Larin-Garcia v. Hott et al
Petitioner: Roberto Carlos Larin-Garcia
Respondent: US Attorney General William P. Barr, Jeffrey Crawford, Russell Hott and William P. Barr
Case Number: 1:2020cv00456
Filed: April 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Referring Judge: Liam O'Grady
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER this action (Dkt. 1) is hereby DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 5/13/20. (klau, )
May 12, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by Roberto Carlos Larin-Garcia (Sandoval-Moshenberg, Simon)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that Motion to Expedite Proceedings #6 is GRANTED. Respondents are hereby ORDERED to file response to the Motion for Expedited Proceedings within TEN (10) days of the date of this Order; and the Petitioner shall file his Reply to that response within FOUR (4) days of its filing. The request for a telephonic hearing is DENIED without prejudice. The Court will notify counsel should it find a hearing necessary. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 5/11/20. Copy mailed to respondents at their addresses of record.(klau, )
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 4/28/20. (klau, ) (Main Document 7 replaced on 4/28/2020) (klau, ).
April 26, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule by Roberto Carlos Larin-Garcia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Proposed Order)(Kwon, Jennifer)
April 26, 2020 Filing 5 Memorandum in Support to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), filed by Roberto Carlos Larin-Garcia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Kwon, Jennifer)
April 24, 2020 Filing 4 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Rossana M. Rolon Grau and Certification of Local Counsel Simon Y. Sandoval-Moshenberg Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7175283. by Roberto Carlos Larin-Garcia. (Sandoval-Moshenberg, Simon)
April 24, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel Colleen McFarland on behalf of Roberto Carlos Larin-Garcia (McFarland, Rachel)
April 24, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Liam O'Grady and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (klau, )
April 23, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Simon Yehuda Sandoval-Moshenberg on behalf of Roberto Carlos Larin-Garcia (Sandoval-Moshenberg, Simon)
April 23, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 0422-7174691.), filed by Roberto Carlos Larin-Garcia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kwon, Jennifer) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/24/2020: #3 Prisoner data) (klau, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Larin-Garcia v. Hott et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: US Attorney General William P. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeffrey Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Russell Hott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William P. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Roberto Carlos Larin-Garcia
Represented By: Jennifer Kwon
Represented By: Simon Yehuda Sandoval-Moshenberg
Represented By: Rachel Colleen McFarland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?