M.Y.N.N. v. Stirrup et al
Plaintiff: M.Y.N.N.
Defendant: Alex Azar, Gary L. Jones, Kenneth Tota, Lynn Johnson, Heidi Stirrup and Natasha David
Case Number: 1:2020cv00612
Filed: May 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Virginia
Presiding Judge: Leonie M Brinkema
Referring Judge: Michael S Nachmanoff
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 SO ORDERED Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 07/14/2020. (choy, )
July 13, 2020 Filing 42 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by M.Y.N.N. (Vidmar, Melody)
July 10, 2020 Filing 41 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Action, Complaint for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief and Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus, Declaration of Dunia Nolasco Benitez with Exhibit A, [Proposed] Order Granting Release, Civil Cover Sheet, Plaintiffs-Petitioners' Motion to File Under Seal, (Proposed] Order with Exhibit A, Notice of Under Seal Fifing Under Local Civil Rule 5(C), Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs-Petitioners' Motion to File Under Seal, Motion for Issuance of Order to Show Cause, [Proposed] Order to Show Cause, Order, Order to Show Cause, Plaintiffs-Petitioners' Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Complaint for Injunction and Declaratory Relief and Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, Reply Declaration of Dunia Nolasco Benitez, Declaration of Patricia Mercedes Herold, Document of Glenn Gilliard with Exhibit A served on G. Zachary Terwilliger, U.S. Attorney for the Eastern District of Virginia, accepted by Kruzel Petra on July 9, 2020, filed by M.Y.N.N.. (Rosenberg, Jeffrey)
July 10, 2020 Filing 40 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Action, dated July 8, 2020; Complaint for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief and Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus, dated May 30, 2020, Declaration of Dunia Nolasco Benitez, dated May 30, 2020, Exhibit A to the Complaint for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief and Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus, dated May 30, 2020, [Proposed] Order Granting Release, Civil Cover Sheet, dated May 30, 2020, Plaintiffs-Petitioners' Motion to File Under Seal, dated May 30, 2020, [Proposed] Order with Exhibit A, Notice of Under Seal Filing Under Local Civil Rule 5(C), dated May 30, 2020, Memorandum in Support of Plaintiffs-Petitioners' Motion to File Under Seal, dated May 30, 2020, Motion for Issuance of Order to Show Cause, dated May 30, 2020, [Proposed] Order to Show Cause, Order, dated June 2, 2020, Order to Show Cause, dated June 2, 2020, Order, dated June 11, 2020, Order, dated June 17, 2020, Plaintiffs-Petitioners' Reply Memorandum in Further Support of Complaint for Injunction and Declaratory Relief and Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, dated June 17, 2020, Reply Declaration of Dunia Nolasco Benitez, dated June 17, 2020, Declaration of Patricia Mercedes Herold, June 17, 2020, Order dated June 26, 2020, Affidavit of Glenn Gilliard with Exhibit A, dated July 1, 2020, and Affidavit of Service, dated July 1, 2020 served on William P. Barr, United States Attorney General on July 9, 2020, filed by M.Y.N.N.. (Rosenberg, Jeffrey)
July 8, 2020 Filing 39 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two Electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(jlan)
July 6, 2020 Filing 38 Proposed Summons re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), Summons as to G. Zachary Terwellier, U.S. Attorney for the Eastern District of Virginia by M.Y.N.N.. (Rosenberg, Jeffrey)
July 6, 2020 Filing 37 Proposed Summons re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), Summons as to William P. Barr, United States Attorney General by M.Y.N.N.. (Rosenberg, Jeffrey)
July 1, 2020 Filing 36 SUMMONS Returned Executed by M.Y.N.N.. Alex Azar served on 6/4/2020, answer due 8/3/2020; Natasha David served on 6/4/2020, answer due 8/3/2020; Lynn Johnson served on 6/4/2020, answer due 8/3/2020; Gary L. Jones served on 6/4/2020, answer due 8/3/2020; Heidi Stirrup served on 6/4/2020, answer due 8/3/2020; Kenneth Tota served on 6/4/2020, answer due 8/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Personal Service on the U.S. Attorney's Office)(Rosenberg, Jeffrey)
June 28, 2020 Filing 35 TRANSCRIPT of proceedings held on 6/26/2020, before Judge Leonie M. Brinkema, Court Reporter Anneliese Thomson, Telephone number 703-299-8595. NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS:The parties have thirty(30) calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript will be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. The policy is located on our website at www.vaed.uscourts.gov Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 7/28/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/28/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/28/2020.(thomson, anneliese)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER: For the reasons stated during a telephone conference held on the record with counsel for all parties present, plaintiffs Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus [Dkt. 1) is DISMISSED, and it is hereby ORDERED that defendants timely respond to plaintiffs Complaint for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief [Dkt. 1). Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 6/26/20. (yguy)
June 26, 2020 Filing 33 Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema:Show Cause Hearing held on 6/26/2020 by teleconference. Appearances of counsel. Court advised of case status. Court orders petition for writ of habeas corpus dismissed. (order to follow) (Court Reporter A. Thomson.)(yguy)
June 18, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by John Robert Flores on behalf of Gary L. Jones (Flores, John)
June 17, 2020 Filing 31 Reply to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), #23 Memorandum, filed by M.Y.N.N.. (Attachments: #1 Reply Declaration of Dunia Nolasco Benitez, #2 Declaration of Patricia Mercedes Herold)(Rosenberg, Jeffrey)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDERED that the hearing will be conducted telephonically on June 26, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. To join the tele-conference, the parties should dial 1-877-336-1829 and use the access code 8896301; If the parties want the hearing to be conducted by Zoom instead of telephonically, they may so advise the Court; however, in that event, all participants must use an Ethernet connection as opposed to a wireless internet connection. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 06/17/2020. (choy, )(Copies sent to counsel on 06/17/2020)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Granting #24 Motion to Seal; that the Exhibits 1 and 2 to Federal Defendants-Respondents' Memorandum of Law in Response to Petitioners-Plaintiffs' Petition for Habeas Corpus, Exhibit 1 and Exhibit 2, shall be maintained under seal by the Clerk, until otherwise directed. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 06/11/2020. (choy, )
June 10, 2020 Filing 28 Memorandum in Support re #24 MOTION to Seal filed by Alex Azar, Natasha David, Lynn Johnson, Heidi Stirrup, Kenneth Tota. (Spavins, Elizabeth)
June 10, 2020 Filing 27 Sealed Document re #24 MOTION to Seal . (Spavins, Elizabeth)
June 10, 2020 Filing 26 Sealed Document re #24 MOTION to Seal . (Spavins, Elizabeth)
June 10, 2020 Filing 25 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by Alex Azar, Natasha David, Lynn Johnson, Heidi Stirrup, Kenneth Tota re #24 MOTION to Seal (Spavins, Elizabeth)
June 10, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION to Seal by Alex Azar, Natasha David, Lynn Johnson, Heidi Stirrup, Kenneth Tota. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Spavins, Elizabeth)
June 10, 2020 Filing 23 Memorandum in Response to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241), filed by Alex Azar, Natasha David, Lynn Johnson, Heidi Stirrup, Kenneth Tota. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)(Spavins, Elizabeth)
June 2, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance by Elizabeth Anne Spavins on behalf of Alex Azar, Natasha David, Lynn Johnson, Heidi Stirrup, Kenneth Tota (Spavins, Elizabeth)
June 2, 2020 Set Hearing: Show Cause Hearing set for 6/26/2020 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 700 before District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema. (choy, )
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDERED that Petitioner's Application for Issuance of an Order to Show Cause is GRANTED; Respondents are ORDERED to file a response, if any, to the Order of Show Cause by June 10, 2020; Petitioners shall have an opportunity to file a reply to Respondents' response by June 17, 2020; This matter shall be heard by this Court on June 26, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 06/02/2020. (choy, )
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting #15 Motion for Pro hac vice for Abigail Margaret Reay Yull. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 06/02/2020. (choy, )
June 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting #14 Motion for Pro hac vice for Howard Sean Hogan. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 06/02/2020. (choy, )
June 2, 2020 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to Alex Azar, Natasha David, Lynn Johnson, Gary L. Jones, Heidi Stirrup, Kenneth Tota, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two Electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice to Attorney)(choy, )
June 2, 2020 Filing 16 Prisoner Database (choy, )
June 2, 2020 Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Nachmanoff. (aott)
June 1, 2020 Filing 15 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Abigail Yull and Certification of Local Counsel Jeffrey Rosenberg Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7227528. by M.Y.N.N.. (Rosenberg, Jeffrey)
June 1, 2020 Filing 14 Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Howard Hogan and Certification of Local Counsel Jeffrey Rosenberg Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7227526. by M.Y.N.N.. (Rosenberg, Jeffrey)
June 1, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Melody Layne Vidmar on behalf of M.Y.N.N. (Vidmar, Melody)
May 30, 2020 Filing 12 Proposed Summons for Gary L. Jones by M.Y.N.N.. (Rosenberg, Jeffrey)
May 30, 2020 Filing 11 Proposed Summons for Natasha David by M.Y.N.N.. (Rosenberg, Jeffrey)
May 30, 2020 Filing 10 Proposed Summons for Alex Azar by M.Y.N.N.. (Rosenberg, Jeffrey)
May 30, 2020 Filing 9 Proposed Summons for Lynn Johnson by M.Y.N.N.. (Rosenberg, Jeffrey)
May 30, 2020 Filing 8 Proposed Summons for Kenneth Tota by M.Y.N.N.. (Rosenberg, Jeffrey)
May 30, 2020 Filing 7 Proposed Summons for Heidi Stirrup by M.Y.N.N.. (Rosenberg, Jeffrey)
May 30, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Order to Show Cause by M.Y.N.N.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to Show Cause)(Rosenberg, Jeffrey)
May 30, 2020 Filing 5 Memorandum in Support re #2 MOTION to Seal filed by M.Y.N.N.. (Rosenberg, Jeffrey)
May 30, 2020 Filing 4 Sealed Exhibit re #2 MOTION to Seal . (Rosenberg, Jeffrey)
May 30, 2020 Filing 3 Notice of Filing Sealing Motion LCvR5(C) by M.Y.N.N. re #2 MOTION to Seal (Rosenberg, Jeffrey)
May 30, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to Seal by M.Y.N.N.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rosenberg, Jeffrey)
May 30, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus and COMPLAINT for Injunctive and Declaratory Relief ( Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 26P38Q6C.), filed by M.Y.N.N.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order Granting Release, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Rosenberg, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Virginia Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: M.Y.N.N. v. Stirrup et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Azar
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Spavins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary L. Jones
Represented By: John Robert Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Tota
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Spavins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn Johnson
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Spavins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heidi Stirrup
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Spavins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Natasha David
Represented By: Elizabeth Anne Spavins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.Y.N.N.
Represented By: Jeffrey Saul Rosenberg
Represented By: Melody Layne Vidmar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?