City of Fairfax, VA v. Mallinckrodt PLC et al
Plaintiff: City of Fairfax, VA
Defendant: Caremark RX, L.L.C., McKesson Corporation, Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Mylan Institutional Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Indivior, Inc., Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc., Henry Schein, Inc., Insource, Inc., Allergan PLC, Watson Labratories, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., CaremarkPCS, L.L.C., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Rite Aid Corp., Rite Aid Mid-Atlantic, Cardinal Health, Inc., Caremark, L.L.C., Actavis Pharma, Inc., ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc., Walgreen Co., Cephalon, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc., CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C., CVS TN Distribution, L.L.C., OptumRX, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, Optum, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., WalMart Inc., Barr Laboratories, Inc., Allergan Finance, LLC, AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Virginia CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C., Rite Aid of Virginia, Inc., Specgx LLC, Express Scripts, Inc., Actavis LLC, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Eckerd Corporation, UnitedHealth Group Incorporated, Does 1 - 100, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., General Injectables & Vaccines, Inc. and Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00218
Filed: February 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Liam O'Grady
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2020 Notice of Correction re #27 MOTION for Order Implementing Automatic Stay Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 62(a). The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing Date or a Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument. (shea)
April 21, 2020 Filing 28 Memorandum in Support re #27 MOTION for Order Implementing Automatic Stay Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 62(a) filed by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc.. (Scott, Emily)
April 21, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION for Order Implementing Automatic Stay Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 62(a) by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Scott, Emily)
April 21, 2020 Filing 26 Memorandum in Opposition re #16 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Updated Federal Officer Removed Cases, #2 Exhibit 2 - Diversity Based Removals, #3 Exhibit 3 - Cahill Declaration, #4 Exhibit 4 - Statement of Work (DOD Contract), #5 Exhibit 5 - Mecklenburg Stay Order, #6 Exhibit 6 - List of Opioid Cases)(Scott, Emily)
April 21, 2020 Filing 25 Memorandum in Opposition re #18 Supplemental MOTION to Remand to State Court Re: Doc. 10, Supplemental Notice of Removal filed by Optum, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Broughton, Turner)
April 7, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc. Notice of Intent to File (Scott, Emily)
April 6, 2020 Filing 23 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS TN Distribution, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS, L.L.C., Virginia CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C., Caremark, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C., Caremark RX, L.L.C.. (Coburn, Samuel)
April 6, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel Perry Coburn on behalf of CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc., CVS TN Distribution, L.L.C., Caremark RX, L.L.C., Caremark, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C., CaremarkPCS, L.L.C., Virginia CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C. (Coburn, Samuel)
March 30, 2020 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Support re #13 MOTION for Temporary Stay of Proceedings Pending the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's Final Transfer Decision filed by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Updated Federal Officer Removed Cases, #2 Exhibit 2 - Judge Polster Order, #3 Exhibit 3 - Van Tatenhove Stay Order, #4 Exhibit 4 - Martinsville Stay Order)(Scott, Emily)
March 26, 2020 Notice of Correction re #18 Supplemental MOTION to Remand to State Court Re: Doc. 10, Supplemental Notice of Removal, #16 MOTION to Remand to State Court . The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing Date or a Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument. (shea)
March 24, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION for Temporary Stay of Proceedings Pending the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's Final Transfer Decision filed by City of Fairfax, VA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Transcript of Nov 6, 2017 Hearing)(Conrod, Richard)
March 24, 2020 Filing 19 Memorandum in Support re #18 Supplemental MOTION to Remand to State Court Re: Doc. 10, Supplemental Notice of Removal filed by City of Fairfax, VA. (Conrod, Richard)
March 24, 2020 Filing 18 Supplemental MOTION to Remand to State Court Re: Doc. 10, Supplemental Notice of Removal by City of Fairfax, VA. (Conrod, Richard)
March 24, 2020 Filing 17 Memorandum in Support re #16 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by City of Fairfax, VA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - ES Military Health System SOW)(Conrod, Richard)
March 24, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Remand to State Court by City of Fairfax, VA. (Conrod, Richard)
March 12, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by William Edgar Spivey on behalf of City of Fairfax, VA (Spivey, William)
March 11, 2020 Notice of Correction re #13 MOTION for Temporary Stay of Proceedings Pending the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's Final Transfer Decision . The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing Date or a Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument. (shea)
March 10, 2020 Filing 14 Memorandum in Support re #13 MOTION for Temporary Stay of Proceedings Pending the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's Final Transfer Decision filed by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - CTO-140, #2 Exhibit 2 - List of Opioid Cases, #3 Exhibit 3 - Stay Orders, #4 Exhibit 4 - J. Polster Federal Officer Order, #5 Exhibit 5 - Fed Officer Removed Cases, #6 Exhibit 6 - Fed Officer Stay Orders, #7 Exhibit 7 - Diversity Based Removals, #8 Exhibit 8 - NY Fraudulent Misjoinder Cases, #9 Exhibit 9 - Federal Question Removed Cases, #10 Exhibit 10 - CAFA Removed Cases, #11 Exhibit 11 - CAFA Stay Orders, #12 Exhibit 12 - Board of Commissioners Opinion, #13 Exhibit 13 - Commonwealth of Kentucky)(Scott, Emily)
March 10, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Temporary Stay of Proceedings Pending the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's Final Transfer Decision by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Scott, Emily)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for an Order Memorializing Parties' Agreement Re: Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint - the Moving Defendants shall file their answers or other responsive pleadings to Plaintiff's complaint not later than sixty (60) days following the later of (1) the final determination of Plaintiff's motion to remand, or (2) a final decision regarding transfer of this action to the Opiate MDL (MDL No. 2804). Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 3/6/2020. (awac, )
March 5, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION For An Order Memorializing the Parties' Agreement Regarding Time to Respond to Complaint by Mallinckrodt LLC, Specgx LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Miller, Sarah)
March 2, 2020 Filing 10 Supplemental Notice of Removal by Optum, Inc., OptumRX, Inc. and UnitedHealth Group Incorporated of Supplemental Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Broughton, Turner) Modified on 3/3/2020 (shea, ).
March 2, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Optum, Inc.. (Broughton, Turner)
March 2, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by UnitedHealth Group Incorporated. (Broughton, Turner)
March 2, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by OptumRX, Inc.. (Broughton, Turner)
March 2, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Turner A. Broughton on behalf of Optum, Inc., OptumRX, Inc., UnitedHealth Group Incorporated (Broughton, Turner)
February 27, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Liam O'Grady and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (shea)
February 27, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Express Scripts, Inc.. (Scott, Emily)
February 27, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Express Scripts Holding Company. (Scott, Emily)
February 27, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc.. (Scott, Emily)
February 27, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc.. (Scott, Emily)
February 27, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7095933.), filed by Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc., Express Scripts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - List of Opioid Cases, #2 Exhibit 2 - Fairfax State Court File, #3 Exhibit 3 - Waiver, #4 Exhibit 4 - Civil Cover Sheet with attachment)(Scott, Emily)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of Fairfax, VA v. Mallinckrodt PLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark RX, L.L.C.
Represented By: Samuel Perry Coburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Institutional Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Holding Company
Represented By: Emily Munro Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indivior, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Represented By: Sarah Byer Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Medical-Surgical Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Schein, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insource, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Labratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CaremarkPCS, L.L.C.
Represented By: Samuel Perry Coburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Mid-Atlantic
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark, L.L.C.
Represented By: Samuel Perry Coburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESI Mail Pharmacy Service, Inc.
Represented By: Emily Munro Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CaremarkPCS Health, L.L.C.
Represented By: Samuel Perry Coburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS TN Distribution, L.L.C.
Represented By: Samuel Perry Coburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OptumRX, Inc.
Represented By: Turner A. Broughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Samuel Perry Coburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum, Inc.
Represented By: Turner A. Broughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WalMart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barr Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virginia CVS Pharmacy, L.L.C.
Represented By: Samuel Perry Coburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid of Virginia, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specgx LLC
Represented By: Sarah Byer Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts, Inc.
Represented By: Emily Munro Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Emily Munro Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eckerd Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group Incorporated
Represented By: Turner A. Broughton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 - 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Samuel Perry Coburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Injectables & Vaccines, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Fairfax, VA
Represented By: Grant Edward Morris, Jr.
Represented By: Richard Johan Conrod, Jr.
Represented By: William Edgar Spivey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?