Castillo Perez v. Barr et al
Plaintiff: Carlos Castillo Perez
Defendant: William Pelham Barr and Garry D Malphrus
Case Number: 1:2020cv00245
Filed: March 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Referring Judge: Claude M Hilton
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1361
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 So Ordered re #10 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice filed by Garry D Malphrus, William Pelham Barr. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 3/18/2020. (See order for further details)(acha, )
March 18, 2020 Per CMH chambers motions set for 3/20/2020 has settled (clar, )
March 16, 2020 Filing 10 STIPULATION of Dismissal Joint by William Pelham Barr, Garry D Malphrus. (Mezger, Matthew)
March 16, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J. Mezger on behalf of William Pelham Barr, Garry D Malphrus (Mezger, Matthew)
March 12, 2020 Reset Deadlines as to #4 Emergency MOTION to Stay Removal. Motion Hearing set for 3/20/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. (clar, )
March 12, 2020 Set Deadlines as to #4 Emergency MOTION to Stay Removal. Motion Hearing set for 3/13/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 800 before District Judge Claude M. Hilton. (clar, )
March 11, 2020 Filing 8 Memorandum in Support re #4 Emergency MOTION to Stay Removal filed by Carlos Castillo Perez. (Yacub, Ivan)
March 11, 2020 Filing 7 Notice of Hearing Date for March 20, 2020 re #4 Emergency MOTION to Stay Removal (Yacub, Ivan)
March 9, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Hearing Date March 13, 2020 re #4 Emergency MOTION to Stay Removal (Yacub, Ivan)
March 5, 2020 Notice of Correction re #4 Emergency MOTION to Stay Removal. The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing Date or a Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument (choy, )
March 5, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to William Pelham Barr, Garry D Malphrus, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two Electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(choy, )
March 5, 2020 Filing 4 Emergency MOTION to Stay Removal by Carlos Castillo Perez. (Yacub, Ivan)
March 4, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge T. S. Ellis, III and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (choy, )
March 4, 2020 Electronic Fee Payment - as to #1 Petition for Writ of Mandamus, by Carlos Castillo Perez. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7105232.. (Yacub, Ivan)
March 4, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Petition for Writ of Mandamus, by Carlos Castillo Perez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Summons to USAtty, #2 Proposed Order Summons to BIA)(Yacub, Ivan)
March 4, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Ivan Yacub on behalf of Carlos Castillo Perez (Yacub, Ivan)
March 4, 2020 Filing 1 Emergency PETITION for Writ of Mandamus (Filing fee $ 400.), filed by Carlos Castillo Perez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 IJ decision, #3 Exhibit 2 BIA decision, #4 Exhibit 3 MTR to BIA, #5 Exhibit 4 245(i) evidence, #6 Exhibit 5 ICE call-in letter, #7 Exhibit 6 BIA stay denial)(Yacub, Ivan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Castillo Perez v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Pelham Barr
Represented By: Matthew J. Mezger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garry D Malphrus
Represented By: Matthew J. Mezger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Castillo Perez
Represented By: Ivan Yacub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?