United Airlines, Inc. v. Air Line Pilots Association, International
Plaintiff: United Airlines, Inc.
Defendant: Air Line Pilots Association, International
Case Number: 1:2020cv00445
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Rossie D Alston
Referring Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Nature of Suit: Labor: Railway Labor Act
Cause of Action: 45:184
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2020 Filing 21 ANSWER to Counterclaim by United Airlines, Inc..(Quinn, Brian)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 5/27/2020. (dvanm, )
May 26, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against United Airlines, Inc. by Air Line Pilots Association, International.(DiMuro, Bernard)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #17 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, (Agreed Motion Regarding Schedule) Air Line Pilots Association, International answer due 5/27/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan on 5/21/2020. (See order for further details). (acha, )
May 21, 2020 Filing 17 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, (Agreed Motion Regarding Schedule) by United Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Quinn, Brian)
May 21, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE by Air Line Pilots Association, International /Notice of Availability of a United States Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction (DiMuro, Bernard)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Pro hac vice Marcus Charles Migliore. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 5/13/2020. (acha, )
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Pro hac vice James Kenneth Lobsenz. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 5/13/2020. (acha, )
May 8, 2020 Filing 13 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Air Line Pilots Association, International. (DiMuro, Bernard)
May 8, 2020 Filing 12 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Marcus Charles migliore and Certification of Local Counsel Bernard J. DiMuro Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7196288. by Air Line Pilots Association, International. (DiMuro, Bernard)
May 8, 2020 Filing 11 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by James Kenneth Lobsenz and Certification of Local Counsel Bernard J. DiMuro Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7196283. by Air Line Pilots Association, International. (DiMuro, Bernard)
May 6, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Bernard Joseph DiMuro on behalf of Air Line Pilots Association, International (DiMuro, Bernard)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Pro hac vice for Robert Alan Siegel. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 5/5/2020. (acha, )
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Pro hac vice for Rachel Shapiro Janger. Signed by District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr on 5/5/2020. (acha, )
April 23, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United Airlines, Inc.. Air Line Pilots Association, International waiver sent on 4/22/2020, answer due 6/22/2020. (Quinn, Brian)
April 22, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Air Line Pilots Association, International. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (acha, )
April 22, 2020 Filing 5 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Rachel Shapiro Janger and Certification of Local Counsel Brian P. Quinn Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7172195. by United Airlines, Inc.. (Quinn, Brian)
April 22, 2020 Filing 4 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Robert Alan Siegel and Certification of Local Counsel Brian P. Quinn Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7172143. by United Airlines, Inc.. (Quinn, Brian)
April 22, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Rossie D. Alston, Jr and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (acha, )
April 22, 2020 Filing 3 Proposed Summons re #1 Complaint, by United Airlines, Inc.. (Quinn, Brian)
April 22, 2020 Filing 2 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by United Airlines, Inc.. (Quinn, Brian)
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7172057.), filed by United Airlines, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Quinn, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United Airlines, Inc. v. Air Line Pilots Association, International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air Line Pilots Association, International
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Airlines, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Patrick Quinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?