Minas Urbina v. Barr et al
Petitioner: Eli S Minas Urbina
Respondent: Jeffrey Crawford, Secretary of DHS Chad Wolf, Director of ICE/FF Kim Zanotti and Attorney General William Barr
Case Number: 1:2020cv00325
Filed: March 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Leonie M Brinkema
Referring Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 4, 2020 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by William Barr, Chad Wolf, Kim Zanotti. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Spavins, Elizabeth)
April 30, 2020 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Jeffrey Crawford. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Erbach, John)
April 28, 2020 Filing 9 Reply to Motion re #6 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Eli S Minas Urbina. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 7 Transcript of Proceedings, June 28, 2017, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 8 Transcript of Proceedings July 25, 2107, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 9 IJ Order of IJ denying motion to terminate, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 10 Transcript of Proceedings August 16, 2017, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 11 Notice of Appeal, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 12 Transcript of Proceedings September 6, 2017, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 13 Transcript of Proceedings October 18, 2017, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 14 Petition for Alien Relative I-130, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 15 Sample USCIS I-130 approval notice, #10 Exhibit Exhibit 16 ICE approval notice, #11 Exhibit Exhibit 17 Transcript of Proceedings November 28, 2017, #12 Exhibit Exhibit 18 IJ Bond order, #13 Exhibit Exhibit 19 Transcript of Proceedings January 22, 2018, #14 Exhibit Exhibit 20 Notice of Appeal, #15 Exhibit Exhibit 21 Motion to Expedite, #16 Exhibit Exhibit 22 Jury Instructions, #17 Exhibit Exhibit 23 DHS Opposition, #18 Exhibit Exhibit 24 Cancellation of removal support)(Bachir, Kristi)
April 1, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE by William Barr, Chad Wolf, Kim Zanotti re #6 MOTION for Summary Judgment of Waiver of Oral Argument (Spavins, Elizabeth)
April 1, 2020 Filing 7 Memorandum in Support re #6 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by William Barr, Chad Wolf, Kim Zanotti. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration, #2 Exhibit B - Order)(Spavins, Elizabeth)
April 1, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Summary Judgment by William Barr, Chad Wolf, Kim Zanotti. (Spavins, Elizabeth)
April 1, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Anne Spavins on behalf of William Barr, Chad Wolf, Kim Zanotti (Spavins, Elizabeth)
April 1, 2020 Filing 4 Response to #2 Order to Show Cause, filed by Jeffrey Crawford. (Erbach, John)
April 1, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by John Michael Erbach on behalf of Jeffrey Crawford (Erbach, John)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER- For these reasons, it is hereby ORDERED that respondents show cause within seven (7) days why petitioner should not be immediately released on bond pending the reevaluation of his immigration status. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 3/25/2020. (See order for further details). (acha, ) Copies forwarded as directed in the order.
March 25, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (acha, )
March 25, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus , filed by Eli S Minas Urbina. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order/BIA/Oct 17, 2017, #2 Exhibit Order/BIA/Oct 30, 2018, #3 Exhibit Order/BIA/Oct 30, 2018, #4 Exhibit Order/BIA/Jan 2, 2020, #5 Exhibit EOIR Screen Shot, #6 Exhibit ICE Call-in letter)(Bachir, Kristi)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Minas Urbina v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeffrey Crawford
Represented By: John Michael Erbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Secretary of DHS Chad Wolf
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Spavins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director of ICE/FF Kim Zanotti
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Spavins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General William Barr
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Spavins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Eli S Minas Urbina
Represented By: Kristi Lynn Bachir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?