Singh v. Fitzgerald
Appellant: Palwinder Singh
Interested Party: USBC-Alexandria (United States Bankruptcy Court)
Appellee: John P. Fitzgerald, III
Case Number: 1:2020cv00327
Filed: March 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: John F Anderson
Referring Judge: Anthony J Trenga
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that Appellant Palwinder Singhs #5 Motion for Extension of Appellant Briefing Deadlines for 60 Days on Compassionate Grounds Due to Fire Hazard Which Burnt Down the Appellants Primary Residence and All of the Record of the Case be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. Appellant will have until July 24, 2020 to file an appellant brief (see Order for details). Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 05/20/20. (c/s: Appellant) (pmil, )
May 19, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF APPELLANT BRIEFING DEADLINES FOR 60 DAYS ON COMPASSIONATE GROUNDS DUE TO FIRE HAZARD WHICH BURNT DOWN THE APPELLANT'S PRIMARY RESIDENCE AND ALL OF THE RECORD OF THE CASE by Palwinder Singh. (dvanm, )
April 23, 2020 Filing 4 Bankruptcy Scheduling Order Appellant Brief due by 5/26/2020. (dvanm, )
April 22, 2020 Filing 3 Restricted Transcript received from USBC. (dvanm, )
April 22, 2020 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Transmittal Cover Sheet together with designation of record. (Attachments: #1 Designation of Record)(dvanm, ) Modified to correct filing date on 4/23/2020 (dvanm, ).
March 25, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT filed by Palwinder Singh with copy of Order being appealed. Bankruptcy Court case number 20-10424-BFK. (Attachments: #1 Bankruptcy Transmittal Sheet, #2 Bankruptcy Order Appealed)(pmil, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singh v. Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Palwinder Singh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: USBC-Alexandria (United States Bankruptcy Court)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: John P. Fitzgerald, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?