-cv-02966). (Webster, Steven)
July 10, 2020 Filing 680 NOTICE by Plaintiff of Voluntary Dismissal by Aimee Aballo (1:19-cv-02929). (Webster, Steven)
July 10, 2020 Filing 679 NOTICE by Plaintiff of Voluntary Dismissal by Molly Piesco and Wendy Friedman (1:19-cv-02965). (Webster, Steven)
July 10, 2020 Filing 678 NOTICE by Plaintiff of Change of Address for Counsel Melissa R. Emert (1:19-cv-02965). (Webster, Steven)
July 9, 2020 Filing 677 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Mordechai Nemes by Plaintiff (Williamson, Andrew)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 676 Notice re July 2020 Monthly Status Conference; directing that the court will conduct the monthly status conference on Tuesday, July 14, 2020 at 2:00pm Eastern Time via video conference and teleconference. (See order for details). Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 7/9/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01010-CMH-TCB, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA(aott, )
July 9, 2020 Filing 675 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Shawn Spears by Plaintiff (Williamson, Andrew)
July 9, 2020 Filing 674 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Ryan Olsen by Plaintiff (Williamson, Andrew)
July 9, 2020 Filing 673 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Lynn Fields by Plaintiff (Williamson, Andrew)
July 9, 2020 Filing 672 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Susan Corley by Plaintiff (Williamson, Andrew)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 671 So Ordered re #661 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Ernesto De La Fe, Dorothy Hauser, Michael Hauser, Timothy Hayden, Michael Hoskinson-Short, Necrotizing Faciitis Foundation, Patrick Soto, Julio Vera, and Lindsay Welsh. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 7/9/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA(aott, )
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 670 So Ordered re #667 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Aaron Saul Greenberg, M.D.P.C. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 7/9/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA(aott, )
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 669 So Ordered re #666 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Sean DeMarco. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 7/9/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA(aott, )
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 668 So Ordered re #665 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Kelly Miller. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 7/9/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA(aott, )
July 8, 2020 Filing 667 NOTICE by Plaintiff of Voluntary Dismissal by Aaron Saul Greenberg, M.D.P.C. (1:19-cv-02965). (Webster, Steven)
July 8, 2020 Filing 666 NOTICE by Plaintiff of Voluntary Dismissal by Sean DeMarco (1:19-cv-01042). (Webster, Steven)
July 8, 2020 Filing 665 NOTICE by Plaintiff of Voluntary Dismissal as to Kelly Miller (1:19-cv-02962). (Webster, Steven)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 664 So Ordered re #662 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Belinda Aylward. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 7/8/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA(aott)
July 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 663 STIPULATED ORDER GOVERNING NOTARIZATION OF DEPOSITION TRANSCRIPTS AND ERRATA FORMS. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 6/8/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01010-CMH-TCB, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA(aott, )
July 8, 2020 Filing 662 NOTICE by Plaintiff of Voluntary Dismissal as to Belinda Aylward (1:19-cv-02938). (Webster, Steven)
July 7, 2020 Filing 661 NOTICE by Plaintiff of Voluntary Dismissal as to Ernesto De La Fe, Dorothy Hauser, Michael Hauser, Timothy Hayden, Michael Hoskinson-Short, Necrotizing Faciitis Foundation, Patrick Soto, Julio Vera, and Lindsay Welsh (1:19-cv-02934). (Webster, Steven)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 660 So Ordered re #658 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Jonathan Grimm. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 7/7/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA(aott, )
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 659 So Ordered re #657 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Rachel McDonough. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 7/7/2020. (aott)
July 7, 2020 Filing 658 NOTICE by Plaintiff of Voluntary Dismissal by Jonathan Grimm (1:19-cv-02961). (Webster, Steven)
July 7, 2020 Filing 657 NOTICE by Plaintiff of Voluntary Dismissal by Rachel McDonough (1:19-cv-00984). (Webster, Steven)
July 7, 2020 Filing 656 STIPULATION Governing Notarization of Deposition Transcripts and Errata Forms (Proposed) by Defendant. (Balser, David)
July 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 655 Order directing that Capital One shall file in the public record a revised version of the SOW that was filed on June 29, 2020 (Docket no. 648-1) that removes the redactions contained in paragraph 2.1. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 7/6/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01010-CMH-TCB, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA(aott, )
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 654 Order granting #650 MOTION Clarification by Consumer Financial Protection Bureau. It shall serve a privilege log concerning the 362 documents identified in its motion by no later than 7/8/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson 7/2/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01010-CMH-TCB, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA(rban, )
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 653 SO ORDERED re #640 NOTICE by Plaintiff of Voluntary Dismissal by Kevin Monti and Brandy Racicot. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 7/2/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA(rban, )
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 652 So ORDERED re #649 NOTICE by Plaintiff of Voluntary Dismissal by Jessica Easton. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 7/2/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA(rban, )
July 1, 2020 Filing 651 Waiver of Oral Argument by Consumer Financial Protection Bureau (Levenson, Rebecca)
July 1, 2020 Filing 650 MOTION Clarification by Consumer Financial Protection Bureau. (Levenson, Rebecca)
July 1, 2020 Filing 649 NOTICE by Plaintiff of Voluntary Dismissal by Jessica Easton (1:19-cv-02951). (Webster, Steven)
June 29, 2020 Filing 648 Memorandum in Support re #552 MOTION to Seal Certain Exhibits and Information (Supplemental Memorandum) filed by Defendant. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Statement of Work, #2 Proposed Order re Supplemental Memorandum in Support of Motion to Seal Mandiant SOW)(Angle, Robert)
June 26, 2020 Filing 647 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson:Motion Hearing held on 6/26/2020 via Zoomgov re #612 MOTION to Intervene filed by Consumer Financial Protection Bureau, #602 MOTION for Clarification of the Court's June 5, 2020 Order filed by Office of the Comptroller of the Currency, Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System, #580 MOTION for Reconsideration re #536 MDL Order MOTION for Reconsideration (Rule 72) re #536 MDL Order filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. Appearances of counsel. Motions argued and #580 MOTION for Reconsideration - GRANTED; #612 MOTION to Intervene - GRANTED; #602 MOTION for Clarification - Agencies to provide a privilege log to plaintiffs by 6/5/20. (Tape #FTR)(wgar, )
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 646 ORDER re (602) Motion for Clarification of the Court's June 5, 2020 ; directing that the Agencies shall provide a compliant privilege log to plaintiffs for the documents provided to them by Capital One after the June 5, 2020 hearing according to the schedule discussed at the hearing today. (See Order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 6/26/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01010-CMH-TCB, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA(aott, )
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 645 ORDER granting (612) Motion to Intervene by Consumer Financial Protection Bureau. (See Order for Details). Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 6/26/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01010-CMH-TCB, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA(aott, )
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 644 ORDER granting (580) FDIC's Motion for Reconsideration.(See Order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 6/26/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01010-CMH-TCB, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA(aott, )
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 643 ORDER directing that the remaining responses to Capital One's Fact Sheets are due no later than July 10, 2020; denying as moot (599) Motion to Compel Production of Fact Sheets and that hearing on this motion is removed from the docket for June 26,2020. (see order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 6/26/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01010-CMH-TCB, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA(aott, )
June 25, 2020 Filing 642 Withdrawal of Motion by Defendant re #599 MOTION to Compel Production of Fact Sheets (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Angle, Robert)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 641 MEMORANDUM OPINION - ORDERED that Capital One's Rule 72 Objections to Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Mandiant Report #556 be, and the same hereby are, OVERRULED and the Magistrate Judge's Memorandum Opinion and Order #490 , dated May 26, 2020, be, and the same hereby is, AFFIRMED; and it is further ORDERED that Capital One provide forthwith a copy of the Mandiant Report to Plaintiffs pursuant to the terms of the Protective Order entered in this action. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga on 6/25/2020. (dzir)
June 25, 2020 Filing 640 NOTICE by Plaintiff of Voluntary Dismissal by Kevin Monti and Brandy Racicot (1:19-cv-02963). (Webster, Steven)
June 25, 2020 Filing 639 REPLY to Response to Motion re #602 MOTION for Clarification of the Court's June 5, 2020 Order filed by Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System, Office of the Comptroller of the Currency. (Levenson, Rebecca)
June 25, 2020 Filing 638 REPLY to Response to Motion re #580 MOTION for Reconsideration re #536 MDL Order MOTION for Reconsideration (Rule 72) re #536 MDL Order filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Unpublished decision in SBAV LLP v Porter Bancorp)(Nicely, Andrew)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 637 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 6/25/2020. Motions Hearing set for 6/26/2020 at 11:00 AM Remotely via ZoomGov before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (aott)
June 25, 2020 Filing 636 REPLY to Response to Motion re #612 MOTION to Intervene filed by Consumer Financial Protection Bureau. (Levenson, Rebecca)
June 24, 2020 Filing 635 Memorandum in Opposition re #599 MOTION to Compel Production of Fact Sheets . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Co-Lead Counsel Karen Hanson Riebel, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Co-Lead Counsel Karen Hanson Riebel, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration of Co-Lead Counsel Karen Hanson Riebel)(Webster, Steven)
June 24, 2020 Filing 634 Memorandum in Opposition re #612 MOTION to Intervene . (Webster, Steven)
June 24, 2020 Filing 633 Memorandum in Opposition re #602 MOTION for Clarification of the Court's June 5, 2020 Order . (Webster, Steven)
June 24, 2020 Filing 632 Memorandum in Opposition re #580 MOTION for Reconsideration re #536 MDL Order MOTION for Reconsideration (Rule 72) re #536 MDL Order (Response). (Webster, Steven)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 631 So Ordered re #625 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Dustin Curtis. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 6/24/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA(aott)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 630 So Ordered re #621 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Penelope Tadler. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 6/24/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA(aott, )
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 629 So Ordered re #620 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Patricia Murphy. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 6/24/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA(aott)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 628 So Ordered re #617 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Michelle Desoer. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 6/24/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA(aott)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 627 So Ordered re #616 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to James Arnold, Vaseleke Inembolidis, Allen Moure, and Nicholas Tsirigos. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 6/24/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA(aott, )
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 626 So Ordered re #615 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Julia Gordon, John Gordon, Joshua Zipperman, and Joalla Rivera. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 6/24/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA(aott, )
June 24, 2020 Filing 625 NOTICE by Plaintiff of Voluntary Dismissal by Dustin Curtis (1:19-cv-02939). (Webster, Steven)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 624 ORDER granting #623 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice as to Karen S. Bloom. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 6/24/2020. (aott)
June 24, 2020 Filing 623 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Karen S. Bloom and Certification of Local Counsel Joseph A. Frisone by Consumer Financial Protection Bureau. (Frisone, Joseph)
June 24, 2020 Filing 622 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Anthony Frisone on behalf of Consumer Financial Protection Bureau (Frisone, Joseph)
June 23, 2020 Filing 621 NOTICE by Plaintiff of Voluntary Dismissal by Penelope Tadler (1:19-cv-02931). (Webster, Steven)
June 23, 2020 Filing 620 NOTICE by Plaintiff of Voluntary Dismissal by Patricia Murphy (1:19-cv-02970). (Webster, Steven)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 619 ORDER Setting Hearing on #612 Motion to Intervene . Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 6/23/2020. Motion Hearing set for 6/26/2020 at 11:00 AM Remotely via Zoom before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson.. (aott)
June 23, 2020 Filing 618 Response to #581 MDL Order,,,,,, filed by Defendant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Answer to the Court's Questions, #2 Exhibit 2 - May 6, 2020 Letter)(Balser, David)
June 23, 2020 Filing 617 NOTICE by Plaintiff of Voluntary Dismissal by Michelle Desoer (1:19-cv-02935). (Webster, Steven)
June 23, 2020 Filing 616 NOTICE by Plaintiff of Voluntary Dismissal by James Arnold, Vaseleke Inembolidis, Allen Moure, and Nicholas Tsirigos (1:19-cv-02933). (Webster, Steven)
June 23, 2020 Filing 615 NOTICE by Plaintiff of Voluntary Dismissal by Julia Gordon, John Gordon, Joshua Zipperman, and Joalla Rivera (1:19-cv-02950). (Webster, Steven)
June 23, 2020 Filing 614 Notice of Hearing Date set for June 26, 2020 re #612 MOTION to Intervene (Levenson, Rebecca)
June 23, 2020 Filing 613 Memorandum in Support re #612 MOTION to Intervene filed by Consumer Financial Protection Bureau. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Levenson, Rebecca)
June 23, 2020 Filing 612 MOTION to Intervene by Consumer Financial Protection Bureau. (Levenson, Rebecca)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 611 So Ordered re #608 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiff's (see order for listed plaintiff's). Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 6/23/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA(aott) Modified on 7/10/2020 (aott, ).
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 610 So Ordered re #606 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Kimberly Barnes, Devon Reid, Amanda Comonte, Michael Lewis, Crystal Biggs, Bret Glidewell, Joseph Cook, and David Curto. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 6/23/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA(aott, )
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 609 So Ordered re #605 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal by Ursula Riley. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 6/23/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA(aott)
June 22, 2020 Filing 608 NOTICE by Plaintiff of Voluntary Dismissal (1:19-cv-02963). (Webster, Steven)
June 22, 2020 Filing 607 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 5/27/20 (Motions to Dismiss), before Judge Anthony J. Trenga, Court Reporter/Transcriber Rhonda Montgomery, Telephone number 703-299-4599. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 7/22/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/24/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/21/2020.(montgomery, rhonda)
June 22, 2020 Filing 606 NOTICE by Plaintiff of Voluntary Dismissal by Kimberly Barnes, Devon Reid, Amanda Comonte, Michael Lewis, Crystal Biggs, Bret Glidewell, Joseph Cook, and David Curto (1:19-cv-02955). (Webster, Steven)
June 22, 2020 Filing 605 NOTICE by Plaintiff of Voluntary Dismissal by Ursula Riley (1:19-cv-02939). (Webster, Steven)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 604 Order re #599 Motion to Compel Production of Fact Sheets; directing that a ZoomGov Video Conference will be held on June 26, 2020 at 11:00 am. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 6/22/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01010-CMH-TCB, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA(aott, )
June 22, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #599 MOTION to Compel Production of Fact Sheets. Motion Hearing set for 6/26/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 501 before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (klau, )
June 22, 2020 Reset Deadlines as to #599 MOTION to Compel Production of Fact Sheets. Motion Hearing set for 6/26/2020 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Remote - ZoomGov Video Conferencing before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (klau, )
June 22, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Anderson. #599 MOTION to Compel Production of Fact Sheets (klau, )
June 19, 2020 Filing 603 NOTICE by Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System, Office of the Comptroller of the Currency of Waiver of Oral Argument (Levenson, Rebecca)
June 19, 2020 Filing 602 MOTION for Clarification of the Court's June 5, 2020 Order by Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System, Office of the Comptroller of the Currency. (Levenson, Rebecca)
June 19, 2020 Filing 601 Notice of Hearing Date re #599 MOTION to Compel Production of Fact Sheets (Angle, Robert)
June 19, 2020 Filing 600 Memorandum in Support re #599 MOTION to Compel Production of Fact Sheets filed by In Re: Capital One Customer Data Security Breach Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Angle, Robert)
June 19, 2020 Filing 599 MOTION to Compel Production of Fact Sheets by In Re: Capital One Customer Data Security Breach Litigation. (Angle, Robert)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 598 So Ordered re #594 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice as to Kevin Zosiak. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 6/19/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA(aott)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 597 So Ordered re #593 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice as to Lara Greenstein. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 6/19/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA(aott)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 596 So Ordered re #592 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice as to Zakaria Haque. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 6/19/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA(aott)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 595 So Ordered re #591 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice as to Paul Berger, David Bienfait, Mark Bodner, Tim Davidson, Adam Greenstein, Vicki Johns, and David Rosenthal. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 6/19/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA(aott)
June 18, 2020 Filing 594 NOTICE by Plaintiff of Voluntary Dismissal by Kevin Zosiak (1:19-cv-02916). (Webster, Steven)
June 18, 2020 Filing 593 NOTICE by Plaintiff of Voluntary Dismissal by Lara Greenstein (1:19-cv-02919). (Webster, Steven)
June 18, 2020 Filing 592 NOTICE by Plaintiff of Voluntary Dismissal by Zakaria Haque (1:19-cv-02969). (Webster, Steven)
June 18, 2020 Filing 591 NOTICE by Plaintiff of Voluntary Dismissal by Paul Berger, David Bienfait, Mark Bodner, Tim Davidson, Adam Greenstein, Vicki Johns, and David Rosenthal (1:19-cv-02918). (Webster, Steven)
June 18, 2020 Filing 590 NOTICE by Plaintiff of Status Report Regarding Plaintiffs' Fact Sheets. (Webster, Steven)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 589 So Ordered re #583 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice as to Juan Hernandez. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 6/18/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA(aott)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 588 So Ordered re #582 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice as to Brendy Wolfram. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 6/18/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA(aott)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 587 So Ordered re #584 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice as to Kassandra McKown. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 6/18/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA(aott) Modified on 6/18/2020 (aott, ).
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 586 ORDER granting in part and denying in part (552) Motion to Seal; directing that at this time, the court finds that the information contained in the Fisk deposition, the Project Star Post-Incident Report, and the redactions made to pages 8 and 16 of the memorandum shall remain under seal. (See Order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 6/18/2020. (aott)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 585 Order re Sealed Exhibits D-G directing that the information contained on page 18 of exhibit D, pages 2, 3, 5 and 7 of exhibit E, and pages 1, 3, and 4 of exhibit F to the memorandum in support of plaintiffs' motion to compel discovery from the Amazon defendants shall remain under seal at this time. It is furtherORDERED that the information contained in the redaction on page 10 based on exhibit E to the memorandum in support of plaintiffs' motion to compel discovery from the Amazon defendants shall also remain under seal at this time. (See Order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 6/18/2020. (aott)
June 17, 2020 Filing 584 NOTICE by Plaintiff of Voluntary Dismissal by Kassandra McKown (1:19-cv-02934). (Webster, Steven)
June 17, 2020 Filing 583 NOTICE by Plaintiff of Voluntary Dismissal by Juan Hernandez (1:19-cv-02934). (Webster, Steven)
June 17, 2020 Filing 582 NOTICE by Plaintiff of Voluntary Dismissal by Brendy Wolfram (1:19-cv-02934). (Webster, Steven)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 581 Order scheduling hearing on #580 Motion for Reconsideration for Friday June 26, 2020 at 11:00 am via ZoomGov Video Conferencing Serice. (See Order for Details). Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 6/17/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01010-CMH-TCB, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA(aott)
June 17, 2020 Set Heaing as to #580 MOTION for Reconsideration re #536 MDL Order Motion Hearing set for 6/26/2020 at 11:00 AM via ZoomGov Video Conferencing before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (aott)
June 16, 2020 Filing 580 MOTION for Reconsideration re #536 MDL Order , MOTION for Reconsideration (Rule 72) re #536 MDL Order by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Robert Connors)(Nicely, Andrew)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 579 So ORDERED re #578 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Kenneth Anthony. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 6/16/2020. (rban, )
June 16, 2020 Filing 578 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Kenneth Anthony by Plaintiff (Gayle, John)
June 16, 2020 Filing 577 REPLY to Response to Motion re #556 MOTION for Reconsideration (Rule 72) filed by Defendant. (Balser, David)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 576 So Ordered re #575 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice as to Deborah Dames. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 6/16/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01010-CMH-TCB, 1:19-cv-2956 AJT-JFA (aott) Modified on 6/16/2020 (aott, ).
June 15, 2020 Filing 575 NOTICE by Plaintiff of Voluntary Dismissal by Deborah Dames (Civil Action No. 1:19-cv-01010). (Proctor, Haley)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 574 So Ordered re #571 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice as to James Scott Jewell. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 6/15/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA(aott)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 573 So Ordered re #570 Notice by Plaintiff of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice as to Marsha Heath and Sherry Blackburn. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 6/15/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA(aott)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 572 So Ordered re #569 Notice by Plaintiff of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice as to Joanne Elena, Patrick Inscho, and Lenora Glover. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 6/15/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA(aott, )
June 12, 2020 Filing 571 NOTICE by Plaintiff of Voluntary Dismissal by James Scott Jewell (Civil Action No. 1:19-cv-02960). (Webster, Steven)
June 12, 2020 Filing 570 NOTICE by Plaintiff of Voluntary Dismissal by Marsha Heath and Sherry Blackburn (Civil Action No. 1:19-cv-02949). (Webster, Steven)
June 12, 2020 Filing 569 NOTICE by Plaintiff of Voluntary Dismissal by Joanne Elena, Patrick Inscho, and Lenora Glover (Civil Action No. 1:19-cv-02954). (Webster, Steven)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 568 So ORDERED re #565 NOTICE by Plaintiff of Voluntary Dismissal by Thomas Leffler. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 6/12/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA(rban, )
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 567 So ORDERED re #564 NOTICE by Plaintiff of Voluntary Dismissal by Victor Mallh and Jonathan Quintevis. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 6/12/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA(rban, )
June 12, 2020 Filing 566 Memorandum in Opposition re #556 MOTION for Reconsideration (Rule 72) . (Webster, Steven)
June 12, 2020 Filing 565 NOTICE by Plaintiff of Voluntary Dismissal by Thomas Leffler (Civil Action No. 1:19-cv-01042). (Webster, Steven)
June 12, 2020 Filing 564 NOTICE by Plaintiff of Voluntary Dismissal by Victor Mallh and Jonathan Quintevis (Civil Action No. 1:19-cv-02932). (Webster, Steven)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 563 So Ordered re #562 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal with prejudice as to Plaintiffs Damien Ross, Tashayia Busby, CB Homes, Inc., and Jesi-An E. Rodriguez. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 6/11/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA(aott) Modified on 6/11/2020 (aott, ).
June 10, 2020 Filing 562 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Plaintiffs Damien Ross, Tashayia Busby, CB Homes, Inc., and Jesi-An E. Rodriguez by Plaintiff (Toll, Steven)
June 10, 2020 Filing 561 Memorandum in Support re #458 NOTICE, #495 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (CAPITAL ONE AND AMAZON DEFENDANTS' SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM PURSUANT TO ORDER (DK 495). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Redacted Ex. D, #2 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Redacted Ex. E, #3 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Redacted Ex. F, #4 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Redacted Memorandum ISO Motion to Compel, #5 Proposed Order)(Vieth, Robert)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 560 So Ordered re #559 Corrected Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice as to Fred Milman and Judy Milman. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 6/10/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA(aott)
June 10, 2020 Filing 559 NOTICE by Plaintiff Corrected Notice of Voluntary Dismissal by Fred Milman and Judy Milman (Corrected Case No. 1:19-cv-02961). (Webster, Steven)
June 9, 2020 Filing 558 Sealed Memorandum in Support. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Caputo Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1 - Fisk Dep. Tr. Excerpts, #3 Exhibit 2 - Incident Report)(Balser, David)
June 9, 2020 Filing 557 Memorandum in Support re #556 MOTION for Reconsideration (Rule 72) filed by Defendant. (Attachments: #1 Palombo Declaration, #2 Caputo Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1 - Fisk Dep. Tr. Excerpts, #4 Exhibit 2 - Post Incident Report, #5 Exhibit 3 - In re Arby's, #6 Exhibit 4 - Genesco v. Visa, #7 Exhibit 5 - Law 360 Article)(Balser, David)
June 9, 2020 Filing 556 MOTION for Reconsideration (Rule 72) by Defendant. (Balser, David)
June 9, 2020 Filing 555 NOTICE by Defendant of Waiver of Oral Argument (Balser, David)
June 9, 2020 Filing 554 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Defendant re #552 MOTION to Seal Certain Exhibits and Information (Balser, David)
June 9, 2020 Filing 553 Memorandum in Support re #552 MOTION to Seal Certain Exhibits and Information filed by Defendant. (Balser, David)
June 9, 2020 Filing 552 MOTION to Seal Certain Exhibits and Information by Defendant. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Balser, David)
June 9, 2020 Filing 551 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson: Remote Status Conference held on 6/9/2020. Counsel for Plaintiff and Defendant appeared via Zoom and AT&T Public Access Line. The parties update the Court on the status of the case. Status Conference set for July 14, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. Court recessed. (Court Reporter A. Thomson)(dzir)
June 9, 2020 Filing 550 NOTICE by Plaintiff of Voluntary Dismissal by Fred Milman and Judy Milman (Civil Action No. 1:19-cv-2357). (Webster, Steven)
June 9, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 7/14/2020 at 02:00 PM in Alexandria Remote before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (dzir)
June 8, 2020 Filing 549 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 6/5/2020, before Judge John F. Anderson, Court Reporter Anneliese Thomson, Telephone number 703-299-8595. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 7/8/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/10/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/8/2020.(thomson, anneliese)
June 8, 2020 Filing 548 NOTICE by Plaintiff (Plaintiffs' Status Report for June 9, 2020 Status Conference). (Webster, Steven)
June 8, 2020 Filing 547 NOTICE by Plaintiff of Filing of Joint Proposed Agenda for Status Conference. (Webster, Steven)
June 8, 2020 Filing 546 So Ordered re #545 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice as to Seth Zielicke. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA(aott)
June 5, 2020 Filing 545 NOTICE by Plaintiff of Voluntary Dismissal by Seth Zielicke (Civil Action No. 1:19-cv-02929). (Webster, Steven)
June 5, 2020 Filing 544 NOTICE by Plaintiff re #543 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Voluntary Dismissal Filed in Error as to Gary Zielicke. (Webster, Steven)
June 5, 2020 Filing 543 (Withdrawn see #544 )NOTICE by Plaintiff of Voluntary Dismissal by Gary Zielicke (Civil Action No. 1:19-cv-02929). (Webster, Steven) Modified on 6/8/2020 (aott, ).
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 542 ORDER granting #538 Motion for Pro hac vice as to Michael Davitt Murphy. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 6/5/2020. (aott)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 541 ORDER granting #537 Motion for Pro hac vice as to Alexander Francesco Beale. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 6/5/2020. (aott)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 540 ORDER re #485 Motion to Compel Production of Documents Withheld on the Basis of the Bank Examination Privilege. (See Order for Details). Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 6/5/2020. (aott)
June 5, 2020 Filing 539 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson:Motion Hearing held on 6/5/2020 via Zoomgov re #485 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Withheld on the Basis of the Bank Examination Privilege . Appearances of counsel. Motion argued. Order to follow. (Court Reporter: A. Thomson./FTR)(wgar, )
June 5, 2020 Filing 538 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael Davitt Murphy and Certification of Local Counsel Dale W. Pittman by Plaintiff. (Pittman, Dale)
June 5, 2020 Filing 537 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Alexander Francesco Beale and Certification of Local Counsel Dale W. Pittman by Plaintiff. (Pittman, Dale)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 536 Order directing that the #535 Notice filed by the FDIC requesting to intervene in the hearing on plaintiffs' motion to compel is denied. (See Order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 6/4/2020. (aott)
June 4, 2020 Filing 535 NOTICE by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation re #521 Order on Motion to Intervene, #511 Memorandum in Support, Requesting Leave to Join in the Motion filed by the Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System and the Office of the Comptroller of the Currency Seeking to Intervene in this Litigation for the Limited Purpose of Opposing Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel (Nicely, Andrew)
June 3, 2020 Filing 534 Memorandum in Support re #485 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Withheld on the Basis of the Bank Examination Privilege (Reply to Brief of Defendant Capital One). (Webster, Steven)
June 3, 2020 Filing 533 Memorandum in Support re #485 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Withheld on the Basis of the Bank Examination Privilege (Response to Brief of Intervenors Office of the Comptroller of Currency and the Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System). (Webster, Steven)
June 2, 2020 Filing 532 So Ordered re #530 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice as to Nathan Ouellette and Greg Stappas. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA(aott)
June 2, 2020 Filing 531 Notice Regarding the June 2020 Monthly Status Conference set for 6/9/2020 at 2:00 p.m. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 6/2/2020. (rban, )
June 2, 2020 Filing 530 NOTICE by Plaintiff of Voluntary Dismissal by Nathan Ouellette and Greg Stappas (Civil Action No. 1:19-cv-02927). (Webster, Steven)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 529 ORDER granting #528 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Lindsay Todd Perkins. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 6/2/2020. (aott)
June 2, 2020 Filing 528 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Lindsay Todd Perkins (Filed in Accordance with Pretrial Order No. 1). (Webster, Steven)
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 527 ORDER re #523 Motion to Stay Compliance with a Discovery Ruling and for a Protective Order Pending Outcome of Rule 72 Objection re #490 Memorandum Opinion and Order; further directing that an expedited timetable for plaintiff's response to the objection will be discussed at the status conference on June 9, 2020 so this matter can be resolved promptly. (see order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 6/2/2020. (aott)
June 2, 2020 Filing 526 So Ordered re #522 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice as to Amanda Stevens and Casey Thaxton. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA(aott)
June 2, 2020 Filing 525 NOTICE by Defendant re #524 Notice of Hearing Date - Withdrawal of Notice of Hearing and Waiver of Hearing on Motion to Stay [Dkt. 523]. (Balser, David)
June 1, 2020 Filing 524 Notice of Hearing Date set for June 5, 2020 re #523 MOTION Stay Compliance with a Discovery Ruling and for a Protective Order Pending Outcome of Rule 72 Objection re #490 Memorandum Opinion, Order . (Balser, David)
June 1, 2020 Filing 523 MOTION Stay Compliance with a Discovery Ruling and for a Protective Order Pending Outcome of Rule 72 Objection re #490 Memorandum Opinion, Order . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Brickstreet Mut. Ins. v. Chartis Cas. Order, #2 Proposed Order)(Balser, David)
June 1, 2020 Filing 522 NOTICE by Plaintiff of Voluntary Dismissal by Amanda Stevens and Casey Thaxton (1:19-cv-02960). (Webster, Steven)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 521 ORDER granting #510 Consent Motion to Intervene for the limited purpose of responding to plaintiffs' Motion to Compel (Dkt. No. 485) ; directing that as the court previously ordered, the hearing on plaintiffs' motion will be held through ZoomGov video conferencing service on Friday, June 5, 2020 beginning at 10:00 a.m. (Docket no. 512). (See Order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 6/1/2020. (aott)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 520 So Ordered re #508 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice filed by Plaintiff Jason Yoder. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 6/1/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA(aott)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 519 So Ordered re #503 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice filed by Plaintiffs' Tester and Masi. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 6/1/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA(aott)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 518 So Ordered re #502 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice filed by Plaintiff Emanuyel Aminov. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 6/1/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA(aott)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 517 So Ordered re #501 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice filed by Plaintiffs' Yoon and Labajo. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 6/1/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA(aott)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 516 So Ordered re #500 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice filed by Plaintiff Steven Perdew. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 6/1/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA(aott)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 515 So Ordered re #499 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice filed by Plaintiff Biaohealth, LLC. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 6/1/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA(aott)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 514 So Ordered re #498 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without Prejudice filed by Plaintiff Randy Zimprich. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 6/1/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA(aott)
May 29, 2020 Filing 513 Memorandum in Opposition re #485 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Withheld on the Basis of the Bank Examination Privilege . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Williams Supplemental Declaration, #2 Exhibit B - Solomon Declaration)(Balser, David)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 512 Order with regards to a hearing to be held via ZOOM on 6/5/2020 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson 5/29/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA(rban, )
May 29, 2020 Filing 511 Memorandum in Support re #510 Consent MOTION to Intervene for the limited purpose of responding to plaintiffs' Motion to Compel (Dkt. No. 485) and in Opposition to plaintiffs' Motion to Compel (Dkt. No. 485) filed by Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System, Office of the Comptroller of the Currency. (Levenson, Rebecca)
May 29, 2020 Filing 510 Consent MOTION to Intervene for the limited purpose of responding to plaintiffs' Motion to Compel (Dkt. No. 485) by Board of Governors of the Federal Reserve System, Office of the Comptroller of the Currency. (Levenson, Rebecca)
May 29, 2020 Filing 509 NOTICE by Plaintiff re #493 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, of Filing of Revised Documents per the Court's Order. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Reply in Support of their Motion to Compel Production of the Mandiant Report and Related Materials (REVISED), #2 Exhibit 15 (REVISED), #3 Exhibit 18 (REVISED), #4 Exhibit 19 (REVISED))(Webster, Steven)
May 29, 2020 Filing 508 NOTICE by Plaintiff of Voluntary Dismissal by Jason Yoder (Civil Action No. 1:19-cv-01042). (Webster, Steven)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 507 ORDER granting #476 Motion to Seal; directing that the information redacted on pages 1 and 2 of Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Discovery from Amazon Defendants Dkt. No. #480 shall remain under seal at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 5/29/2020. (aott)
May 29, 2020 Filing 506 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 5/12/20 (Status Conference), before Judge Anthony J. Trenga and Judge John F. Anderson, Court Reporter/Transcriber Rhonda Montgomery, Telephone number 703-299-4599. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter/transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 6/29/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/29/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/27/2020.(montgomery, rhonda)
May 28, 2020 Filing 505 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 5/22/2020, before Judge John F. Anderson, Transcriber Anneliese Thomson, Telephone number 703-299-8595. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 6/29/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/28/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/26/2020.(thomson, anneliese)
May 28, 2020 Filing 504 RESPONSE in Support re #476 MOTION to Seal filed by Defendant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Capital One's Response in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to File Under Seal Dkt. 476)(Angle, Robert)
May 28, 2020 Filing 503 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal (Tester/Masi, 1:19-cv-2952) by Plaintiff (Breit, Jeffrey)
May 28, 2020 Filing 502 NOTICE by Plaintiff of Voluntary Dismissal (Aminov, 1:19-cv-01006). (Webster, Steven)
May 28, 2020 Filing 501 NOTICE by Plaintiff of Voluntary Dismissal (Yoon/Labajo, 1:19-cv-02928). (Webster, Steven)
May 28, 2020 Filing 500 NOTICE by Plaintiff of Voluntary Dismissal (Perdew, 1:19-cv-02925). (Webster, Steven)
May 28, 2020 Filing 499 NOTICE by Plaintiff of Voluntary Dismissal (Biaohealth 1:19-cv-02957). (Webster, Steven)
May 28, 2020 Filing 498 NOTICE by Plaintiff of Voluntary Dismissal (Randy Zimprich v. Capital One Financial Corporation, Case No. 8:19- CV-01689 (C.D. Cal.)). (Webster, Steven)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 497 ORDER granting #468 Motion to File Under Seal Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel and Ex. A to T. Newby Supporting Declaration by Defendants Amazon; directing that Exhibit A to the Declaration of Tyler G. Newby (dkt. No. 472-1 (re-filed as Dkt. No. 482], as well as the information redacted in Amazon's Memorandum [dkt. No. 472]on pages 5, 6, and 7 shall remain under seal at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 5/28/2020. (aott)
May 27, 2020 Filing 496 RESPONSE in Support re #468 MOTION to File Under Seal Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel and Ex. A to T. Newby Supporting Declaration by Defendants Amazon filed by Defendant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Capital One's Response in Support of Amazon's Motion to File Under Seal)(Angle, Robert)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 495 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #457 Motion Leave to File Confidential Materials Under Seal. (See Order for Details). Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 5/27/2020. (aott)
May 27, 2020 Filing 494 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga: Remote Dismissal Hearing held on 5/27/2020 re #393 MOTION to Dismiss The Broderick Complaint, #392 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant, #389 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant, #386 MOTION to Dismiss the Representative Consumer Class Action Complaint re #354 Amended Complaint. Counsel for Plaintiff and Defendant appeared via Zoom. Motions argued and taken under advisement. Order to follow. (Court Reporter R. Montgomery)(dzir)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 493 ORDER directing that the plaintiffs file a revised version of their reply in support of the motion to compel production of Mandiant Report that includes only the redaction on page 8 and that includes a copy of exhibits 15, 18, and 19 in the public record. (See Order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 5/27/2020. (aott) Modified on 5/27/2020 (wgar, ).
May 26, 2020 Filing 492 NOTICE Setting Hearing on Motion #386 , #389 , #392 and #393 Motions to Dismiss. (see notice for details). Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 5/26/2020. Motion(s) Hearing set for 5/27/2020 at 10:00 AM to be held Remotely before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (aott)
May 26, 2020 Filing 491 TRANSCRIPT excerpt of proceedings held on 5/22/2020, before Judge John F. Anderson, Transcriber Anneliese Thomson, Telephone number 703-299-8595. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 6/25/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/27/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/24/2020.(thomson, anneliese)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 490 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting in part #412 Motion to Compel Production of Mandiant Report and Related Materials. (See Order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 5/26/2020. (aott)
May 22, 2020 Filing 489 RESPONSE in Support re #457 MOTION Leave to File Confidential Materials Under Seal [Joint Response in Support] filed by Defendant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Order granting Joint Defendants Response in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to File Under Seal (Dkt. 457))(Angle, Robert)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 488 ORDER directing that the court adopts the briefing schedule suggested in the notice of hearing on #485 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel. The hearing on the motion is scheduled for Friday, June 5, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 5/22/2020. Motion Hearing set for 6/5/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 501 before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (aott)
May 22, 2020 Filing 487 Notice of Hearing Date for June 5, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. re #485 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Withheld on the Basis of the Bank Examination Privilege . (Webster, Steven)
May 22, 2020 Filing 486 Memorandum in Support re #485 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Withheld on the Basis of the Bank Examination Privilege . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Letter from David Balser), #2 Exhibit 2 (Declaration of Jillian Dent))(Webster, Steven)
May 22, 2020 Filing 485 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Withheld on the Basis of the Bank Examination Privilege . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Webster, Steven)
May 22, 2020 Filing 484 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson:Motion Hearing held on 5/22/2020 via Zoomgov re #454 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Amazon Defendants. Appearances of counsel via Zoomgov. Motion argued and #454 MOTION to Compel - GRANTED IN PART/DENIED IN PART. (Tape #FTR.)(wgar, )
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 483 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #454 Motion to Compel Discovery from Amazon Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 5/22/2020. (aott)
May 22, 2020 Notice of Correction re #479 Notice of Hearing Date (Incorrect Event Used) (clar, )
May 21, 2020 Filing 482 NOTICE by Defendant re #472 Memorandum in Opposition, T. NEWBY DECLARATION W/ EXS. A AND B IN SUPPORT OF AMAZON'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTON TO COMPEL. (Vieth, Robert)
May 21, 2020 Filing 481 Sealed Response/Reply/Opposition re #454 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Amazon Defendants. (Webster, Steven)
May 21, 2020 Filing 480 Memorandum in Support re #454 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Amazon Defendants (Redacted Reply Brief). (Webster, Steven)
May 21, 2020 Filing 479 Notice (Waiver of Hearing) re #476 MOTION to Seal . (Webster, Steven) Modified text on 5/22/2020 (clar, ).
May 21, 2020 Filing 478 NOTICE by Plaintiff re #476 MOTION to Seal . (Webster, Steven)
May 21, 2020 Filing 477 Memorandum in Support re #476 MOTION to Seal . (Webster, Steven)
May 21, 2020 Filing 476 MOTION to Seal . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Webster, Steven)
May 21, 2020 Filing 475 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 5/15/2020, before Judge John F Anderson, Transcriber Anneliese Thomson, Telephone number 703-299-8595. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 6/22/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 7/21/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/19/2020.(thomson, anneliese)
May 21, 2020 Filing 474 NOTICE by Defendant re #472 Memorandum in Opposition (CORRECTED EX. C TO T. NEWBY DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF AMAZON'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL [DKT. 472-1]). (Vieth, Robert)
May 20, 2020 Filing 473 Sealed Response/Reply/Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel [Dkt. 454]. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to T. Newby Declaration in Support of Opposition [Dkt 472])(Vieth, Robert)
May 20, 2020 Filing 472 Memorandum in Opposition re #454 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Amazon Defendants . (Attachments: #1Refiled at #474 , #482 Affidavit /Declaration of T. Newby and Ex. B and C, #2 Affidavit /Declaration of B. Buckley)(Vieth, Robert) Modified on 5/21/2020 (aott, ).
May 20, 2020 Filing 471 NOTICE by Defendant re #468 MOTION to File Under Seal Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel and Ex. A to T. Newby Supporting Declaration by Defendants Amazon WAIVER OF HEARING. (Vieth, Robert)
May 20, 2020 Filing 470 NOTICE by Defendant re #468 MOTION to File Under Seal Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel and Ex. A to T. Newby Supporting Declaration by Defendants Amazon . (Vieth, Robert)
May 20, 2020 Filing 469 Memorandum in Support re #468 MOTION to File Under Seal Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel and Ex. A to T. Newby Supporting Declaration by Defendants Amazon . (Attachments: #1 Affidavit /Declaration in Support of Motion to Seal)(Vieth, Robert)
May 20, 2020 Filing 468 MOTION to File Under Seal Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel and Ex. A to T. Newby Supporting Declaration by Defendants Amazon. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vieth, Robert)
May 19, 2020 Filing 467 RESPONSE in Support re #441 MOTION to File Under Seal filed by Defendant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Capital One's Response in Support of Motion to Seal (Dkt. No. 441))(Angle, Robert)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 466 Order setting hearing re #454 Motion to Compel Discovery from Amazon Defendants; directing that hearing will be held through ZoomGov video conferencing service. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 5/18/2020. Motion Hearing set for 5/22/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 501 before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson.(aott) (dzir, ).
May 15, 2020 Filing 465 RESPONSE in Support re #393 MOTION to Dismiss The Broderick Complaint (Amazon's Reply and Joinder In Support of Motion to Dismiss the Broderick Class Action Complaint) filed by Defendant. (Vieth, Robert)
May 15, 2020 Filing 464 RESPONSE in Support re #386 MOTION to Dismiss the Representative Consumer Class Action Complaint re #354 Amended Complaint. (Amazon's) filed by Defendant. (Vieth, Robert)
May 15, 2020 Filing 463 REPLY to Response to Motion re #386 MOTION to Dismiss the Representative Consumer Class Action Complaint re #354 Amended Complaint. filed by Defendant. (Balser, David)
May 15, 2020 Filing 462 REPLY to Response to Motion re #393 MOTION to Dismiss The Broderick Complaint filed by Defendant. (Balser, David)
May 15, 2020 Filing 461 Sealed Memorandum in Support re #454 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Amazon Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D (Under Seal), #2 Exhibit E (Under Seal), #3 Exhibit F (Under Seal), #4 Exhibit G (Under Seal))(Webster, Steven)
May 15, 2020 Filing 460 Memorandum in Support re #457 MOTION Leave to File Confidential Materials Under Seal . (Webster, Steven)
May 15, 2020 Filing 459 NOTICE by Plaintiff re #457 MOTION Leave to File Confidential Materials Under Seal (Waiver of Hearing). (Webster, Steven)
May 15, 2020 Filing 458 NOTICE by Plaintiff re #457 MOTION Leave to File Confidential Materials Under Seal . (Webster, Steven)
May 15, 2020 Filing 457 MOTION Leave to File Confidential Materials Under Seal . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Webster, Steven)
May 15, 2020 Filing 456 Notice of Hearing Date set for May 22, 2010 re #454 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Amazon Defendants. (Webster, Steven)
May 15, 2020 Filing 455 Memorandum in Support re #454 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Amazon Defendants . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D (Filed Under Seal), #5 Exhibit E (Filed Under Seal), #6 Exhibit F (Filed Under Seal), #7 Exhibit G (Filed Under Seal), #8 Exhibit H)(Webster, Steven)
May 15, 2020 Filing 454 MOTION to Compel Discovery from Amazon Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Webster, Steven)
May 15, 2020 Filing 453 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson:Motion Hearing held on 5/15/2020 via Zoomgov re #412 MOTION to Compel Production of Mandiant Report and Related Materials filed by Plaintiff. Appearances of counsel via Zoomgov. #412 MOTION to Compel argued and taken under advisement. Order to follow. (Tape #FTR.)(wgar, )
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 452 ORDER directing that the hearing on #412 Motion to Compel Production of Mandiant Report and Related Materials will be held through ZoomGov video conferencing service on Friday, May 15, 2020 beginning at 10:45 a.m. (See Order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 5/14/2020. (aott)
May 14, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #412 MOTION to Compel Production of Mandiant Report and Related Materials. Motion Hearing set for 5/15/2020 at 10:45 AM in Alexandria Remote before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (dzir)
May 14, 2020 Reset Deadlines as to #412 MOTION to Compel Production of Mandiant Report and Related Materials. Motion Hearing reset for 5/15/2020 at 10:45 AM in Alexandria Remote before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (wgar, )
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 451 Stipulated Order Governing The Taking of Remote Depositions. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 5/13/2020. (aott)
May 13, 2020 Filing 450 STIPULATION Governing The Taking of Remote Depositions (Proposed) by Defendant. (Balser, David)
May 12, 2020 Filing 449 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson: Status Conference held on 5/12/2020 via Zoom. Counsel for Plaintiff and Defendant appeared via Zoom and the AT&T Public Access Line. Counsel updates the Court on the status of the matter. The Court will issue an Order in response to the request for an extension of time to complete discovery. Monthly Status Conferences are to resume with the next Status Conference to be set for June 9, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. via Zoom. Instructions re: Zoom and AT&T procedures and Order to follow. (Court Reporter R. Montgomery)(dzir)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 448 PRETRIAL ORDER #24 re Modified Discovery Schedule. (See Order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 5/12/2020. (aott)
May 12, 2020 Filing 447 Sealed Response/Reply/Opposition re #412 MOTION to Compel Production of Mandiant Report and Related Materials. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 15, #2 Exhibit 18, #3 Exhibit 19)(Webster, Steven)
May 12, 2020 Filing 446 NOTICE by Plaintiff re #440 Status Report (Letter to Court Regarding Status Report). (Webster, Steven)
May 12, 2020 Filing 445 Memorandum in Support re #412 MOTION to Compel Production of Mandiant Report and Related Materials (Reply Memorandum). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 15 (To Be Filed Under Seal), #2 Exhibit 16 (Genesco Order), #3 Exhibit 17 (Arby's Order), #4 Exhibit 18 (To Be Filed Under Seal), #5 Exhibit 19 (To Be Filed Under Seal))(Webster, Steven)
May 12, 2020 Filing 444 NOTICE by Plaintiff re #441 MOTION to File Under Seal (Waiver of Hearing). (Webster, Steven)
May 12, 2020 Filing 443 NOTICE by Plaintiff re #441 MOTION to File Under Seal . (Webster, Steven)
May 12, 2020 Filing 442 Memorandum in Support re #441 MOTION to File Under Seal . (Webster, Steven)
May 12, 2020 Filing 441 MOTION to File Under Seal . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Webster, Steven)
May 12, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 6/9/2020 at 02:00 PM in Alexandria Remote (Zoom) before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (dzir)
May 11, 2020 Filing 440 STATUS REPORT by Defendant. (Balser, David)
May 8, 2020 Filing 439 NOTICE by Plaintiff of Joint Proposed Agenda for Status Conference. (Webster, Steven)
May 8, 2020 Filing 438 NOTICE by Plaintiff re #414 NOTICE,, of Filing of Exhibits 9, 10, and 11 to Plaintiffs' Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Mandiant Report. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 9, #2 Exhibit 10, #3 Exhibit 11)(Webster, Steven)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 437 ORDER granting #434 Motion to Withdraw as to Attorney Ivy T. Ngo. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 5/8/2020. (aott)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 436 SO ORDERED re #433 NOTICE by Plaintiff of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice as to Brad Ellish. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 5/7/2020. (aott)
May 6, 2020 Filing 435 Memorandum in Opposition re #412 MOTION to Compel Production of Mandiant Report and Related Materials . (Attachments: #1 Blevins Declaration, #2 Cantwell Declaration, #3 Watts Declaration, #4 Exhibit 1 - Mandiant Email, #5 Exhibit 2 - Dent Email, #6 Exhibit 3 - Plaintiff's First RFP, #7 Exhibit 4 - Plaintiff's First Interrogs., #8 Exhibit 5 - Plaintiff's 30(b)(6) Dep. Notice)(Balser, David)
May 6, 2020 Filing 434 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney Ivy T. Ngo by Plaintiff. (Pittman, Dale)
May 6, 2020 Filing 433 NOTICE by Plaintiff of Voluntary Dismissal by Brad Ellish. (Webster, Steven)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 432 ORDER granting in part #409 Motion to Seal; directing that the information redacted in Plaintiffs' Memorandum and exhibits 1, 2. 3, 4, 5, 6, 7, 8, 10, 12, and 13 to Plaintiffs' Memorandum shall remain under seal at this time; directing that Plaintiffs shall file an unredacted version of exhibits 9, 10 and 11 to Plaintiffs' Memorandum in the public record; directing that Capital One has agreed to unseal exhibits 9 and 11 (docket #423 at 12) and the court finds that the information at exhibit 10 does not meets the standards for filing under seal and should be unsealed and filed in the public record. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 5/6/2020. (aott)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 431 Notice re May 2020 Monthly Status Conference directing that the Court will conduct the monthly status conference, scheduled for Tuesday, May 12, 2020 at 2:00 p.m. Eastern Time, via video conference and teleconference; further directing that Plaintiffs Lead Counsel and Defendants Lead Counsel, jointly if possible, otherwise separately, shall submit to the Court, by no later than 5:00 p.m. on Friday, May 8, 2020, an agenda of items to be discussed. (See Order for Details). Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 5/6/2020. (aott)
May 6, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 5/12/2020 at 02:00 PM via Alexandria Remote before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson and District Judge Anthony J. Trenga. (dzir)
May 5, 2020 Filing 430 STATUS REPORT for May 12 Status Conference by Plaintiff. (Webster, Steven)
May 4, 2020 Filing 429 NOTICE by Defendant Capital One of letter requesting a telephonic status conference. (Balser, David)
May 1, 2020 Filing 428 Memorandum in Opposition re #393 MOTION to Dismiss The Broderick Complaint, #392 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Broderick Complaint filed by Plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Denying Capital One's Motion to Dismiss, #2 Proposed Order Denying Amazon's Motion to Dismiss)(Williamson, Andrew)
May 1, 2020 Filing 427 Memorandum in Opposition re #386 MOTION to Dismiss the Representative Consumer Class Action Complaint re #354 Amended Complaint. by Capital One Defendants filed by Plaintiff. (Webster, Steven)
May 1, 2020 Filing 426 Memorandum in Opposition re #389 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Amazon.com, Inc. and Amazon Web Services, Inc. filed by Plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (CLRA Demand Letter), #2 Exhibit B (Statutory Demand Letter), #3 Exhibit C (AWS Signed Return Receipt))(Webster, Steven)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 425 ORDER granting #424 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 5/1/2020. (rban, )
May 1, 2020 Filing 424 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Edward M. Grauman and Certification of Local Counsel Andrew M. Williamson by In Re: Capital One Customer Data Security Breach Litigation. (Williamson, Andrew)
May 1, 2020 Filing 423 Memorandum in Support re #409 MOTION to Seal (Plaintiffs' Motion to File Under Seal) filed by Defendant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Defendants' Proposed Order)(Angle, Robert)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 422 ORDER granting #420 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 5/1/2020. (rban, )
April 30, 2020 Filing 421 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Plaintiff re #409 MOTION to Seal (Webster, Steven)
April 30, 2020 Filing 420 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Mary Louise Russell. (Attachments: #1 Cover letter, #2 Envelope)(aott)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 419 PRETRIAL ORDER #23 granting in part #418 Motion for Extension of Briefing Schedule for Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel. (See Order for Details). Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 4/28/2020. (aott)
April 28, 2020 ***Motion Hearing on #412 terminated per order at ECF #419 *** (aott)
April 28, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #412 MOTION to Compel Production of Mandiant Report and Related Materials. Motion Hearing set for 5/15/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 501 before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (aott)
April 27, 2020 Filing 418 MOTION for Extension of Briefing Schedule for Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Mandiant Report and Related Materials by Defendant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Motion to Extend Briefing Schedule, #2 Proposed Order granting Motion to Extend Briefing Schedule)(Zinsner, Mary)
April 27, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #412 MOTION to Compel Production of Mandiant Report and Related Materials. Motion Hearing set for 5/1/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 501 before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (clar, )
April 27, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Anderson. #412 MOTION to Compel Production of Mandiant Report and Related Materials (clar, )
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 417 PRETRIAL ORDER #22 re Motion to compel and a notice of hearing forMay 1, 2020 (Docket nos. 412, 415); directing that opposition to this motion to compel shall be due by 5:00 p.m. on Friday, May 1, 2020 and any reply filed by 5:00 p.m. on Tuesday, May 5, 2020. If necessary, the court will contact the parties following a review of the pleadings to arrange for a hearingthrough remote means that would be held on Friday, May 8, 2020 (See Order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 4/24/2020. (aott)
April 24, 2020 Filing 416 Sealed Memorandum in Support re #412 MOTION to Compel Production of Mandiant Report and Related Materials. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (CAPITALONE_MDL_000258939), #2 Exhibit 2 (CAPITALONE_MDL_000097222), #3 Exhibit 3 (CAPITALONE_MDL_000185308), #4 Exhibit 4 (CAPITALONE_MDL_000115137), #5 Exhibit 5 (CAPITALONE_MDL_000100994), #6 Exhibit 6 (CAPITALONE_MDL_000247842), #7 Exhibit 7 (CAPITALONE_MDL_000248419), #8 Exhibit 8 (CAPITALONE_MDL_000251578), #9 Exhibit 9 (CAPITALONE_MDL_000097216), #10 Exhibit 10 (CAPITALONE_MDL_000232681), #11 Exhibit 11 (CAPITALONE_MDL_000172998), #12 Exhibit 12 (CAPITALONE_MDL_000086014), #13 Exhibit 13 (Capital One Defendants' Amended Responses to Plaintiffs' First Interrogatories))(Webster, Steven)
April 24, 2020 Filing 415 Notice of Hearing Date for May 1, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. re #412 MOTION to Compel Production of Mandiant Report and Related Materials (Webster, Steven)
April 24, 2020 Filing 414 NOTICE by Plaintiff re #413 Memorandum in Support (Exhibits to Memorandum in Support) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (UNDER SEAL), #2 Exhibit 2 (UNDER SEAL), #3 Exhibit 3 (UNDER SEAL), #4 Exhibit 4 (UNDER SEAL), #5 Exhibit 5 (UNDER SEAL), #6 Exhibit 6 (UNDER SEAL), #7 Exhibit 7 (UNDER SEAL), #8 Exhibit 8 (UNDER SEAL), #9 Exhibit 9 (UNDER SEAL), #10 Exhibit 10 (UNDER SEAL), #11 Exhibit 11 (UNDER SEAL), #12 Exhibit 12 (UNDER SEAL), #13 Exhibit 13 (UNDER SEAL), #14 Exhibit 14 (Email Correspondence))(Webster, Steven)
April 24, 2020 Filing 413 Memorandum in Support re #412 MOTION to Compel Production of Mandiant Report and Related Materials (REDACTED) filed by Plaintiff. (Webster, Steven)
April 24, 2020 Filing 412 MOTION to Compel Production of Mandiant Report and Related Materials by Plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Webster, Steven)
April 24, 2020 Filing 411 Waiver of re #409 MOTION to Seal (Waiver of Hearing) by Plaintiff (Webster, Steven)
April 24, 2020 Filing 410 Memorandum in Support re #409 MOTION to Seal filed by Plaintiff. (Webster, Steven)
April 24, 2020 Filing 409 MOTION to Seal by Plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Webster, Steven)
April 23, 2020 Filing 408 NOTICE by Plaintiff in Case No. 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA of the Disassociation of Andrew Williamson from Pierce Bainbridge LLP and Change of Address and Firm Affiliation (Williamson, Andrew)
April 21, 2020 Filing 407 Memorandum in Support re #318 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint . (Balser, David)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 406 ORDER granting #405 Motion to Withdraw PHV Appearance of Michael Pomerantz.. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 4/21/2020. (aott)
April 21, 2020 Filing 405 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney PHV Appearance of Michael Pomerantz by Plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Williamson, Andrew)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 404 PRETRIAL ORDER #21 granting #383 Motion to compel to the extent that it seeks a ruling that the blanket objection to any discovery being propounded to plaintiffs other than the nine plaintiffs named in the Representative Complaint should be overruled. (See Order for further details). Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 4/21/2020. (aott)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 403 ORDER granting #402 Motion to Withdraw PHV Appearance of Andrew J. Lorin. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 4/21/2020. (aott)
April 20, 2020 Filing 402 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney PHV Appearance of Andrew J. Lorin by Plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Williamson, Andrew)
April 17, 2020 Filing 401 Memorandum in Support re #384 Memorandum in Support, . (Balser, David)
April 15, 2020 Filing 400 Memorandum in Opposition re #383 MOTION to Compel Discovery From All Plaintiffs . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Declaration), #2 Exhibit 2 (Email with Deposition Notices))(Webster, Steven)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 399 So Ordered without prejudice re Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Plaintiff Dr. Michael Folck, named as a plaintiff in the Representative Consumer Class Action Complaint. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 4/15/2020. (aott)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 398 PRETRIAL ORDER #20 re #383 Motion to Compel Discovery From All Plaintiffs. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 3/13/2020. (aott)
April 13, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Anderson. #383 MOTION to Compel Discovery From All Plaintiffs (clar, )
April 13, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #393 MOTION to Dismiss The Broderick Complaint , #386 MOTION to Dismiss the Representative Consumer Class Action Complaint re #354 Amended Complaint , #389 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #392 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Motion Hearing set for 5/27/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (clar, )
April 13, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #383 MOTION to Compel Discovery From All Plaintiffs. Motion Hearing set for 4/17/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 501 before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (clar, )
April 13, 2020 ***Motion Hearing terminated- Per order at ECF #398 *** (aott)
April 10, 2020 Filing 397 Notice of Hearing Date set for May 27, 2020 re #393 MOTION to Dismiss The Broderick Complaint . (Balser, David)
April 10, 2020 Filing 396 Notice of Hearing Date set for May 27, 2020 10:00 a.m. re #392 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Vieth, Robert)
April 10, 2020 Filing 395 Memorandum in Support re #393 MOTION to Dismiss The Broderick Complaint . (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12)(Balser, David)
April 10, 2020 Filing 394 Memorandum in Support re #392 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in Broderick Complaint filed by Defendant. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Tyler Newby and Ex. A)(Vieth, Robert)
April 10, 2020 Filing 393 MOTION to Dismiss The Broderick Complaint . (Balser, David) Modified docket entry on 4/13/2020 (clar, ).
April 10, 2020 Filing 392 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vieth, Robert)
April 10, 2020 Filing 391 Notice of Hearing Date set for May 27, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. re #389 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Vieth, Robert)
April 10, 2020 Filing 390 Memorandum in Support re #389 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Defendant. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Tyler Newby and Exs. A-E, #2 Affidavit of Brian Buckley)(Vieth, Robert)
April 10, 2020 Filing 389 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Vieth, Robert)
April 10, 2020 Filing 388 Notice of Hearing Date for May 27, 2020 at 10:00 re #386 MOTION to Dismiss the Representative Consumer Class Action Complaint re #354 Amended Complaint . (Balser, David)
April 10, 2020 Filing 387 Memorandum in Support re #386 MOTION to Dismiss the Representative Consumer Class Action Complaint re #354 Amended Complaint . (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Exhibit 11, #14 Exhibit 12, #15 Exhibit 13, #16 Exhibit 14)(Balser, David)
April 10, 2020 Filing 386 MOTION to Dismiss the Representative Consumer Class Action Complaint re #354 Amended Complaint . (Balser, David) Modified docket entry on 4/13/2020 (clar, ).
April 10, 2020 Filing 385 Notice of Hearing Date set for 4/17/2020 re #383 MOTION to Compel Discovery From All Plaintiffs (Zinsner, Mary)
April 10, 2020 Filing 384 Memorandum in Support re #383 MOTION to Compel Discovery From All Plaintiffs filed by Defendant. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Zinsner, Mary)
April 10, 2020 Filing 383 MOTION to Compel Discovery From All Plaintiffs by Defendant. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Compel)(Zinsner, Mary)
April 9, 2020 Filing 382 NOTICE by Plaintiff of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by Michael Folck. (Webster, Steven)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 381 Stipulated Order Governing Discovery of Documents and Electronically-Stored Information. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 4/9/2020. (aott)
April 8, 2020 Filing 380 NOTICE by In Re: Capital One Customer Data Security Breach Litigation re #373 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, [Notice of Filing Stipulated Order] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: [Proposed] Stipulated Order Governing Discovery of Documents and Electronically-Stored Information)(Zinsner, Mary)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 379 ORDER granting (378) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney as to Elizabeth W. Hanes in case 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 4/8/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA(aott)
April 8, 2020 Filing 378 MOTION Motion to Withdraw as Attorney . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hanes, Elizabeth)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 377 ORDER granting #375 Motion for Pro hac vice as to Sarah Vasquez Lightstone. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 4/7/2020. (aott, )
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 376 ORDER granting #374 Motion for Pro hac vice as to Janie Yoo Miller. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 4/7/2020. (aott, )
April 7, 2020 Filing 375 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Sarah Vasquez Lightstone and Certification of Local Counsel Robert R. Vieth by Defendant. (Vieth, Robert)
April 7, 2020 Filing 374 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Janie Yoo Miller and Certification of Local Counsel Robert R. Vieth by Defendant. (Vieth, Robert)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 373 PRETRIAL ORDER #19 granting in part and denying in part #351 Motion for Entry of Electronically-Stored Information Protocol and Order Regarding Relevant Time Period. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 4/6/2020. (aott)
April 1, 2020 Filing 372 REPLY to Response to Motion re #351 MOTION for Entry of Electronically-Stored Information Protocol and Order Regarding Relevant Time Period filed by Plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Plaintiffs Proposed Order Governing Discovery of Documents and Electronically Stored Information))(Webster, Steven)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 371 Order re Notice of Dismissal by Plaintiff Michael Fadullon directing that the claims are dismissed in their entirety without prejudice. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA(aott)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 370 PRETRIAL ORDER #18 cancelling April 3, 2020 hearing on #351 Plaintiffs' motion for entry or electronically-stored information protocol and order regarding relevant time period. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 3/31/2020. (aott)
March 31, 2020 ***Motion Hearing terminated per #370 Pretrial Order #18. (aott)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 369 PreTrial Order #17 re Leave to File Excess Pages in support of motions to dismiss. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 3/30/2020. (aott)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 368 AMENDED STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 3/30/2020. (aott)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 367 PreTrial Order #16 re Amended Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 3/30/2020 (aott).
March 28, 2020 Filing 366 Memorandum in Support re #365 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in support of motions to dismiss Representative Complaint and Broderick Complaint filed by Defendant. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Angle, Robert)
March 28, 2020 Filing 365 Consent MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages in support of motions to dismiss Representative Complaint and Broderick Complaint by Defendant. (Angle, Robert)
March 27, 2020 Filing 364 NOTICE by Defendant re #341 MOTION for Protective Order (Motion to Modify Protective Order) (Notice of Filing Parties' Amended Stipulated Protective Order) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Amended Stipulated Protective Order)(Angle, Robert)
March 25, 2020 Filing 363 NOTICE by In Re: Capital One Customer Data Security Breach Litigation re #362 Memorandum in Opposition, of filing of Corrected Ex. D. (Balser, David)
March 25, 2020 Filing 362 Memorandum in Opposition re #351 MOTION for Entry of Electronically-Stored Information Protocol and Order Regarding Relevant Time Period . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Williams Declaration, #2 Exhibit B - Solomon Declaration, #3 Exhibit C - Cap. One Defs.' Am. Resp. to Interrog. No. 11, #4 Exhibit D - E-mails between Toro and Dent)(Balser, David)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 361 PRETRIAL ORDER #15 Continuing April 2020 Monthly Status Conference. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 3/25/2020. (aott) Status Conference set for 5/12/2020 at 02:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson.
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 360 Pretrial Order #8B re Litigation Schedule. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 3/23/2020. (aott)
March 20, 2020 Filing 359 Joint MOTION for Limited Modification of Litigation Schedule Due to Exigent Circumstances . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Balser, David)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 358 ORDERED that the hearing scheduled for 3/20/2020 at 10:00 a.m. on Capital One Defendants' motion to modify the protective order #341 is cancelled; that the hearing scheduled for 3/20/2020 at 10:00 a.m. on plaintiffs' motion for entry of electronically-stored information protocol and order regarding relevant time period #351 is rescheduled to 4/3/2020 at 10:00 a.m. Defendants' opposition to plaintiffs' motion is due by 3/25/2020 at 5:00 p.m. Plaintiffs' reply is due by 4/1/2020 at 5:00 p.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson 3/18/2020.Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA(rban, ) Modified on 3/18/2020 to correct the date of the hearing to 4/3/2020 (rban, ).
March 18, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #351 MOTION for Entry of Electronically-Stored Information Protocol and Order Regarding Relevant Time Period . Responses due by 3/25/2020 Replies due by 4/1/2020. Motion Hearing set for 4/3/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 501 before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (rban, )
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 357 Order directing that the Court will take under advisement the #318 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint and arguments in support and opposition and will decide the motion on the basis of the papers filed; directing that the motion hearing scheduled for 3/27/2020 at 10:00 am is cancelled. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 3/17/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA(aott)
March 17, 2020 Per AJT chambers motions set for 3/27/2020 have been CANCELLED and will be taken under advisement. A hearing will be scheduled at a later date, if necessary. (clar, )
March 16, 2020 Reset Deadlines as to #351 MOTION for Entry of Electronically-Stored Information Protocol and Order Regarding Relevant Time Period . Motion Hearing set for 3/20/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 501 before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (clar, )
March 16, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #351 MOTION for Entry of Electronically-Stored Information Protocol and Order Regarding Relevant Time Period . Motion Hearing set for 3/20/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (clar, )
March 16, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Anderson. #351 MOTION for Entry of Electronically-Stored Information Protocol and Order Regarding Relevant Time Period (clar, )
March 13, 2020 Filing 356 NOTICE by In Re: Capital One Customer Data Security Breach Litigation Notice of Change of Addres and Firm Affiliation for Brian Dunne and Yavar Bathaee (Williamson, Andrew)
March 13, 2020 Filing 355 NOTICE by Plaintiff re #354 Amended Complaint of Filing of Unredacted Corrected Representative Consumer Class Action Complaint (Webster, Steven)
March 13, 2020 Filing 354 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Corrected Representative Consumer Class Action Complaint) against Defendant, filed by Plaintiff.(Webster, Steven)
March 13, 2020 Filing 353 Notice of Hearing Date for March 20, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. re #351 MOTION for Entry of Electronically-Stored Information Protocol and Order Regarding Relevant Time Period (Webster, Steven)
March 13, 2020 Filing 352 Memorandum in Support re #351 MOTION for Entry of Electronically-Stored Information Protocol and Order Regarding Relevant Time Period filed by Plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Plaintiffs' Proposed ESI Protocol), #2 Exhibit B (Capital One ESI Protocol) (Capital One Edits), #3 Exhibit C (Defendant Capital One's Responses to Plaintiffs' First Document Requests))(Webster, Steven)
March 13, 2020 Filing 351 MOTION for Entry of Electronically-Stored Information Protocol and Order Regarding Relevant Time Period by Plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Webster, Steven)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 350 PreTrial Order #13- continuing the hearing for modification, directing that this will provide counsel an opportunity to resolve any remaining issues. (see order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 3/12/2020.(aott, )Reset Hearing as to #341 (Motion to Modify Protective Order). Motion Hearing set for 3/20/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 501 before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson.
March 11, 2020 Filing 349 RESPONSE in Opposition re #341 MOTION for Protective Order (Motion to Modify Protective Order) filed by Plaintiff. (Webster, Steven)
March 11, 2020 Filing 348 RESPONSE to Motion re #341 MOTION for Protective Order (Motion to Modify Protective Order) filed by Defendant. (Vieth, Robert)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 347 PRETRIAL ORDER #12 denying (333) Motion to Seal Limited Portions of Plaintiffs Representative Consumer Class Action Complaint; directing that plaintiffs shall file an unredacted versions of the representative consumer class action complaint in the public record. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 3/10/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA(aott, )
March 10, 2020 Filing 346 So Ordered re Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as to Plaintiff Gavriel Jerusalem. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA(aott)
March 10, 2020 Filing 345 Opposition to #318 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Jon Horne, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7)(Bennett, Carlton)
March 9, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #341 MOTION for Protective Order (Motion to Modify Protective Order). Motion Hearing set for 3/13/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 501 before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (clar, )
March 9, 2020 MOTIONS REFERRED to Magistrate Judge: Anderson. #341 MOTION for Protective Order (Motion to Modify Protective Order) (clar, )
March 6, 2020 Filing 344 Notice of Hearing Date set for (3/13/2020 at 10:00 a.m.) re #341 MOTION for Protective Order (Motion to Modify Protective Order) (Zinsner, Mary)
March 6, 2020 Filing 343 Memorandum in Support re #341 MOTION for Protective Order (Motion to Modify Protective Order) filed by Defendant, In Re: Capital One Customer Data Security Breach Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Memorandum in Support of Capital One's Motion to Modify Protective Order, #2 Exhibit B to Memorandum in Support of Capital One's Motion to Modify Protective Order)(Zinsner, Mary)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 342 ORDER granting #340 Motion for Pro hac vice as to Sarah Kohlhofer. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 3/6/2020. (aott)
March 6, 2020 Filing 341 MOTION for Protective Order (Motion to Modify Protective Order) by Defendant, In Re: Capital One Customer Data Security Breach Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting the Capital One Defendants' Motion to Modify Protective Order)(Zinsner, Mary)
March 6, 2020 Filing 340 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Sarah Kohlhofer and Certification of Local Counsel. (aott)
March 5, 2020 Filing 339 PRETRIAL ORDER #11. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA(aott, )
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 338 PRETRIAL ORDER #10- Continuing March 2020 Monthly Status Conference. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 3/4/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA(aott, )
March 4, 2020 Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 4/14/2020 at 02:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (aott, )
March 3, 2020 Filing 337 Joint MOTION to Continue March 9, 2020 Status Hearing by Plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Webster, Steven)
March 2, 2020 Filing 336 Sealed Document re #333 MOTION to Seal Limited Portions of Plaintiffs Representative Consumer Class Action Complaint. (Webster, Steven)
March 2, 2020 Filing 335 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Plaintiff re #333 MOTION to Seal Limited Portions of Plaintiffs Representative Consumer Class Action Complaint (Webster, Steven)
March 2, 2020 Filing 334 Memorandum in Support re #333 MOTION to Seal Limited Portions of Plaintiffs Representative Consumer Class Action Complaint filed by Plaintiff. (Webster, Steven)
March 2, 2020 Filing 333 MOTION to Seal Limited Portions of Plaintiffs Representative Consumer Class Action Complaint by Plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Webster, Steven)
March 2, 2020 Filing 332 AMENDED COMPLAINT (REPRESENTATIVE CONSUMER CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT REDACTED) filed by Plaintiff.(Webster, Steven) Modified on 3/3/2020 (aott, ).
February 27, 2020 Filing 331 REPLY to Response to Motion re #311 MOTION To Strike Unauthorized Supplemental Filing filed by Plaintiff. (Webster, Steven)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 330 Order Adopting Search Term Protocol. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson 2/26/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA(rban, )
February 25, 2020 Filing 329 NOTICE by Defendant of filing of Stipulated Search Term Protocol. (Balser, David)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 328 ORDER granting #327 Motion for Pro hac vice as to Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jonathan Shub. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 2/25/2020. (aott)
February 25, 2020 Filing 327 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Jonathan Shub and Certification of Local Counsel John Cole Gayle, Jr. Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7090776. by Plaintiff. (Gayle, John) (Main Document 327 replaced on 2/25/2020) (aott, ).
February 21, 2020 Filing 326 Opposition to #311 MOTION To Strike Unauthorized Supplemental Filing Overcharge Plaintiffs Opposition to Motion to Strike filed by In Re: Capital One Customer Data Security Breach Litigation. (Williamson, Andrew)
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 325 ORDER for Pro hac vice as to Gregory Scott Bruch. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 2/21/2020. (aott)
February 21, 2020 Filing 324 Pretrial Order #9 - March 2020 Monthly Status Conference. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA(aott)
February 21, 2020 Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 3/9/2020 at 02:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (aott)
February 20, 2020 Filing 323 NOTICE by Defendant of Request to change the time of the status conference. (Balser, David)
February 20, 2020 Filing 322 NOTICE by Defendant Application Pro Hac Vice for Gregory S. Bruch. (Burke, Lara)
February 20, 2020 Filing 321 NOTICE by Defendant Notice of Appearance. (Burke, Lara)
February 19, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #318 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint . Motion Hearing set for 3/27/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (clar, )
February 18, 2020 Filing 320 Notice of Hearing Date set for March 27, 2020 re #318 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint . (Balser, David)
February 18, 2020 Filing 319 Memorandum in Support re #318 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Chart of Statements, #2 Declaration of Benjamin Lee)(Balser, David)
February 18, 2020 Filing 318 MOTION to Dismiss the Amended Class Action Complaint . (Balser, David)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDER granting #308 Motion for Pro hac vice as to Margeaux Rachelle Azar. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 2/10/2020. (aott, )
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 316 ORDER granting #307 Motion for Pro hac vice as to Franklin David Azar. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 2/10/2020. (aott, )
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 315 So ORDERED re: #309 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 2/10/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA(rban, )
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 314 So ORDERED re: #310 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga 2/10/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA(rban, )
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 313 Stipulated Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson 2/10/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA(rban, )
February 7, 2020 Filing 312 NOTICE by Plaintiff of Stipulated Proposed Protective Order. (Webster, Steven)
February 7, 2020 Filing 311 MOTION To Strike Unauthorized Supplemental Filing . (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Webster, Steven)
February 7, 2020 Filing 310 NOTICE by Plaintiff of Voluntary Dismissal. (Webster, Steven)
February 7, 2020 Filing 309 NOTICE by Plaintiff of Voluntary Dismissal. (Webster, Steven)
February 7, 2020 Filing 308 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Margeaux Rachelle Azar and Certification of Local Counsel Dale W. Pittman by Plaintiff. (Pittman, Dale)
February 7, 2020 Filing 307 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Franklin David Azar and Certification of Local Counsel Dale W. Pittman by Plaintiff. (Pittman, Dale)
February 2, 2020 Filing 306 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 1/29/2020, before Judge John F. Anderson, Transcriber Anneliese Thomson, Telephone number 703-299-8595. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 3/3/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/3/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/4/2020.(thomson, anneliese)
February 2, 2020 Filing 305 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 1/20/2020, before Judge Anthony J. Trenga and Judge John F. Anderson, Court Reporter Anneliese Thomson, Telephone number 703-299-8595. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 3/3/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/3/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/4/2020.(thomson, anneliese)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 304 Order Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order - Pursuant to the Rule 16(b) Conference it is ordered that: 1. All fact discovery shall be concluded by August 21, 2020. All expert discovery shall be concluded by November 23, 2020. As discussed at the Rule 16(B) conference, rolling production of documents shall begin March 2, 2020 and continue as discussed with counsel. The deadline for substantial completion of document production is June 1, 2020. 2. As discussed at the Rule 16(B) conference, the parties agree to waive all Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) disclosures. 3. Expert disclosures shall be governed by the schedule set forth in Pretrial Order #8. (Docket no. 302). Lead Counsel are to identify experts and serve expert reports by September 21, 2020. By October 21, 2020, Lead Counsel are to identify rebuttal experts and serve rebuttal expert reports. To the extent the parties wish to modify these deadlines, they must seek leave of court. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 01/30/2020. SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER DETAILS. (wgar, )
January 30, 2020 Alexandria Set/Reset Hearings: Dismissal Hearing set for 5/27/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga. (dzir)
January 30, 2020 Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 3/10/2020 at 02:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. Status Conference set for 4/14/2020 at 02:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (dzir)
January 29, 2020 Filing 303 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson:Initial Pretrial Conference held on 1/29/2020. Appearances of counsel. Parties discussed the Proposed Consumer Litigation Plan and Deadlines. Order to issue. (Tape #FTR.)(wgar, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/30/2020: #1 Supplement Court Call Telephonic Appearance Schedule) (wgar, ).
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 302 Pretrial Order #8 re Representative Complaint; Litigation Schedule; Monthly Status Conferences. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga on 1/29/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA (dzir)
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 301 Pretrial Order # 1B Regarding Modification of Plaintiffs' Lead Counsel Duties in Paragraph 3(b) of Pretrial Order #1. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga on 1/29/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA (dzir)
January 29, 2020 Filing 300 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson: Status Conference held on 1/29/2020. Counsel appeared for Plaintiff and Defendant (see attached sign-in sheets). Counsel updates the Court on the agenda items as listed in the Joint Proposed Agenda for Initial Status Conference #265 filed on 1/10/2020 with the exception of those to be addressed in the subsequent hearing to be heard by Magistrate Judge Anderson. The Court will adopt the Joint Report and Proposed Consumer Litigation Schedule #270 with the exceptions that a hearing on any Motions to Dismiss be held on 5/27/2020, that the Court will dispense of the deadline set for 6/22/2020, and if the parties are to be amended, that they follow the applicable filing rules. The Court further orders that monthly status conferences are to take place every second Tuesday of the month beginning in the month of March. The Court additionally requests an update on the status of the Congressional inquiries and is informed that they are presently inactive. Court adjourned. Order to follow. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs' Counsel Sign-In Sheet, #2 Defense Counsel Sign-In Sheet, #3 Court Call Telephonic Appearance Schedule) (Court Reporter A. Thomson.)(dzir) Modified on 1/30/2020 to add judge (wgar, ).
January 28, 2020 Filing 299 NOTICE of Appearance by Miles Jarrad Wright on behalf of Plaintiff (Wright, Miles)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 298 ORDER granting #296 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice as to Ronnie D. Solomon. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 1/28/2020. (aott)
January 27, 2020 Filing 297 NOTICE by Defendant Capital One's Statement of Position on Proposed Representive Complaint. (Balser, David)
January 27, 2020 Filing 296 MOTION Admission Pro Hac Vice . (Balser, David)
January 27, 2020 Filing 295 BRIEF by Plaintiff Response to the Broderick Plaintiffs Request for a Separate Track and Objections to Case Classification. (Webster, Steven)
January 24, 2020 Filing 294 Response to #264 NOTICE, #272 Response Overcharge Plaintiffs' Supplemental Response to Joint Statement of Case Classification filed by In Re: Capital One Customer Data Security Breach Litigation. (Williamson, Andrew)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 293 ORDER granting #291 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice as to Laurence Rosen. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 1/24/2020. (aott)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER granting #290 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice as to Phillip Kim. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 1/24/2020. (aott)
January 24, 2020 Filing 291 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Laurence Rosen, Esquire and Certification of Local Counsel Carlton F. Bennett, Esquire Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7039879. by Plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Federal Court Admissions List)(Bennett, Carlton)
January 24, 2020 Filing 290 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Phillip Kim, Esquire and Certification of Local Counsel Carlton F. Bennett, Esquire Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7039843. by Plaintiff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Federal Court Admissions List)(Bennett, Carlton)
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 289 Pretrial Order # 7 re Standing Order for Telephonic Appearances. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 1/23/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA(aott, )
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 288 Pretrial Order #6 re Discovery on Damages. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 1/23/2020. Associated Cases: 1:19-md-02915-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-00995-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01006-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01042-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01048-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01062-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01174-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01454-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-01472-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02916-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02917-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02918-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02919-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02920-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02921-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02922-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02923-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02924-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02925-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02926-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02927-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02928-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02929-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02930-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02931-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02932-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02933-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02934-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02935-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02936-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02937-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02938-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02939-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02940-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02941-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02942-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02943-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02944-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02945-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02946-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02947-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02948-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02949-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02950-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02951-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02952-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02953-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02954-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02955-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02956-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02957-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02960-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02961-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02962-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02963-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02964-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02965-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02966-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02967-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02968-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02969-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02970-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02971-AJT-JFA, 1:19-cv-02972-AJT-JFA(aott, )
January 22, 2020 Filing 287 NOTICE by Plaintiff Plaintiffs' Position Statement Regarding Protective Order Disagreements In Accord With The Joint Report Pursuant To Paragraph 11 Of Pretrial Order #1 [Doc. 267]. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Defendant's Jan. 20, 2020 Draft), #2 Exhibit 2 (Ormat Order), #3 Exhibit 3 (In Re Equifax Stipulated Protective Order), #4 Exhibit 4 (N.D. Cal. Form Patent Protective Order))(Webster, Steven)
January 22, 2020 Filing 286 NOTICE by Defendant - Position Statement on Protective Order Issues. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Redlined Comparison, #2 Exhibit B - Clean Copy of Defs.' PO, #3 Exhibit C - X2Y Attenuators PO, #4 Exhibit D - Meggitt PO, #5 Exhibit E - Intellectual Ventures PO, #6 Exhibit F - Media Rights PO, #7 Exhibit G - Model PO, #8 Exhibit H - In re Anthem PO, #9 Exhibit I - In re Dominion Dental PO)(Balser, David)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 285 ORDER granting #283 Motion for Pro hac vice as to Kate M. Baxter-Kauf. Signed by Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson on 1/22/2020. (aott, )
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order