Central Source LLC v. annaulcreditreports.com et al
Plaintiff: Central Source LLC
Defendant: wwwannual-creditreport.com, credit-annual-report.com, annual-free-credit-report.com, annaulcreditreporti.com, my-free-annual-credit-report.com, annaulcreditreportftc.com, free-annual-credit-reports.com, www-freeannualcreditreports.com, annaulcreditreports.com, annualfree-creditreport.com, annual-credit-reports.com and freeannualcreditreports.org
Case Number: 1:2020cv00084
Filed: January 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Leonie M Brinkema
Referring Judge: Ivan D Davis
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 16, 2020 Filing 11 Declaration re #10 Order on Motion for Service by Publication, by Central Source LLC. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(Barnes, Attison)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDERED that a copy this Order be published in The Washington Times or the Washington Post within fourteen (14) days after entry of this Order and that a declaration be filed on Plaintiff's behalf, no later than twenty (20) days after the entry of this Order, describing the steps that have been taken to comply with this Order. #7 Motion for Service by Publication (Please See Order for Details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 2/28/2020. (lcre, )
February 27, 2020 Filing 9 Waiver of re #7 MOTION for Service by Publication Hearing by Central Source LLC (Barnes, Attison)
February 27, 2020 Filing 8 Memorandum in Support re #7 MOTION for Service by Publication filed by Central Source LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Declaration of Ari S. Meltzer)(Barnes, Attison)
February 27, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Service by Publication by Central Source LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Barnes, Attison)
February 26, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Central Source LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits 1-25)(Barnes, Attison)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Pro hac vice of David Edison Weslow. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 1/28/2020. (lcre, )
January 27, 2020 Filing 4 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by David Edison Weslow and Certification of Local Counsel Attison L. Barnes, III Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7043094. by Central Source LLC. (Barnes, Attison)
January 24, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Submission: Civil Cover Sheet by Central Source LLC re #1 Complaint (Barnes, Attison) Modified on 1/24/2020 (lcre, ).
January 24, 2020 Notice of Correction: The filing user has been notified that document [1-1] Civil coversheet is an incorrectly saved PDF fillable form and has been removed. The filing user was directed to refile the document. (lcre, )
January 24, 2020 Filing 2 Report on the filing or determination of an action regarding a trademark. (lcre, )(c/s)
January 24, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (lcre, )
January 24, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7040666.), filed by Central Source LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Financial Interest Disclosure Statement, #3 Exhibit Exhibits 1-13)(Barnes, Attison)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Central Source LLC v. annaulcreditreports.com et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: wwwannual-creditreport.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: credit-annual-report.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: annual-free-credit-report.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: annaulcreditreporti.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: my-free-annual-credit-report.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: annaulcreditreportftc.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: free-annual-credit-reports.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: www-freeannualcreditreports.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: annaulcreditreports.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: annualfree-creditreport.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: annual-credit-reports.com
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: freeannualcreditreports.org
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central Source LLC
Represented By: Attison Leonard Barnes, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?