Galvez v. Barr et al
Petitioner: Jose Antonio Galvez
Respondent: US Attorney General William P. Barr, Jeffrey Crawford and Field Office Dir. Russell Hott
Case Number: 1:2020cv00526
Filed: May 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 So Ordered re #14 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal without prejudice,filed by Jose Antonio Galvez. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 5/13/20. (klau, )
May 13, 2020 Notice of Correction re #13 The filing user has been notified to contact the clerk's office and refile the document. (aott)
May 12, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by Jose Antonio Galvez (Sandoval-Moshenberg, Simon)
May 12, 2020 Filing 13 (FILED IN ERROR WRONG CASE)NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice by Jose Antonio Galvez (Sandoval-Moshenberg, Simon) (Main Document 13 replaced on 5/13/2020) (aott, ). Modified on 5/13/2020 (aott).
May 12, 2020 Filing 12 Document filed in error and removed (klau, ) (Main Document 12 replaced on 5/12/2020) (klau, ). Modified text on 5/12/2020 (klau, ).
May 12, 2020 Set (Videoconference) Hearings: Show Cause Hearing (Videoconference) set for 5/26/2020 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 701 before District Judge Anthony J Trenga. (klau, )
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that, within seven (7) days of the date of this Order, the Respondents show cause why the writ should not issue; and it is further ORDERED that, within four (4) days of the Respondents filing any responsive pleading, the Petitioner file any reply in further support of his petition; and it is further ORDERED that a hearing on the petition be scheduled for a videoconference hearing on May 26, 2020 at 11:00 a.m., with further instructions to follow. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 5/12/20. (klau, )
May 12, 2020 Filing 10 Waiver of re #9 MOTION to Expedite Proceedings Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument by Jose Antonio Galvez (Sandoval-Moshenberg, Simon)
May 12, 2020 Notice of Correction re #9 MOTION to Expedite Proceedings, The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing Date or a Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument.(klau, )
May 11, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Expedite Proceedings by Jose Antonio Galvez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sandoval-Moshenberg, Simon)
May 11, 2020 Filing 8 Corrected Version of Dkt. #7 (Sealed Ex. A to Dkt. #3)
May 11, 2020 Filing 7 Sealed Attachment/Exhibit(s) re #3 Memorandum,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B, #2 Exhibit D, #3 Exhibit E, #4 Exhibit F, #5 Exhibit G)(Sandoval-Moshenberg, Simon)
May 11, 2020 Filing 6 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Jose Antonio Galvez re #5 Memorandum in Support, #4 MOTION to Seal (Sandoval-Moshenberg, Simon)
May 11, 2020 Filing 5 Memorandum in Support re #4 MOTION to Seal filed by Jose Antonio Galvez. (Sandoval-Moshenberg, Simon)
May 11, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to Seal by Jose Antonio Galvez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sandoval-Moshenberg, Simon)
May 11, 2020 Filing 3 Memorandum of Law in Support of Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), filed by Jose Antonio Galvez. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: filed under seal, #2 Exhibit B: Filed under seal, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D: filed under seal, #5 Exhibit E: Redacted version, #6 Exhibit F: Redacted version, #7 Exhibit G: Filed under seal)(Sandoval-Moshenberg, Simon)
May 8, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer Kwon on behalf of Jose Antonio Galvez (Kwon, Jennifer)
May 8, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Anthony J Trenga and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (klau, )
May 7, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 0422-7195342.), filed by Jose Antonio Galvez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sandoval-Moshenberg, Simon) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/8/2020: #2 Prisoner data) (klau, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Galvez v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: US Attorney General William P. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeffrey Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Field Office Dir. Russell Hott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jose Antonio Galvez
Represented By: Simon Yehuda Sandoval-Moshenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?