Handa v. Icelandair, EHF, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sameer Handa
Defendant: Icelandair, EHF, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00579
Filed: May 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Claude M Hilton
Referring Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Pro hac vice for Abram I. Bohrer. Signed by District Judge Claude M. Hilton on 6/16/2020. (acha, )
June 12, 2020 Filing 4 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Abram I. Bohrer and Certification of Local Counsel Douglas Landau Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7247223. by Sameer Handa. (Landau, Douglas)
June 12, 2020 Notice of Correction re #3 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Abram I. Bohrer and Certification of Local Counsel Douglas Landau Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7247019. . An incomplete, illegible, or incorrect document was filed. The filing user has been notified to refile the document with application and signatures. (acha, )
June 12, 2020 Filing 3 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Abram I. Bohrer and Certification of Local Counsel Douglas Landau Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7247019. by Sameer Handa. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Affidavit Application to Qualify as a Foreign Attorney)(Landau, Douglas) (Main Document 3 replaced on 6/12/2020) (acha, ). (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/12/2020) (acha, ). (Attachment 2 replaced on 6/12/2020) (acha, ). Modified on 6/12/2020 notified filer of error and replaced(acha, ).
May 28, 2020 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Sameer Handa. Icelandair, EHF, Inc. waiver sent on 5/26/2020, answer due 7/27/2020. (Landau, Douglas)
May 21, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Claude M. Hilton and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (acha, )
May 21, 2020 Filing 1 Complaint ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7214582.), filed by Sameer Handa. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Landau, Douglas) (Attachment 1 replaced on 5/21/2020) (acha, ). Modified on 5/21/2020 Civil Cover sheet replaced as one time courtesy (acha, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Handa v. Icelandair, EHF, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sameer Handa
Represented By: Douglas Keith Wagner Landau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Icelandair, EHF, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?