Cola, et al v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Lillian Gay, Shirley Thomas, Terry Johnson, Kimberly Poe, Ronald Sanders, James Wilson, Lora Friedman, Wanda Faye McGhee, Waymon Doss, Joel Piazza, Christen Brown-Mayhew, Brian Mahi, Julia Garber, William Curran, Billy Roudhton, Leslie Mcpherson, Lynn Moroniak, Alexandra Cola, Anandakumar Vellalore, Kenneth Wallace, Lewis Bland, Hope Reagan, Arslan Uddin, Vincent Barber, Lou Dicola, Melissa Depriest, Donald Garber, Kathleen Wood, April Pittman, Sonya Veale, Donald Ray Dalton, Edward Tokarz, Shereka Lewis, Katherine Kayes, Ellwood A. Wheatley, William Bruce White, Keven Haggerty, Melanie Belcher, Robert McPherson, Julia R. Garber, Scott Shetler, Calvin Gibbons, Jacky Troutman, James Freeman, Vinh Nguyen, Tracye Nedd, John R. Morneau, Guy Brathwaite, Faye Hayes, Lisa Johnson, Joseph Osborne, Mitchell Ashburb, Ruth Sanders, Patrick Kennedy, Thomas Fortney, Ralph Figgers, Keith Ellis, Bryan Zelley, William Fleming, Lewis Avery, Steven C. Roaf, Ronald Lee Johnson, Norman Lafayette, Floyd Willis, Harry L. Darden, Selby W Lagana, Mollie Toombs, Michael McMillian, Sharonda Ryals, Victor Santos Cintron, Shirley Fortney, Sheila Scott, Erwin Guerra and Rhonda Perrow
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv00210
Filed: February 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Ivan D Davis
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Stay. This matter is hereby stayed until July 20, 2020. Ford shall respond to the First Amended Complaint by July 27, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis on 4/20/20. (klau, )
April 17, 2020 Filing 13 Memorandum in Support re #12 Joint MOTION to Stay filed by Ford Motor Company. (Tan, Jonathan)
April 17, 2020 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Stay by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tan, Jonathan)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Ford's deadline to file its response to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint is EXTENDED up to and including April 13,2020. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 3/12/20. (klau, )
March 11, 2020 Filing 10 Waiver of Oral Argument on Ford Motor Company's Consent Motion To Extend Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by Ford Motor Company (Tan, Jonathan)
March 11, 2020 Filing 9 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Ford Motor Company. (Tan, Jonathan)
March 11, 2020 Filing 8 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tan, Jonathan)
February 28, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued for Amended Complaint as to Ford Motor Company. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint and Amended Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(klau, )
February 27, 2020 Filing 6 Proposed Summons re #4 Amended Complaint,,,,, by Mitchell Ashburb, Lewis Avery, Vincent Barber, Melanie Belcher, Lewis Bland, Guy Brathwaite, Christen Brown-Mayhew, Alexandra Cola, William Curran, Donald Ray Dalton, Harry L. Darden, Melissa Depriest, Lou Dicola, Waymon Doss, Keith Ellis, Ralph Figgers, William Fleming, Shirley Fortney, Thomas Fortney, James Freeman, Lora Friedman, Donald Garber, Julia R. Garber, Julia Garber, Lillian Gay, Calvin Gibbons, Erwin Guerra, Keven Haggerty, Faye Hayes, Lisa Johnson, Ronald Lee Johnson, Terry Johnson, Katherine Kayes, Patrick Kennedy, Norman Lafayette, Selby W Lagana, Shereka Lewis, Brian Mahi, Wanda Faye McGhee, Michael McMillian, Robert McPherson, Leslie Mcpherson, John R. Morneau, Lynn Moroniak, Tracye Nedd, Vinh Nguyen, Joseph Osborne, Rhonda Perrow, Joel Piazza, April Pittman, Kimberly Poe, Hope Reagan, Steven C. Roaf, Billy Roudhton, Sharonda Ryals, Ronald Sanders, Ruth Sanders, Victor Santos Cintron, Sheila Scott, Scott Shetler, Shirley Thomas, Edward Tokarz, Mollie Toombs, Jacky Troutman, Arslan Uddin, Sonya Veale, Anandakumar Vellalore, Kenneth Wallace, Ellwood A. Wheatley, William Bruce White, Floyd Willis, James Wilson, Kathleen Wood, Bryan Zelley. (Stein, Jesse)
February 27, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT re summons issued dated 2/26/20 re #4 Amended Complaint,,,,, by Mitchell Ashburb, Lewis Avery, Vincent Barber, Melanie Belcher, Lewis Bland, Guy Brathwaite, Christen Brown-Mayhew, Alexandra Cola, William Curran, Donald Ray Dalton, Harry L. Darden, Melissa Depriest, Lou Dicola, Waymon Doss, Keith Ellis, Ralph Figgers, William Fleming, Shirley Fortney, Thomas Fortney, James Freeman, Lora Friedman, Donald Garber, Julia R. Garber, Julia Garber, Lillian Gay, Calvin Gibbons, Erwin Guerra, Keven Haggerty, Faye Hayes, Lisa Johnson, Ronald Lee Johnson, Terry Johnson, Katherine Kayes, Patrick Kennedy, Norman Lafayette, Selby W Lagana, Shereka Lewis, Brian Mahi, Wanda Faye McGhee, Michael McMillian, Robert McPherson, Leslie Mcpherson, John R. Morneau, Lynn Moroniak, Tracye Nedd, Vinh Nguyen, Joseph Osborne, Rhonda Perrow, Joel Piazza, April Pittman, Kimberly Poe, Hope Reagan, Steven C. Roaf, Billy Roudhton, Sharonda Ryals, Ronald Sanders, Ruth Sanders, Victor Santos Cintron, Sheila Scott, Scott Shetler, Shirley Thomas, Edward Tokarz, Mollie Toombs, Jacky Troutman, Arslan Uddin, Sonya Veale, Anandakumar Vellalore, Kenneth Wallace, Ellwood A. Wheatley, William Bruce White, Floyd Willis, James Wilson, Kathleen Wood, Bryan Zelley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Prop Summons)(Stein, Jesse) Modified text on 2/28/2020 (klau, ).
February 27, 2020 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Melissa Depriest, Michael McMillian, Erwin Guerra, Lewis Bland, Billy Roudhton, Ronald Lee Johnson, Vinh Nguyen, Norman Lafayette, Julia Garber, Shereka Lewis, William Curran, Julia R. Garber, Calvin Gibbons, Joel Piazza, Robert McPherson, Ellwood A. Wheatley, Harry L. Darden, Floyd Willis, Lou Dicola, Sonya Veale, Patrick Kennedy, Rhonda Perrow, Bryan Zelley, Donald Ray Dalton, Keven Haggerty, Keith Ellis, Jacky Troutman, Hope Reagan, Ralph Figgers, James Wilson, Lewis Avery, Thomas Fortney, Terry Johnson, Brian Mahi, Katherine Kayes, Melanie Belcher, Faye Hayes, Vincent Barber, Alexandra Cola, Wanda Faye McGhee, Steven C. Roaf, Mollie Toombs, Anandakumar Vellalore, Tracye Nedd, Selby W Lagana, April Pittman, Christen Brown-Mayhew, Sheila Scott, Sharonda Ryals, Edward Tokarz, Lillian Gay, Lisa Johnson, Kimberly Poe, James Freeman, Arslan Uddin, William Bruce White, Joseph Osborne, Ruth Sanders, Kathleen Wood, Scott Shetler, Donald Garber, Ronald Sanders, Mitchell Ashburb, Guy Brathwaite, John R. Morneau, Victor Santos Cintron, Leslie Mcpherson, Kenneth Wallace, Lora Friedman, Shirley Fortney, Lynn Moroniak, Waymon Doss, Shirley Thomas, William Fleming. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Stein, Jesse) Modified text on 2/28/2020 (klau, ).
February 26, 2020 Intradistrict Transfer to Newport News Division, 4:20cv34 (afar)
February 26, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued for service by SPS as to Ford Motor Company. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(klau, )
February 26, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Anthony J Trenga and Magistrate Judge Ivan D. Davis. (klau, )
February 26, 2020 Filing 2 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint by Alexandra Cola. (Stein, Jesse)
February 26, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint with Jury Demand Against Ford Motor Co. ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7091854.), filed by Alexandra Cola, et al.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stein, Jesse) Modified text on 2/26/2020 (klau, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cola, et al v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lillian Gay
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Thomas
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Johnson
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Poe
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Sanders
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Wilson
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lora Friedman
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanda Faye McGhee
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Waymon Doss
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Piazza
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christen Brown-Mayhew
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Mahi
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Garber
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Curran
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Billy Roudhton
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Mcpherson
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynn Moroniak
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexandra Cola
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anandakumar Vellalore
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Wallace
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lewis Bland
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hope Reagan
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arslan Uddin
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vincent Barber
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lou Dicola
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Depriest
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Garber
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Wood
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: April Pittman
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonya Veale
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Ray Dalton
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Tokarz
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shereka Lewis
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Katherine Kayes
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ellwood A. Wheatley
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Bruce White
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keven Haggerty
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie Belcher
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert McPherson
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia R. Garber
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott Shetler
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calvin Gibbons
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacky Troutman
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Freeman
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vinh Nguyen
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracye Nedd
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John R. Morneau
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guy Brathwaite
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Faye Hayes
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Johnson
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Osborne
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitchell Ashburb
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth Sanders
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick Kennedy
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Fortney
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Figgers
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith Ellis
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Zelley
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Fleming
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lewis Avery
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven C. Roaf
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald Lee Johnson
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman Lafayette
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Floyd Willis
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry L. Darden
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Selby W Lagana
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mollie Toombs
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael McMillian
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharonda Ryals
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Santos Cintron
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Fortney
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sheila Scott
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erwin Guerra
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhonda Perrow
Represented By: Jesse Daniel Stein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Jonathan Tuck Tan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?