Cartier International AG et al v. Grand Jewelers
Plaintiff: Cartier International AG, Cartier, a division of Richemont North America, Inc. and Cartier
Defendant: Grand Jewelers
Case Number: 1:2020cv00159
Filed: February 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: T S Ellis
Referring Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cartier International AG, Cartier Grand Jewelers served on 3/2/2020, answer due 3/23/2020 (Reilly, Craig)
February 21, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Grand Jewelers. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(acha, )
February 20, 2020 Filing 5 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Cartier, Cartier International AG. (Reilly, Craig)
February 18, 2020 Filing 4 Report on the filing or determination of an action. (Attachments: #1 Complaint)(spar)
February 14, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by Cartier, Cartier International AG re #1 Complaint (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Appendix Form AO 120)(Reilly, Craig)
February 14, 2020 Notice of Correction re #1 Complaint. The filing user has been notified to file the AO-120 Trademark Form. (acha, )
February 13, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge T. S. Ellis, III and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (acha, )
February 13, 2020 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Cartier International AG, Cartier, a division of Richemont North America, Inc.. (Reilly, Craig)
February 13, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7073764.), filed by Cartier International AG, Cartier, a division of Richemont North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Reilly, Craig)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cartier International AG et al v. Grand Jewelers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grand Jewelers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cartier International AG
Represented By: Craig Crandall Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cartier, a division of Richemont North America, Inc.
Represented By: Craig Crandall Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cartier
Represented By: Craig Crandall Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?