Sophos Limited et al v. Does
Plaintiff: Sophos Inc. and Sophos Limited
Defendant: John Does
Case Number: 1:2020cv00502
Filed: May 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Referring Judge: Liam O'Grady
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 5/14/2020. (awac, )
May 13, 2020 Filing 33 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Order by Sophos Inc., Sophos Limited. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A)(Milewski, Julia)
May 12, 2020 Filing 32 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Liam O'Grady:Preliminary Injunction hearing held on 5/12/2020. Plaintiffs appeared through Julia Milewski, Gabriel Ramsey, Joseph Levy and Ira Heffan. Defendants do not appear. Mr. Ramsey presents argument. Court grants preliminary injunction. Counsel are to submit a proposed order for preliminary injunction. (Court Reporter S. Wallace.)(awac, )
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #30 Motion to Unseal Case. Case is now unsealed.. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 5/12/2020. (awac, )
May 11, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION to Unseal Case by Sophos Inc., Sophos Limited. (rban, )
May 11, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Execution of Temporary Restraining Order by Sophos Inc., Sophos Limited (Attachments: #1 Letter)(rban, )
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Limited Authority to Conduct Discovery Necessary to Identify and Serve Doe Defendants. Sophos shall have until 120 days from the date of this Order to conduct discovery necessary to further identify and serve the Doe Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff on 5/11/2020. (dvanm, )
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 SUPPLEMENTAL TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 5/8/2020. (cc: via email to counsel sent by Chambers)(awac, )
May 8, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #23 MOTION to Supplement Temporary Restraining Order : Motion Hearing set for 5/7/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 1000 before District Judge Liam O'Grady. (rban, )
May 8, 2020 Filing 25 Declaration of Joseph J. Levy in support of #23 MOTION to Supplement Temporary Restraining Order by Sophos Inc., Sophos Limited. (rban, )
May 8, 2020 Filing 24 Brief in Support to #23 MOTION to Supplement Temporary Restraining Order filed by Sophos Inc., Sophos Limited. (rban, )
May 8, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION to Supplement Temporary Restraining Order by Sophos Inc., Sophos Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(rban, )
May 7, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #20 MOTION for Limited Authority to Conduct Discovery Necessary to Identify and Serve Doe Defendants: Motion Hearing set for 5/12/2020 at 02:00 PM in Alexandria Courtroom 1000 before District Judge Liam O'Grady. (rban, )
May 7, 2020 Filing 21 Brief in Support to #20 MOTION for Limited Authority to Conduct Discovery Necessary to Identify and Serve Doe Defendants filed by Sophos Inc., Sophos Limited. (rban, )
May 7, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Limited Authority to Conduct Discovery Necessary to Identify and Serve Doe Defendants by Sophos Inc., Sophos Limited. (Attachments: #1 Letter, #2 Proposed Order)(rban, )
May 6, 2020 Filing 19 TRO Bond BOND in the amount of $ $10,000 posted by Sophos Inc., Sophos Limited. (rban, )
May 6, 2020 Filing 18 Filing fee: $ 550.00, receipt number 14683084485 ($400 Filing Fee Civil Complaint and $150 for 2 Pro Hac Vice Fees). (rban, )
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting #3 Motion for Pro hac vice for Matthew B. Welling. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 05/05/2020. (choy, )
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting #4 Motion for Pro hac vice for Gabriel M. Ramsey. Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 05/05/2020. (choy, )
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSEAlexandria Set/Reset Hearings: Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 5/12/2020 at 02:00 PM in Alexandria Remote before District Judge Liam O'Grady.Signed by District Judge Liam O'Grady on 5/1/2020. (cc: via email to Plaintiff's counsel)(awac, ) Modified on 5/12/2020 (awac, ).
May 1, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order : Motion Hearing set for 5/1/2020 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 1000 before District Judge Liam O'Grady. (rban, )
May 1, 2020 Filing 13 Declaration of Matthew B. Welling re #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Sophos Inc., Sophos Limited. (Attachments: #1 document continued)(rban, )
May 1, 2020 Filing 12 Declaration of Joseph J. Levy re #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Sophos Inc., Sophos Limited. (rban, )
May 1, 2020 Filing 11 Brief in Support to #10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Sophos Inc., Sophos Limited. (rban, )
May 1, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Sophos Inc., Sophos Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(rban, )
May 1, 2020 Filing 9 Declaration of Gabriel M. Ramsey re #7 MOTION to Seal by Sophos Inc., Sophos Limited. (rban, )
May 1, 2020 Filing 8 Brief in Support to #7 MOTION to Seal filed by Sophos Inc., Sophos Limited. (rban, )
May 1, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Seal by Sophos Inc., Sophos Limited. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(rban, )
May 1, 2020 Filing 6 Financial Interest Disclosure Statement (Local Rule 7.1) by Sophos Inc., Sophos Limited. (rban, )
May 1, 2020 Filing 5 Proposed Summons. (rban, )
May 1, 2020 Filing 4 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Gabriel M. Ramsey and Certification of Local Counsel Julia Milewski by Sophos Inc., Sophos Limited. (rban, )
May 1, 2020 Filing 3 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Matthew B. Welling and Certification of Local Counsel Julia Milewski by Sophos Inc., Sophos Limited. (rban, )
May 1, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Julia Rebecca Milewski on behalf of Sophos Inc., Sophos Limited (rban, )
May 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Does, filed by Sophos Limited, Sophos Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit A, #2 Appendix B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(rban, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sophos Limited et al v. Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sophos Inc.
Represented By: Julia Rebecca Milewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sophos Limited
Represented By: Julia Rebecca Milewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?