Scalia et al v. Prototype Productions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Eugene Scalia and U.S. Department of Labor
Defendant: Prototype Productions, Inc. Welfare Plan, Prototype Productions, Inc., Italo Travez, Jose Travez and Prototype Productions, Inc. 401(k) Plan
Case Number: 1:2020cv00562
Filed: May 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Theresa Carroll Buchanan
Referring Judge: T S Ellis
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1362
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 22, 2020 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by U.S. Department of Labor. Prototype Productions, Inc. Welfare Plan waiver sent on 5/26/2020, answer due 7/27/2020. (Lewis, Ryma)
June 22, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by U.S. Department of Labor. Prototype Productions, Inc. waiver sent on 5/26/2020, answer due 7/27/2020. (Lewis, Ryma)
June 22, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by U.S. Department of Labor. Prototype Productions, Inc. 401(k) Plan waiver sent on 5/26/2020, answer due 7/27/2020. (Lewis, Ryma)
June 22, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by U.S. Department of Labor. Italo Travez waiver sent on 5/26/2020, answer due 7/27/2020. (Lewis, Ryma)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting #4 Motion for Pro hac vice for Rebecca Jean Sheppard. Signed by District Judge T. S. Ellis, III on 06/10/2020. (choy, )
June 5, 2020 Filing 4 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Rebecca J Sheppard and Certification of Local Counsel Glen E. Frost Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7235059. by Prototype Productions, Inc., Prototype Productions, Inc. 401(k) Plan, Prototype Productions, Inc. Welfare Plan. (Frost, Glen)
June 5, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Glen Edward Frost on behalf of Prototype Productions, Inc., Prototype Productions, Inc. 401(k) Plan, Prototype Productions, Inc. Welfare Plan (Frost, Glen)
June 2, 2020 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Eugene Scalia. Jose Travez waiver sent on 5/28/2020, answer due 7/27/2020. (Lewis, Ryma)
May 20, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge T. S. Ellis, III and Magistrate Judge Theresa Carroll Buchanan. (aott)
May 20, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint against Prototype Productions, Inc. et al filed by Scalia et al. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet (Lewis, Ryma) Modified on 5/20/2020 (aott, ). Modified on 5/21/2020 (aott).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scalia et al v. Prototype Productions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prototype Productions, Inc. Welfare Plan
Represented By: Glen Edward Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prototype Productions, Inc.
Represented By: Glen Edward Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Italo Travez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jose Travez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prototype Productions, Inc. 401(k) Plan
Represented By: Glen Edward Frost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Scalia
Represented By: Ryma Naje Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Department of Labor
Represented By: Ryma Naje Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?